HODGE et al v. TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC et al
Plaintiff: Royce Hodge and Martha Hodge
Defendant: SEF4LLC, Tide Tamer Industries, Inc., UNIFAB INC and TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00575
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Disclosure Pursuant to 26(a)(1) by TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC. (POAGE, STUART)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 26 Disclosures by MARTHA HODGE, ROYCE HODGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (KALEKO, TALLEY)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Full Medicare Billed Amounts by TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC. (POAGE, STUART)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 1/31/2020). (POAGE, STUART)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC (POAGE, STUART)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER, re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 3/24/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/14/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Mediation to take place by 4/7/2020. Mediation Report due by 4/21/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/26/2019. (kjw) *Case referred to mediation.
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (FOSTER, MATTHEW)
December 23, 2019 Set Discovery Status Report Deadline - Status Report due by 1/23/2020. (cle)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. In order to avoid any confusion about deadlines or extensions, this Court directs a party to refile in this case any motion that is pending in state court that the party wishes this Court to consider. The opposing party shall then file its response to the motion within 21 days of the filing of the motion. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/20/2019. (cle) Modified on 12/30/2019 to correct linking. (kjw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by MARTHA HODGE, ROYCE HODGE. (KALEKO, TALLEY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by MARTHA HODGE, ROYCE HODGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails) (KALEKO, TALLEY)
December 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #3 Scheduling Order. *Remaining Corp. Disclosure Stmts. not filed* (toy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC identifying Corporate Parent Tide Tamer for TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC.. (POAGE, STUART)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (POAGE, STUART)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/9/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/8/2020. Discovery due by 3/24/2020. Status Report due by 12/26/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/25/2019. (toy)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney STUART POAGE Re #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed. PLEASE FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (toy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tide Tamer Industries, Inc. from Hodge v Tide Tamer, case number 2019-000058-CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4714776.), filed by Tide Tamer Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (POAGE, STUART)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HODGE et al v. TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royce Hodge
Represented By: TALLEY LEE KALEKO
Represented By: MATTHEW K FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Hodge
Represented By: TALLEY LEE KALEKO
Represented By: MATTHEW K FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEF4LLC
Represented By: STEVEN M PURITZ
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN PARDIECK
Represented By: WILLIAM DENNIS HORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tide Tamer Industries, Inc.
Represented By: STUART CLARK POAGE, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIFAB INC
Represented By: JOSHUA CHRISTOPHER CANTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIDE TAMER INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: STUART CLARK POAGE, I
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ROY CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?