D'AMICO v. INCH et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN F D'AMICO
Defendant: MARK INCH, JOSEPH EDWARDS and SCOTT A HEILIG
Case Number: 4:2019cv00446
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Change of Address. (rcb)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by STEVEN F D'AMICO ***Address updated to Wakulla Correctional Institution, 110 Melaleuca Drive, Crawfordville, Florida 32327 from Reception and Medical Center, PO BOX 628, Lake Butler, Florida 32054*** (rcb)
October 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (rcb)
October 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (rcb)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application packetfor requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 10/15/2019, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supported by a computer printout of the transactions in Plaintiffs inmate bank account for the 6-month period of time preceding the initiation of this case, or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full) The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 10/15/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 09/12/2019. (rcb)***IFP Motion mailed as directed***
September 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (rcb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS 1983 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (rcb) Modified on 9/11/2019 (rcb). ***No service copies or IFP motion received***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'AMICO v. INCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN F D'AMICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT A HEILIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?