CORKER v. HARRISON-SPOERL et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CORKER
Defendant: RED HILLS PSYCHOLOGY ASSOCIATES LLC and RONDA HARRISON-SPOERL
Case Number: 4:2019cv00471
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL CORKER, 825 NW 84 Terrace, Miami FL 33150. (alb) Modified on 11/21/2019 (Copy of Order to Show Cause also mailed to this address on this date (alb).
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MICHAEL CORKER Re: #5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Address corrected and mail forwarded.) (alb)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or comply with an order of the Court. The Court will discharge the show cause order if Plaintiff complies with the Court's October 1 order within the fourteen days provided. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/5/2019. Show Cause Response due by 11/19/2019. (alb)
November 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (No filings.) (alb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form for use by prisoners, and a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint and shall either pay the full $400.00 filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Modified on 10/2/2019 (Order and forms mailed) (alb).( Amended complaint, IFP motion or fee due on 10/31/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/1/2019. Modified on 10/2/2019 To correct file date (alb).
September 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL CORKER. (alb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RONDA HARRISON-SPOERL, RED HILLS PSYCHOLOGY ASSOCIATES LLC, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (No service copies) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORKER v. HARRISON-SPOERL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED HILLS PSYCHOLOGY ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONDA HARRISON-SPOERL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CORKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?