RIVERA v. SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA et al
Plaintiff: VINCENT F RIVERA
Defendant: SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA, SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL, EIGHTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, FIRST DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL and THIRTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT
Case Number: 4:2019cv00519
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , be DENIED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), and this case be DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's refiling an action if he simultaneously pays the filing fee and the previously assessed sanction issued by this Court. It is further RECOMMENDED that the Order adopting this Report and Recommendation direct the Clerk of Court to note on the docket that this cause was dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/20/2019. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/18/2019.) (cle)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
October 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (cle)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by VINCENT F RIVERA. (cle)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EIGHTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, FIRST DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL, SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL, SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA, and THIRTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, filed by VINCENT F RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (cle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERA v. SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT F RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIGHTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THIRTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?