D'AMICO v. WHEELER et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN F D'AMICO
Defendant: STEVEN H WHEELER, D SMITH, JOSEPH EDWARDS, RAMON BASSA and MARK S INCH
Case Number: 4:2019cv00445
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (No responses filed). (MB)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by STEVEN F D'AMICO. Address changed from: RECEPTION AND MEDICAL CENTER PO BOX 628 LAKE BUTLER, FL 32054, to: WAKULLA CORRECTIONAL INSTITION 110 MELALEUCA DR CRAWFORDVILLE, FL 32327. ECF#5 Re-mailed accordingly. (toy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommended that this case be transferred to the United States District for the Middle District of Florida, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) or 1404(a). That the clerk be directed to close this file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/10/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/7/2019. (sdw)
October 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #4 RESPONSE TO #3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (MB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO #3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (MB)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/18/2019. Show Cause Response due by 10/2/2019. (sdw)
September 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fees not paid). (MB)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, STEVEN F D'AMICO. (MB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAMON BASSA, JOSEPH EDWARDS, MARK S INCH, D SMITH, STEVEN H WHEELER, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fees not paid). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'AMICO v. WHEELER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN F D'AMICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN H WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMON BASSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?