GOLDSON v. CHASE BANK USA
Plaintiff: KAREEM GOLDSON
Defendant: CHASE BANK USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. and CHASE BANK USA NA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00521
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CHASE BANK USA NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for CHASE BANK USA NA.. (CARTER, DARNESHA)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/16/2020. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/3/19. (blb)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The defendant's unopposed motion, ECF No. #7 , to extend the deadline to respond to the first amended complaint is granted. The defendant's answer, ECF No. #8 , is deemed timely. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/2/19. (blb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Answer and Defenses ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by CHASE BANK USA NA. (CARTER, DARNESHA)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by CHASE BANK USA NA. (CARTER, DARNESHA) Modified Title on 11/25/2019 (blb).
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAREEM GOLDSON. CHASE BANK USA NA served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CHASE BANK USA NA. (rcb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK USA NA, filed by KAREEM GOLDSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney CHRISTOPHER W BOSS Re #1 Complaint- Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4661447.), filed by KAREEM GOLDSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BOSS, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOLDSON v. CHASE BANK USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREEM GOLDSON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER W BOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK USA NA
Represented By: DARNESHA K CARTER
Represented By: ROBERT M QUINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?