CORINTI v. ASSET PLUS CORPORATION
Plaintiff: Shannon Corinti and ALLISON SANTO
Defendant: Asset Plus Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00173
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT - re: #10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Inasmuch as Plaintiffs have filed an amended complaint, ECF No. #19 , Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #10 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/1/2020. (cle)
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ASSET PLUS CORPORATION, filed by SHANNON CORINTI, ALLISON SANTO. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A) (ALLEN, AMANDA)
May 21, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ASSET PLUS CORPORATION. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #16 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her response to the motion to dismiss on or before 5/29/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/19/2020. (cle)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss by SHANNON CORINTI. (ALLEN, AMANDA)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADMITTING RAYMOND S. FRANKS II PRO HAC VICE - The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #13 , is GRANTED. Raymond S. Franks II is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/14/2020. (cle)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADMITTING JOHN W. BARRETT PRO HAC VICE - The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #12 , is GRANTED. John W. Barrett is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/14/2020. (cle)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond S. Franks II.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5211445.) by SHANNON CORINTI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Ray Franks, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the State of West Virginia, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion) (FRANKS, RAYMOND)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Barrett.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5211243.) by SHANNON CORINTI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for John W. Barrett from the State of West Virginia, #2 Exhibit Certification of John W. Barrett, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion) (BARRETT, JOHN)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/26/2020. Status Report due by 6/11/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/24/2020. Discovery due by 9/7/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/11/2020. (cle)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by ASSET PLUS CORPORATION. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/22/2020). (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHANNON CORINTI. ASSET PLUS CORPORATION served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (ALLEN, AMANDA)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by SHANNON CORINTI (ALLEN, AMANDA)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SHANNON CORINTI. (ALLEN, AMANDA)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ALLEN, AMANDA)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ASSET PLUS CORPORATION. (cle)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: TO ATTORNEY AMANDA ALLEN- re: #1 Complaint. In this District, party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cle)
April 8, 2020 CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK added. (cle)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER HELAINE JONES on behalf of Shannon Corinti (JONES, HEATHER)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM PEERCE HOWARD on behalf of Shannon Corinti (HOWARD, WILLIAM)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Asset Plus Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5041037.), filed by Shannon Corinti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (ALLEN, AMANDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORINTI v. ASSET PLUS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Corinti
Represented By: HEATHER HELAINE JONES
Represented By: AMANDA JAMISON ALLEN
Represented By: WILLIAM PEERCE HOWARD
Represented By: JOHN W BARRETT
Represented By: RAYMOND S FRANKS, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON SANTO
Represented By: AMANDA JAMISON ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Plus Corporation
Represented By: GEORGE TY LEVESQUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?