DEHAAN et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: DOUG DEHAAN and GAYLE DEHAAN
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00421
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER. Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 5/18/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/22/2020., Attorneys confer with clients by 11/6/2019., Jury Trial set for 9/8/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE., Mediation Report due by 6/15/2020.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/23/19. (blb)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT. The plaintiff has filed as of right a first amended complaint. ECF No. #7 . Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: The motion, ECF No. #4 , to dismiss the original complaint is denied as moot. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/23/19. (blb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (MOODY, THOMAS)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by DOUG DEHAAN, GAYLE DEHAAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (JIMENEZ, SENEN)
October 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint As To Plaintiff Doug Dehaan For Lack Of Standing And Motion to Dismiss For Failure To Join An Indispensable Party. No response filed. (blb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT FOR PARTIES PLANNING CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ALTERNATIVE DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING DEADLINES. (MOODY, THOMAS) Modified Title on 10/9/2019 (blb).
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DOUG DEHAAN, GAYLE DEHAAN. (JIMENEZ, SENEN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint As To Plaintiff Doug Dehaan For Lack Of Standing And Motion to Dismiss For Failure To Join An Indispensable Party by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/20/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (MOODY, THOMAS)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/18/2019. Discovery due by 1/1/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/4/19. (blb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MOODY, THOMAS)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Second Judicial Circuit in and for Franklin County, Florida, case number 19-000204-CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4606014.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOODY, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEHAAN et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUG DEHAAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAYLE DEHAAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS JAMES MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?