CHWALA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: PIOTR PETE CHWALA
Respondent: MICHAEL MEADE, JARED MILLER, CHAD WOLF and WILLIAM P BARR
Case Number: 4:2020cv00121
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
2 Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/28/20. R&R flag set. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 5/26/2020. (blb)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, Unable to Forward. Re: #7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. No Forwarding Address. (blb)
April 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #6 Mail Returned. (kjw)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Unable to Forward Re: #5 ORDER. No forwarding address. (blb)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2020. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:20cv121-WS/MAF. (amm)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED, and Petitioner is not required to pay the filing fee to proceed with this case. Petitioner shall have until 5/1/2020, in which to submit one additional copy of the petition for service purposes. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the receipt of the service copy, a notice of address change, or no later than 5/1/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/27/20. (blb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Refused Unable to Forward. Re: 3 Notice to Pro Se (blb) (blb)
March 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (blb)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PIOTR PETE CHWALA. (blb)*Page 13 of Complaint*
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P BARR, MICHAEL MEADE, JARED MILLER, CHAD WOLF, filed by PIOTR PETE CHWALA. (blb) *One copy with IFP Motion, No Fee Paid*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHWALA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL MEADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JARED MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PIOTR PETE CHWALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?