BRINSON v. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Defendant: FNU LEDBETTER, DAVID LNU, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and R. TOMLINSON
Petitioner: KIMBERLY BRINSON
Case Number: 4:2020cv00125
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00067. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 5 received.
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court, Northern District of Florida, Tallahassee Division for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/4/2020. (BIA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/6/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (BIA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/6/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(RLK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/6/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Kimberly Brinson. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/6/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Corrections, David LNU, FNU Ledbetter, R. Tomlinson with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly Brinson. (no service copies provided)(RLK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRINSON v. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LEDBETTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. TOMLINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIMBERLY BRINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?