MENDOZA v. INCH et al
Plaintiff: GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA
Defendant: JOHN DOE 19, JOHN DOE 21, BRIAN LEACH, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 13, Z CULPEPPER, MARK INCH, JOHN DOE 16, JOHN DOE 18, C NEEL, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 15, SCOTT SIEGLER, JEROME COX, JOHN DOE 22, JOHN DOE 24, JOHN DOE 11, LARS SEVERSON, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 14, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 23, JOHN DOE 20, JOHN DOE 10, JOSEPH EDWARDS, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 9, THOMAS REID, S MILLIKEN, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 12 and JOHN DOE 17
Case Number: 4:2020cv00214
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motions for an emergency restraining order, ECF Nos. #14 - #15 , be DENIED and this case REMANDED to the undersigned for further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/24/20. R&R flag set. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/22/2020. (blb)
June 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Emergency Preliminary Injunction and #15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Second Emergency Preliminary Injunction. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Second Emergency Preliminary Injunction, filed by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA. (cle)
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Emergency Preliminary Injunction, filed by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA. (cle)
June 3, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #13 Memorandum in Support. (blb)
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Amended Complaint by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA. (blb)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file a second amended complaint as explained above. Plaintiff shall have until 7/3/2020, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's second amended complaint or no later than 7/3/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/2/20. (blb) *Form Provided*
June 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #11 Amended Complaint. (blb)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA. (blb)
May 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. Case is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (blb)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The report and recommendation #7 is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, ECF No. #3 , is DENIED. This case is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/26/20. (blb)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA FROM MARTIN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 1150 SW ALLPATTACH ROAD, INDIAN TOWN, FL 34956 TO WAKULLA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 110 MELLALEUCA ROAD, CRAWFORDVILLE, FL 32327. (blb) *REMAILED DOC #6 , #7 , & #8 *
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file the amended complaint as explained above. Plaintiff shall have until 6/2/2020, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint or no later than 6/2/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/1/20. (blb) *Form Provided*
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, ECF No. #3 , be DENIED and this case be REMANDED to the undersigned for further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/1/20.( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 5/29/2020.) (blb)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED to the extent the filing fee does not have to be prepaid. When funds become available, Plaintiff must make payments to the Court until the total amount of the $350.00 filing fee is paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order with appropriate cover letter, to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/1/20. (blb)
April 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to Pro Se (blb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA. (blb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Emergency Preliminary Injunction by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA. (blb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA. (blb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA. (blb)*No copies, No fee*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDOZA v. INCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN LEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 13
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z CULPEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C NEEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT SIEGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEROME COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 24
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARS SEVERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S MILLIKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE RICHARD MENDOZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?