CORKER v. HOBBS
Petitioner: MICHAEL CORKER
Respondent: BARBARA HOBBS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00485
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Set Deadlines re #3 ORDER, per Chambers instructions due to current address received. (Amended Complaint due by 12/20/2019. Filing Fee or IFP due by 12/20/2019). (MB)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL CORKER. (New address: 825 NW 84 TERRACE, MIAMI, FL 33150). (MB)
November 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MICHAEL CORKER Re: #3 ORDER. (RETURN TO SENDER; ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD). (MB)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MICHAEL CORKER Re: #3 ORDER. (RETURN TO SENDER; ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD). (MB)
November 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (Amended Complaint not filed) (IFP Motion not filed; fee not paid). (MB)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to change the Nature of Suit ("NOS") code to 555 and the "Cause" code to 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights. Additionally, the clerk is directed to forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983, and a motion to proceed in forma pauperis with a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Also within that time, Plaintiff must file an amended civil rights complaint. Amended Complaint due by 11/4/2019. Fee or IFP Motion due by 11/4/2019.) (Forms mailed w/ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/3/2019. (MB)
October 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (MB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, MICHAEL CORKER. (MB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOBBS, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORKER v. HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL CORKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BARBARA HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?