CORKER v. MCNEIL
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CORKER
Defendant: WALTER MCNEIL
Case Number: 4:2019cv00484
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL CORKER. (New address: 825 NW 84 TERRACE, MIAMI, FL 33150). (MB)
November 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to LEON COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY Re: #6 ORDER. (RETURN TO SENDER; UNABLE TO FORWARD) (address sent to: 535 APPLEYARD DR, TALLAHASSEE, FL 32304). (MB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to LEON COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY Re: #6 ORDER. (RETURN TO SENDER; UNABLE TO FORWARD) (address sent to: 535 APPLEYARD DR, TALLAHASSEE, FL 32304). (MB)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint. (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal or Amended Complaint due by 12/18/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/18/2019. (Form mailed w/ORDER). (MB)
November 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus referred for preliminary screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), per #6 ORDER. (MB)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED to the extent this case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: Leon County Detention Facility. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. The clerk shall refer the amended complaint (ECF Doc. 4) to chambers for preliminary screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Letter w/ORDER mailed to Leon County Detention Facility). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/1/2019. (MB)
October 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #4 Amended Complaint, (No service copies), #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (MB)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL CORKER. (MB)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WALTER MCNEIL, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (No service copies). (MB)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form for use by prisoners, and a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. Also, within thirty (30) days, Plaintiff shall either pay the full $400.00 filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Amended Complaint due by 11/4/2019. Fee due by 11/4/2019.) (Forms mailed w/ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/3/2019. (MB)
October 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (No service copies/no IFP/fee not paid). Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (MB) Modified on 10/3/2019 (bkp).
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, MICHAEL CORKER. (MB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (No service copies/no IFP/fee not paid). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORKER v. MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CORKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?