CITY OF APALACHICOLA v. MOORE et al
Plaintiff: JOHN K JACKSON, CHRISTIANA T MOORE and CITY OF APALACHICOLA
Defendant: J PATRICK FLOYD and CITY COMMISSION OF APALACHICOLA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00460
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by CITY OF APALACHICOLA, J PATRICK FLOYD. (WARNER, WILLIAM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 26 Disclosures by JOHN K JACKSON, CHRISTIANA T MOORE. (WINEGARDNER, JENNIFER)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 26 Disclosures by CITY OF APALACHICOLA, J PATRICK FLOYD. (WARNER, WILLIAM)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Because Defendants Christiana T. Moore and John K. Jackson have filed an amended counterclaim and third-party complaint, Counter-Defendant City Commission of Apalachicola and Third-Party Defendant J. Patrick Floyds motion to dismiss and for more definite statement, ECF No. #4 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/23/19. (blb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT (JURY DEMAND) , filed by CHRISTIANA T MOORE, JOHN K JACKSON. (WINEGARDNER, JENNIFER) Modified on 10/23/2019 to match PDF title (toy).
October 21, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 11/21/2019. (toy)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 3/17/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/7/2020., Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 4/28/2020.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/18/2019. (toy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by CITY COMMISSION OF APALACHICOLA, J PATRICK FLOYD. (WARNER, WILLIAM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (WARNER, WILLIAM)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants Moore and Jackson shall respond to the motion to dismiss on or before October 23, 2019. (Response to motion due by by 10/23/2019.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/02/2019. (toy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum In Response as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN K JACKSON, CHRISTIANA T MOORE. (WINEGARDNER, JENNIFER) Modified on 10/2/2019 to match PDF title(toy).
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - Amended Certificate of Service by CITY COMMISSION OF APALACHICOLA (WARNER, WILLIAM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing State Court Documents by CITY COMMISSION OF APALACHICOLA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit) (WARNER, WILLIAM)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2019. Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Status Report due by 10/21/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 09/19/2019. (toy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by CITY COMMISSION OF APALACHICOLA, J PATRICK FLOYD. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/2/2019). (WARNER, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by J PATRICK FLOYD re #1 Notice of Removal, (WARNER, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WARNER, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY COMMISSION OF APALACHICOLA from Second Judicial Circuit Court, Franklin County, Florida, case number 2018 000270 CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4624760.), filed by CITY COMMISSION OF APALACHICOLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (WARNER, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF APALACHICOLA v. MOORE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J PATRICK FLOYD
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COMMISSION OF APALACHICOLA
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN K JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIANA T MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF APALACHICOLA
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Represented By: ERIC ALEXANDER KREBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?