VREELAND v. PRUITT
Petitioner: DELMART E J M VREELAND, II
Respondent: SCOTT PRUITT
Case Number: 4:2019cv00529
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Resp re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (sdw)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Atty Gen re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (sdw)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to furnish a copy of the petition (ECF No. #1 ), with a copy of this order, to Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Florida. The deadline for the Florida Attorney General to file a response to the petition is NINETY (90) DAYS from the date of this order. (Response due by 3/4/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/4/2019. (order w/ petition via cert mail to Resp and Atty Gen) (sdw)
November 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice. (received 2 service copies) (sdw)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by DELMART E J M VREELAND, II re #4 Order. (received 2 service copies) (sdw)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of docketing of this order, Petitioner must provide the court with two (2) complete copies of the habeas petition (ECF No. #1 ). (Service Copies due by 11/29/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/29/2019. (sdw)
October 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #2 Memorandum in Support, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (sdw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se litigant DELMART E J M VRELLAND, II. (sdw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DELMART E J M VREELAND, II. (no service copies) (sdw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DELMART E J M VREELAND, II. (no service copies)($5.00 filing fee received, receipt #FLN4-37834) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VREELAND v. PRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SCOTT PRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DELMART E J M VREELAND, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?