HUFF v. SWEARINGEN
Plaintiff: JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF
Defendant: RICHARD L SWEARINGEN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00564
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF. Amendment to #13 Response/Reply to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (FITZ, ANN)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE by JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF re #12 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority. (FITZ, ANN)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by RICHARD L SWEARINGEN re #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (OLIVELLA, MIGUEL)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/12/2020. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/17/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/30/19. (blb)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF. (FITZ, ANN)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RICHARD L SWEARINGEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-State's Response to Motion to Terminate Duty to Register, #2 Exhibit-Presentence Investigation, #3 Exhibit-Public Access to Court Insormation, #4 Exhibit-Criminal Court Case History, #5 Exhibit-Search Result, #6 Exhibit-Search Result, #7 Exhibit-Google Search, #8 Exhibit-Internet Crimes Against Children, #9 Exhibit-Suspended Sentence , #10 Exhibit-RedGage, #11 Exhibit-Registration Form, #12 Exhibit-Letter, #13 Exhibit-Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #14 Exhibit-Order on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment) (OLIVELLA, MIGUEL) Modified to include Exhibit Titles on 12/18/2019 (blb).
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by RICHARD L SWEARINGEN. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/31/2019). (OLIVELLA, MIGUEL)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF. RICHARD L SWEARINGEN served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (FITZ, ANN)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RICHARD L SWEARINGEN. (blb)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney ANN MARIE FITZ Re #1 COMPLAINT- For future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF Summons (FITZ, ANN)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge, Rule 5.1 by JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF (FITZ, ANN)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (FITZ, ANN)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4704296.), filed by JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minute Entry 12-29-05, #2 Exhibit B - Memo to Court, #3 Exhibit C - Minute Entry 2-27-06, #4 Exhibit D- Termination Jail Term, #5 Exhibit E - Travel Permit, #6 Exhibit F - Minute Entry 2-25-11, #7 Exhibit G - Order Restoring Civil Rights, #8 Exhibit H - FDLE Flyer, #9 Exhibit I - Email 3-13-18, #10 Exhibit J - DE Offer Letter, #11 Exhibit K - DE Separation, #12 Exhibit L - Kenco Offer, #13 Exhibit M - Kenco Rescinded Offer, #14 Exhibit N - IE Offer, #15 Exhibit O - Background Report, #16 Exhibit P - Offender Report) (FITZ, ANN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUFF v. SWEARINGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY "JERRY" HUFF
Represented By: ANN MARIE FITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD L SWEARINGEN
Represented By: MIGUEL A OLIVELLA, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?