SHAW v. WASTE PRO USA INC
Plaintiff: TOSHIRIO F SHAW
Defendant: WASTE PRO USA INC, SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC and PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00221
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR FILE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiff's Partially Consented Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint or to File Motion for Leave to Amend. ECF No. #17 . The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file his response to Defendant Waste Pro's Motion to Dismiss or may file his Motion for Leave to Amend on or before 7/2/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/24/20. (blb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Partially Consented) by TOSHIRIO F SHAW. (MATTOX, MARIE)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #13 EXTENSION OF TIMETO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Stipulation of the Plaintiff and Defendant PeopleReady Florida, Inc., which this Court has construed as a motion for extension of time to respond to the amended complaint. ECF No. #13 . The motion is GRANTED. Defendant PeopleReady may file its responsive pleading to the amended complaint on or before 7/17/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/18/2020. (rcb) (Main Document 16 replaced on 6/19/2020) (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 DEFENDANT SOUTHEAST PERSONNEL LEASING'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW (CRAIG, JADE) Modified to edit title on 6/19/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JADE A CRAIG on behalf of SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC (CRAIG, JADE)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint by PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC. (BLEAKLEY, ROBERT)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SPECIAL LIMITED APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (BLEAKLEY, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/19/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #3 Scheduling Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2020. None Filed. (blb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by WASTE PRO USA INC. (TINGLEY, AMY)
June 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/3/2020. (blb)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT (First Joint) by TOSHIRIO F SHAW. (MATTOX, MARIE)
June 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #3 Scheduling Order. Status Report Deadline Expired. (blb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC. and (Attachments: #1 PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC. (blb)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendants Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. #4 . Inasmuch as Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint, ECF No. #7 , Defendants motion to dismiss, ECF No. #4 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/26/20. (blb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against WASTE PRO USA INC, SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC, PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC, filed by TOSHIRIO F SHAW. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE. This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. ECF No. #5 . Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion on or before 5/22/2020). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/19/20. (blb)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by TOSHIRIO F SHAW. (MATTOX, MARIE)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by WASTE PRO USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Shannon Early) (TINGLEY, AMY)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2020. Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Status Report due by 5/30/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/30/20. (blb)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WASTE PRO USA INC. (TINGLEY, AMY)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WASTE PRO USA INC from Circuit Court in the Second Judicial Circuit in and for Gadsden Co Florida, case number 20000295CAA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5149280.), filed by WASTE PRO USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (TINGLEY, AMY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAW v. WASTE PRO USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOSHIRIO F SHAW
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE PRO USA INC
Represented By: AMY S TINGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC
Represented By: JADE A CRAIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC
Represented By: ROBERT W BLEAKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?