ILICH-ERNST v. HOWARD
Plaintiff: JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST
Defendant: PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD
Case Number: 4:2019cv00554
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 First MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST. (COHN, AARON)
January 10, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 26 Disclosures by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST. (COHN, AARON)
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION to Dismiss First MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous Motion to Dismiss; Motion for a More Definite Statement; and Motion to Strike filed by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST. (COHN, AARON)
January 8, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION to Stay by PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD. (HOWARD, PHILLIP)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/21/2020).), First MOTION to Dismiss ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/21/2020).), First MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/21/2020).) by PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD. (HOWARD, PHILLIP)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion and Incorporated Memorandum to Compel Initial Disclosures and Discovery responses and for Sanctions by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (COHN, AARON)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO QUASH. The defendant's motion, ECF No. #8 , to quash the subpoenas duces tecum served by plaintiff on nonparties is denied. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/31/19. (blb)
December 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Discovery due by 5/15/2020, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/8/2020, Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE, Mediation Report due by 7/15/2020, Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/29/19. (blb)
December 26, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 1/26/2020. (blb)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Quash filed by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST. (COHN, AARON)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (COHN, AARON)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT ON DISCOVERY by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST. (COHN, AARON)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. I disqualify myself from handling this case because I represented an interested party when I was in private practice. 28 U.S.C. 455. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/11/19. Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. (blb) **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:19cv554-RH/MJF*
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Quash by PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD. (HOWARD, PHILLIP)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/8/2020. Discovery due by 3/24/2020. Status Report due by 12/25/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/25/19. (blb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST. PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (COHN, AARON)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD. (blb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE /REQUEST - SUMMONS: PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST (COHN, AARON)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRIOR RELATED CASE by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST (COHN, AARON)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (COHN, AARON)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4698473.), filed by JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Part I), #8 Exhibit 7 (Part II)) (COHN, AARON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ILICH-ERNST v. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD
Represented By: PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASMINKA ILICH-ERNST
Represented By: AARON MICHAEL COHN
Represented By: SCOTT LANCE SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?