NIELSEN et al v. DESANTIS et al
Plaintiff: MORGAN OUTLAW, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, RAY DAVIS, PRIORITIES USA, ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS, INC., KIRK NIELSEN, REVEL LUBIN, BARBARA DEVANE, FELICIA BRUCE, DONESA JACKSON and ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC
Defendant: GLENDA B. WILLIAMS, ASHLEY MOODY, SHARON CHASON, SUSAN A. GILL, CHRISTINA WHITE, STARLET CANNON, CAROL F. RUDD, WILLIAM KEEN, DAVID H STAFFORD, TRAVIS HART, TOMMY DOYLE, LAURA HUTTO, LAUREL M LEE, DANA SOUTHERLAND, MARK EARLEY, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, PETER ANTONACCI, NITA CRAWFORD, DEBORAH K. OSBORNE, ALETRIS FARNAM, MARK F NEGLEY, DIANE SMITH, LORI SCOTT, PAUL STAMOULIS, BRENDA HOOTS, THE FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, THERISA MEADOWS, HEATHER RILEY, GERTRUDE WALKER, SHIRLEY ANDERSON, CHRIS ANDERSON, VICKY OAKES, RON DESANTIS, MICHAEL BENNETT, CONNIE SANCHEZ, KIM A BARTON, ELIZABETH P HORNE, ALAN HAYS, DIANE HAGEN, JOYCE GRIFFIN, BOBBY BEASLEY, SYLVIA D. STEPHENS, PAUL A. LUX, GINA MCDOWELL, TAPPIE A. VILLANE, WENDY SARTORY LINK, TAMMY JONES, BILL COWLES, BRIAN E. CORLEY, CHARLES OVERTURF, CRAIG LATIMER, VICKI DAVIS, MARY JANE ARRINGTON, MARK ANDERSEN, DEBORAH CLARK, LORI EDWARDS, TERRY VAUGHAN, HENRY WELLS, SHIRLEY G. KNIGHT, KAITI LENHART, WESLEY WILCOX, THOMAS R. HARDEE, LISA LEWIS, JOHN HANLON, RON TURNER, VICKI P. CANNON, MIKE HOGAN, PENNY OGG, MARTY BISHOP, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CLAY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, FLAGLER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, JEFFERSON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, WALTON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, GADSDEN COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, SUMTER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, DESOTO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, BRIAN E CORLEY, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, SUSAN A GILL, HENDRY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, LEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, LEON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, DIXIE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, LAFAYETTE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, TAYLOR COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, NASSAU COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, SUWANNEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, HOLMES COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, BROWARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, BAKER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, DUVAL COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, SARASOTA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, HERNANDO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, GULF COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, BAY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, CAROL F RUDD, WAKULLA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, ESCAMBIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, FRANKLIN COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, CITRUS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, HAMILTON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, BREVARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, ORANGE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, ST JOHNS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, MONROE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, MADISON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, HARDEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, BRADFORD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, GLADES COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, CHARLOTTE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, VOLUSIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, SANTA ROSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, VICKI P CANNON, THOMAS R HARDEE, PALM BEACH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, SEMINOLE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, LIBERTY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, LAKE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, OSCEOLA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, MANATEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, ST LUCIE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, LEVY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, PUTNAM COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, COLLIER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, PINELLAS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, TAPPIE A VILLANE, GLENDA B WILLIAMS, GILCHRIST COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, WASHINGTON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, INDIAN RIVER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, MARTIN COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, PASCO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, PAUL A LUX, UNION COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, MARION COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, OKEECHOBEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, JACKSON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, POLK COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, CALHOUN COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, COLUMBIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD and HIGHLANDS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Consolidated Plaintiff: CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, MURRAY HELLER, DREAM DEFENDERS, ZEBRA COALITION, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, ACACIA WILLIAMS, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND and JUDITH A BROWNE-DIANIS
Intervenor Defendant: REPUBLICAN PARTY OF FLORIDA, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NAITONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE and NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE
Intervenor: CARL F MCCOY, JAMES K KRACHT, DOUGLAS E HALL, DEBORAH C GRUBB, REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATIONS, FLORIDA COUNCIL OF THE BLIND and DOLOR GINCHEREAU
Case Number: 4:2020cv00236
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. The motion for voluntary dismissal, ECF No. #619 , is granted. The clerk must enter judgment in Case No. 1:20cv67 stating, "This judgment is entered under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 and resolves all remaining claims among all parties. It is adjudged that the claims of the intervening plaintiffs Deborah C. Grubb, Douglas E. Hall, Carl F. McCoy, James K. Kracht, Dolor Ginchereau, and the Florida Council of the Blind are dismissed with prejudice." The clerk must close both of the consolidated casesCases No. 4:20cv236 and 1:20cv67. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 08/05/2020. (rcb)
August 4, 2020 Filing 619 PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 8/5/2020 (rcb).
July 27, 2020 Filing 618 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Video Status Conference held on 7/27/2020. Court hears statements from parties regarding settlement. Ruling by Court: An order of dismissal will be entered when the appropriate documents have been filed by the parties. (Court Reporter Judy Gagnon) (ckm)
July 26, 2020 Filing 617 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK: Settlement Conference held on 7/26/2020. (amm)
July 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER setting a status conference and continuing the trial. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/26/20. (RH)
July 26, 2020 Filing 615 Joint Notice of Settlement by CHRIS ANDERSON, PETER ANTONACCI, MICHAEL BENNETT, BRIAN E CORLEY, TOMMY DOYLE, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, JOYCE GRIFFIN, ALAN HAYS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, WESLEY WILCOX (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 7/27/2020 (rcb).
July 24, 2020 Filing 614 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK: Settlement Conference held on 7/24/2020. (amm)
July 24, 2020 Filing 612 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #609 Order. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 10/22/2020 (rcb)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 613 RULE 54(b) DETERMINATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUED USE OF CONSOLIDATED DOCKET. All filings should continue to be made only in the consolidated docket, with the exceptions noted in the original order consolidating the cases for case management purposes. See Order of May 26, 2020, ECF No. #67 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/23/2020. (rcb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 611 Sealed Document. (amm)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER SETTING VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: The settlement conference will take place by video conference on 7/24/2020 commencing at 9:00 AM. Instructions for participating in the conference will be provided by the Clerk. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/21/2020. (amm)
July 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #609 Order. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER DISMISSING THE NIELSEN AND WILLIAMS CLAIMS AND REFERRING THE GRUBB CLAIM FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Nielsen plaintiffs' motion to voluntarily dismiss, ECF No. #603 , is granted. The clerk must enter judgments in each of the consolidated actions that, as appropriate in the specific action, (a) dismiss all claims of the plaintiffs Acacia Williams and Bianca Maria Baez without prejudice, (b) dismiss all claims of the plaintiff Zebra Coalition for lack of jurisdiction, (c) dismiss all claims against the Florida Elections Canvassing Commission in its name for lack of jurisdiction, (d) dismiss, with prejudice as to the state-level defendants and without prejudice as to the county-level defendants, the Williams plaintiffs' claim challenging the failure to provide an accessible method for virtually or manually impaired voters to cast a private and independent mail ballot, and (e) dismiss all other claims of the Nielsen and Williams plaintiffs with prejudice. The trial of the Grubb plaintiffs' claim is continued to 7/27/2020 10:00 AM , at 10:00 a.m. The motion for a settlement conference before a magistrate judge, ECF Nos. #597 and #598 , is granted. The Grubb plaintiffs' claim is referred to Magistrate Judge Martin A. Fitzpatrick for a settlement conference. The Grubb plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #586 , for leave to file a supplemental trial brief is granted. The state defendants motion, ECF No. #587 , to supplement their exhibit list is granted. The Grubb plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #594 , to amend their exhibit list, witness list, and deposition designations is granted. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/20/2020. (rcb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 608 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 7/20/2020 before Judge Robert L. Hinkle. Court Reporter: Judy Gagnon, Telephone number: 850-561-6822. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2020. (kjw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 607 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting #593 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Katie Scott is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Dream Defenders Plaintiffs pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/20/2020. (jcw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 605 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by MANATEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (POLK, DOUGLAS)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER granting #584 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John Ulin is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/20/2020. (jcw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 603 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 20, 2020 Filing 602 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2020 by video. Court hears statements from parties regarding settlement, and argument of counsel on Motion for Settlement Conference and Motion for Leave. Ruling by Court: Nielsen and Williams Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed. Grubb Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Supplement is granted. Magistrate Judge will conduct settlement conference. Trial is continued to July 27 at 10:00 a.m. An order will follow. (Court Reporter Judy Gagnon) (ckm)
July 20, 2020 Filing 601 Notice of Filing Settlement (Filing of Settlement Agreement) by LAUREL M LEE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 20, 2020 **ATTORNEY ADMISSION DEADLINE SET FOR GILDA DANIELS JUDITH A. BROWNE DIANIS RE: 7/15/2020 STAFF NOTE (rcb)**
July 19, 2020 Filing 600 SIXTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 19, 2020 Filing 599 NOTICE OF HEARING - The motion for settlement conference will be heard at 10:00 a.m. prior to the bench trial on 7/20/2020 before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. (sms)
July 19, 2020 Filing 598 PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Corrected Certificate of Compliance). (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 19, 2020 Filing 597 PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 19, 2020 Filing 596 NOTICE OF FILING INTERVENORS' REVISED TRIAL EXHIBITS LIST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 57 - Email to J. Kennedy 2/7/2020, #2 Exhibit 2-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 58 - Email to Kracht and Young 2/7/2020, #3 Exhibit 3-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 59 - Email from Kracht 2/7/2020, #4 Exhibit 4-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 61 - Email to L. Hastings 5/22/2020, #5 Exhibit 5-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 62 - Draft Final Report 5/22/2020, #6 Exhibit 6-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 63 - Draft Final Report to Hastings 5/22/2020, #7 Exhibit 7-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 64- Email to Volusia SOE 5/27/2020, #8 Exhibit 8-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 65 - EAC Plans for Use of CARES Act Report, #9 Exhibit 9-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 67- CARES Act funding per county, #10 Exhibit 10-Email from Matthews to Mathes and Hastings 2/19/2019, #11 Exhibit 11-Email from Hastings to Matthews to and Halter 6/12/2019, #12 Exhibit 12-Letter to Ms. Harrington from Secretary of State 5/15/2020, #13 Exhibit 13-Email from Dover to Kennedy, Fitz, Matthews and Marconnet 6/25/2020, #14 Exhibit 14-U.S. Election Assistance Commission- Voting by Mail/ Absentee Voting 7/1/2020, #15 Exhibit 15-Email of Finney Dated 7/16 sent to all supervisors including Debbie Osborn, #16 Exhibit 16-Attachment one to Email of Finney Dated 7/16 OmniBallot Brochure, #17 Exhibit 17-Attachment two to Email of Finney Dated 7/16 OmniBallot Price List, #18 Exhibit 18-Declaration of Bryan Finney DE 230-3, #19 Exhibit 19-Declaration of Bryan Finney DE 351-1, #20 Exhibit 20-Final Certification Report July 2020 (DE 587-3), #21 Exhibit 21-Letter from Maria Matthews July 16, 2020. (DE 587-4), #22 Exhibit 22-Florida EBDS Specifications Rev. 5) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 19, 2020 Filing 595 JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 19, 2020 Filing 594 PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PRE-TRIAL EXHIBIT, WITNESS LIST AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Deposition Designation of Bryan Finney, #2 Exhibit B-Stipulations, #3 Exhibit C-Intervenors Revised Trial Exhibits) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 19, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #584 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Ulin.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5499818.), #593 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katie Scott.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5502006.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 593 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5502006.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (SCOTT, KATIE) Modified to edit title on 7/19/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 592 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 591 FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF. (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 590 NINE SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BE DISMISSED AS DEFENDANTS WITH REGARD TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT'S CHALLENGES TO THE "VOTER ASSISTANCE BAN" AS MOOT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (LAVIA, JOHN) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 589 DEFENDANT CITRUS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO CITRUS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' POSITIONS (SCOTT, DALE) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER granting #572 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jackson Chin is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/17/2020. (jcw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 587 STATE DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 35- Updated Department of State Review Form, #2 Exhibit 36- M. Matthews emails, #3 Exhibit 37- Final Qualification Test Report, #4 Exhibit 38- Division of Elections interim approval letter) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 586 PLAINTIFF -INTERVENORS' AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF WITH UPDATED CERTIFICATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Supplemental Trial Brief) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 585 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN STATE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ADD USPS-RELATED EXHIBITS AND SUPPLEMENT THEIR WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 584 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5499818.) by DREAM DEFENDERS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (ULIN, JOHN) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 583 STATE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ADD USPS-RELATED EXHIBITS AND SUPPLEMENT THEIR WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 582 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS (PROCACCINI, RACHEL) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 581 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT AND SUPPLEMENT WITNESS LIST. (TORCHINSKY, JASON) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 580 SIX SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BE DISMISSED AS DEFENDANTS WITH REGARD TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT'S CHALLENGES TO THE "VOTER ASSISTANCE BAN" AS MOOT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 579 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT TRIAL EXHIBITS AND TO SUPPLEMENT WITNESS LIST TO TO LAY FOUNDATION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Stand-Up Memo, #2 Exhibit 2 - G. Longergan Decl.) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 578 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BE DISMISSED AS DEFENDANTS WITH REGARD TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS CHALLENGES TO THE "VOTER ASSISTANCE BAN" AS MOOT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 577 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN THE HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BE DISMISSED AS DEFENDANTS WITH REGARD TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT'S CHALLENGES TO THE "VOTER ASSISTANCE BAN" AS MOOT WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 576 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BE DISMISSED AS DEFENDANTS WITH REGARD TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT'S CHALLENGES TO THE "VOTER ASSISTANCE BAN" AS MOOT WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 575 GLENDA WILLIAMS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL NEILSEN PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT #208 [ECF No. #519 -10]. (CUFFE, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 574 PLAINTIFF -INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 572 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Jackson Chin.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5497342.) by DREAM DEFENDERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate - J Chin) (CHIN, JACKSON) Modified edit title on 7/16/2020 (rcb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 571 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTY DONOVAN PEMBERTON on behalf of PINELLAS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (PEMBERTON, CHRISTY)
July 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #572 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 573 PRETRIAL ORDER. The Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE remains scheduled, and will be conducted by video. The attorneys must confer on the admissibility of declarations and on objections to exhibits. A notice of any agreements should be filed by 7/17/2020 if possible. These motions in limine are denied: ECF Nos. #396 , #458 , #460 , #474 , #476 , #477 , #485 , and #486 . Summary judgment is granted for all defendants on the Williams plaintiffs' claim under Voting Rights Act 203. The plaintiff Bianca Maria Baezs oral motion to voluntarily dismiss her claims is granted. All Ms. Baezs claims are dismissed without prejudice.The Nielsen plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #561 , to supplement their exhibit list is granted. The defendant DeSoto Supervisors motion, ECF No. #513 , to clarify or amend the July 6 summary-judgment ruling is denied as moot. The defendant Supervisors of Elections may file by 7/17/2020 a supplemental trial brief addressing the Secretary of States interim approval of Democracy Live OmniBallot. I do not direct the entry of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) on any of the claims resolved by this order. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/15/2020. (rcb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 570 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL (BLEDSOE, WILLIAM) Modified to edit title on 7/16/2020 (rcb).
July 15, 2020 Filing 569 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Video Pretrial Conference held on 7/15/2020. Court addresses issues and hears argument on Motion to Supplement Trial Exhibits. Court conducts pretrial conference and discusses best practices for conducting trial by video. Ruling by Court: Nielsen Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement Trial Exhibits is granted. Trial will begin July 20 at 10:00 a.m. Trial will begin at 9:00 a.m. the remainder of the trial period. An order will follow. (Court Reporter Judy Gagnon) (ckm)
July 15, 2020 Filing 568 INTERVENORS' AMENDED RULE 26 (a)(3) DISCLOSURES. (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 15, 2020 Filing 566 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FLORIDA COUNCIL OF THE BLIND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' RESPONSE TO SECRETARY OF STATE'S NOTICE OF INTERIM APPROVAL OF DEMOCRACY LIVE OMNIBALLOT SYSTEM #563 (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 15, 2020 Filing 565 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT TRIAL EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DD Exhibit 115 - VBM Requests 2018 General, #2 Exhibit DD Exhibit 216 - Affidavit of Paulina Hernandez Morales, #3 Exhibit DD Exhibit 217 - Hernandez Morales Responses to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit DD Exhibit 218 - Affidavit of Celcio Romero) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 15, 2020 Filing 564 SIX SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN STATE DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES, (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 Filing 563 PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' RESPONSE SECRETARY OF STATE'S NOTICE OF INTERIM APPROVAL OF DEMOCRACY LIVE OMNIBALLOT SYSTEM ECF #562 (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 Filing 562 SECRETARY OF STATE'S NOTICE OF INTERIM APPROVAL OF DEMOCRACY LIVE OMNIBALLOT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Division of Elections Interim Approval of Democracy Live OmniBallot), #2 Exhibit B (Final Qualification Test Report of Democracy Live OmniBallot), #3 Exhibit C (Correspondence to Democracy Live and Supervisors of Elections)) (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 Filing 561 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT TRIAL EXHIBITS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS July 7 2020 OIG Report) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER granting #248 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Shawn T. Sheehy is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Intervenor-Defendants RNC, NRCC, and RPOF pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/14/2020. (jcw)
July 14, 2020 Filing 559 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN STATE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (ECF No. #547 ) (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 Filing 558 DEFENDANTS PAUL LUX, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN STATE DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (STEWART, GREGORY) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 Filing 557 9 SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN STATE DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (ECF No. #547 ) (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 Filing 556 DEFENDANTS PAUL LUX, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN STATE DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 Filing 555 NOTICE 9 Supervisors of Elections' Notice of Joinder in State Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (ECF No. 547) by MARK EARLEY (LAVIA, JOHN)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting #552 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jess Unger is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Dream Defender Plaintiffs pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/14/2020. (jcw)
July 14, 2020 Filing 553 Summons Issued as to JIMMY PETRONIS, RON DESANTIS & ASHLEY MOODY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued-Ashley Moody, #2 Exhibit Summons Issued-Ron Desantis) (rcb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 552 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE.(Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5485410.) by DREAM DEFENDERS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix VA Bar Certificate of Good Standing) (UNGER, JESS) Modified to edit title on 7/15/2020 (rcb).
July 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #248 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shawn T. Sheehy.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5350910.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
July 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #552 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jess Unger.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5485410.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 567 Sealed (rcb) Modified to edit filing date on 7/17/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 551 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO DEFENDANTS DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Deposition of Dream Defenders, #2 Exhibit B Deposition of New Florida Majority EF, #3 Exhibit C Deposition of Organize Florida EF, #4 Exhibit D Deposition of Bianca Baez, #5 Exhibit E Deposition of Celcio Romero, #6 Exhibit F Deposition of Sheila Young, #7 Exhibit G Deposition of Christina White, #8 Exhibit H Deposition of Murray Heller) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 550 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATIONS WITNESSES WHOSE TESTIMONY SHALL BE PRESENTED BY DEPOSITION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Lisa Lewis, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Celcio Romero) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 549 OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO THE PLAINTIFFS' AND INTERVENORS' TRIAL BRIEFS (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 548 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' NOTICE OF PROSPECTIVE JOINDER IN STATE DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (NORDBY, DANIEL) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 547 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS AND PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Nielsen Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B- Objections to Dream Defenders' Exhibit Lists, #3 Exhibit C- Objections to Nielsen Plaintiffs Exhibit Lists, #4 Exhibit D- Objections to Plaintiff-Intervenors' Exhibit List) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 546 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN NIELSON PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS PROFFERED TRIAL EXHIBITS (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 545 NOTICE of Summonses to be Issued by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summons DeSantis, #2 Appendix Summons Moody, #3 Appendix Summons Petronis) (NAIFEH, STUART)
July 13, 2020 Filing 544 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PRETRIAL BRIEFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Lubin Depo. Trans. Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - G. Cecil Depo. Trans. Excerpt, #3 Exhibit 3 - M. Matthews Depo. Trans. Excerpt, #4 Exhibit 4 - USPS July 7, 2020 OIG Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - R. Davis Depo. Trans. Excerpt, #6 Exhibit 6 - D. Jackson Depo. Trans. Excerpt, #7 Exhibit 7 - C. Latimer Depo. Trans. Excerpt, #8 Exhibit 8 - M. Vilar Depo. Trans Excerpt) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 543 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO TRIAL BRIEFS OF SECRETARY OF STATE, ATTORNEY GENERAL, INDIVIDUAL FLORIDA CANVASSING COMMISSIONERS AND FIFTY THREE COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS (ECF No. #391 ); TRIAL BRIEF OF DEFENDANT, HERNANDO COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS SHIRLEY ANDERSON (ECF No. #385 ); MIAMI-DADE DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF AND , IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. #390 ); AND SIX SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS TRIAL BRIEF (ECF No. #379 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Romero Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Lewis Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Gilmer Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Porta Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - Mercado Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - Young Deposition) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 542 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF J. MORGAN KOUSSER, Ph. D.. (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 541 TEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Chris Anderson, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Jennifer Edwards) (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 540 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO STATE DEFENDANTS IDENTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY (ECF No. #487 -1) AND NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (ECF No. #530 ). (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 539 INTERVENORS' NOTICE OF JOINDER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL EXHIBITS (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 538 SIXTY-FIVE SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Chris Anderson, #2 Exhibit B - Election Dates and Activities Calendar, #3 Exhibit C - OmniBallot Online Agreement) (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 537 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' PROFFERED TRIAL EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Objections to Defs' Proffered Trial Exhibits) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 536 RESPONSE OPPOSING REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' MOTION TO STRIKE REBUTTAL REPORT OF MICHAEL C. HERRON AND MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE NEW EXPERT OPINIONS. (VELEZ, ALEXI) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 535 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL BRIEF(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Grand Jury Report) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 534 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. BRAD LOCKERBIE (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 533 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript of Ion Sancho, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Trancsript of Guy Cecil, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition Transcript of Marcos Vilar, #4 Exhibit D - Deposition Transcript of William Sauers) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 532 STATE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL K. PLUNKETT(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plunkett Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B- Plunkett Depo. Ex. 4, #3 Exhibit C- Plunkett Depo. Transcript Excerpts) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 531 STATE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. M.V. HOOD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Hood Deposition Transcript Excerpts) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 530 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATED DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS (Attachments: #1 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Dream Defenders, #2 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff New Florida Majority, #3 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Alianza for Progress, #4 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, #5 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Priorities USA, #6 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Baez, #7 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Romero, #8 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Romero, #9 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Nielsen, #10 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Outlaw, #11 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Lubin, #12 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Bruce, #13 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Devane, #14 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Davis, #15 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Jackson, #16 Deposition Designation of Plaintiffs' Expert Ball, #17 Deposition Designation of Supervisor White, #18 Deposition Designation of Democracy Live CEO Finney, #19 Deposition Designation of Plaintiff Heller) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 529 NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL ON BEHALF OF Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 528 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF NO. #393 ) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/14/2020 (rcb).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER SEALING ECF NO. 392-10.The plaintiff Organize Florida Education Fund's unopposed motion to seal, ECF No. #397 , is granted. The clerk must maintain ECF No. #392 -10 under seal until otherwise ordered. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/13/2020. (rcb)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER ACCEPTING LATE FILINGS.The state defendants' and the Nielsen plaintiffs' motion for leave to accept specific late filings, ECF No. #503 , is granted. The filings are accepted as timely. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/13/2020. (rcb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 525 SIX SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN TRIAL BRIEFS FILED BY STATE DEFENDANTS AND ALL SUPERVISORS' OF ELECTIONS (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/13/2020 (rcb).
July 12, 2020 Filing 524 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO STATE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPLEMENTAL & REBUTTAL REPORT OF DR. DANIEL A. SMITH AND MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure, #2 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Daniel A. Smith) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/13/2020 (rcb).
July 11, 2020 Filing 523 NOTICE OF AMENDED DECLARATION OF BIANCA MARIA BAEZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Declaration Bianca M Baez) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA) Modified to edit title on 7/13/2020 (rcb).
July 10, 2020 Filing 522 NOTICE OF DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) Exhibits #187 - #215 (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 187.A. Marconnet Email - re: VAH Info, #3 Exhibit 188.Election Infrastructure GCC and SCC Joint COVID-19 Working Group Guidance Resources, #4 Exhibit 189.L. Lee Email - NASS Elections Committee Call, #5 Exhibit 190.M. Matthews Email - ALF-Polling Location -Pollworkers, #6 Exhibit 191.Assisted Living Facilities, #7 Exhibit 192.M. Early Email - RE_ Q re Polling Locations (Assisted Living Facilities_Poll workers, etc.), #8 Exhibit 193.B. Cowles Email - FW Q re Polling Locations (Assisted Living Facilities Poll workers etc), #9 Exhibit 194.M. Matthews Email - FW Updated Request for Information re Continuing Care Assisted Living Facilities, #10 Exhibit 195.M. Matthews Email - Volusia County Updated Request for Information re Continuing Care Assisted Living Facilities, #11 Exhibit 196.ACLU of Florida Report - Let Florida Vote FINAL, #12 Exhibit 197.Stafford Email - RE EXTERNAL RE Let Florida Vote - ACLU Report, #13 Exhibit 198.A. Marconnet Email - RE Other (flsenate.gov) (1), #14 Exhibit 199.20200518_Commmunications-Review-Form_OmniBallot-signed, #15 Exhibit 200.Directive 2018-03, #16 Exhibit 201.B. Dover Email - Re Voting System Request - Democracy Live, #17 Exhibit 202.20200312- SOE Mnthly Conf Call Agenda - Note Details, #18 Exhibit 203.0708_001.pdf, #19 Exhibit 204.A. McComb Email - All EV Model, #20 Exhibit 205.J. Modrow Email - RE Gulf County Early Voting, #21 Exhibit 206.P. Lux Email - Re Thoughts on an Emergency Order from the Governor (1), #22 Exhibit 207.C. Anderson Email - RE PPP election and issues going forward., #23 Exhibit 208.M. Early Email - Re PPP election and issues going forward, #24 Exhibit 209.M. Anderson Email - RE_ Request for information, #25 Exhibit 210.Voter Registration Monthly Report-February 2016, #26 Exhibit 211.Voter Registration Monthly Report-March 2016, #27 Exhibit 212.Voter Registration Applications-January 2020, #28 Exhibit 213.Voter Registration Monthly Report-April 2016, #29 Exhibit 214.Register To Vote - Dream Defenders, #30 Exhibit 215.Voter Registration Monthly Report-January 2016) (KARPATKIN, JEREMY) Modified to edit title on 7/13/2020 (rcb).
July 10, 2020 Filing 521 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/13/2020 (rcb).
July 10, 2020 Filing 520 PLAINTIFF_INTERVENORS' RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANT, HERNANDO COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS SHIRLEY ANDERSON'S TRIAL BRIEF [DE 385] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-OmniBallot Contract) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/13/2020 (rcb).
July 10, 2020 Filing 519 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits 199-220 of Trial Exhibit List by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 199 - Obrecht Apr. 30, 2020 Email, #2 Exhibit 200 - Germann June 15, 2020 Email, #3 Exhibit 201 - Lynch Mar. 11, 2020 Email, #4 Exhibit 202 - Axelson Mar. 14, 2020 Email, #5 Exhibit 203 - Komadin Mar. 12, 2020 Email, #6 Exhibit 204 - Lewis Mar. 4, 2020 Email, #7 Exhibit 205 - Wright May 22, 2020 Email, #8 Exhibit 206 - McCune June 18, 2020 Email, #9 Exhibit 207 - 2020 FSE Workshop Agenda, #10 Exhibit 208 - Rejected 2016 & 2018 VBM Ballots, #11 Exhibit 209 - Hays Apr. 3, 2019 Email (with hyperlink), #12 Exhibit 210 - FSASE July 1, 2019 Email, #13 Exhibit 211 - Labasky Mar. 24, 2020 Email, #14 Exhibit 212 - Stephens Mar. 25, 2020 Email Exchange, #15 Exhibit 213 - DOS Mar. 12, 2020 Agenda (internal), #16 Exhibit 214 - DOS Mar. 12, 2020 Agenda, #17 Exhibit 215 - DOS May 7, 2020 Agenda, #18 Exhibit 216 - DOS June 25, 2020 Agenda, #19 Exhibit 217 - DOS May28, 2020 Agenda, #20 Exhibit 218 - DOS May 7, 2020 Agenda (short version), #21 Exhibit 219 - DOS June 25, 2020 Agenda (short version), #22 Exhibit 220 - DOS June 25, 2020 Agenda) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 10, 2020 Filing 518 DEFENDANT MARION COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' POSITIONS (MINTER, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/13/2020 (rcb).
July 10, 2020 Filing 517 DEFENDANT, SHIRLEY ANDERSON'S, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO INTERVENORS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 7/12/2020 (rcb).
July 9, 2020 Filing 516 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD A LABASKY on behalf of COLLIER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, LEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (LABASKY, RONALD)
July 8, 2020 Filing 515 DEFENDANTS, ORANGE COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND ORANGE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT (ECF NO. #121 -1) (SHANNIN, NICHOLAS) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 8, 2020 Filing 514 NOTICE of Appearance by AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN on behalf of MARK ANDERSEN, BOBBY BEASLEY, STARLET CANNON, VICKI P CANNON, SHARON CHASON, NITA CRAWFORD, TRAVIS HART, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, WILLIAM KEEN, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, GINA MCDOWELL, MARK F NEGLEY, VICKY OAKES, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CHARLES OVERTURF, HEATHER RILEY, CAROL F RUDD, DANA SOUTHERLAND, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A VILLANE, HENRY WELLS, GLENDA B WILLIAMS (SHERMAN, AUSTIN)
July 8, 2020 Filing 513 MARK F. NEGLEY'S MOTION TO CLARIFY OR AMEND JULY 6, 2020 ORDER #418 (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 8, 2020 Filing 512 DEFENDANT SUSAN GILL'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (SCOTT, DALE) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 8, 2020 Filing 511 DEFENDANT SUSAN GILL'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT (SCOTT, DALE) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 8, 2020 Filing 510 DEFENDANT SUSAN GILL'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by SUSAN A GILL. (SCOTT, DALE) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 509 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Defendants' Amended Deposition Designations) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 508 DEFENDANTS, ORANGE COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND ORANGE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF (ECF NO. #341 -1) (SHANNIN, NICHOLAS) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 507 SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS RON TURNER AND SARASOTA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (BENTLEY, MORGAN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 506 DEFENDANT SUSAN GILL'S TRIAL BRIEF(SCOTT, DALE) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 505 PLAINTIFF_INTERVENORS' RESPONSE TO THE SECRETARY OF STATE'S TRIAL BRIEF [DE #391 ] (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 504 INTERVENORS' NOTICE OF FILING CORRECTED TRIAL EXHIBITS LIST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Deposition of Maria Matthews, #2 Exhibit 2-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 37, #3 Exhibit 3-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 38, #4 Exhibit 4-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 39, #5 Exhibit 5-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 40, #6 Exhibit 6-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 41, #7 Exhibit 7-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 42, #8 Exhibit 8-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 43, #9 Exhibit 9-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 44, #10 Exhibit 10-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 45, #11 Exhibit 11-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 46, #12 Exhibit 12-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 47, #13 Exhibit 13-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 48, #14 Exhibit 14-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 49, #15 Exhibit 15-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 50, #16 Exhibit 16-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 51, #17 Exhibit 17-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 53, #18 Exhibit 18-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 54, #19 Exhibit 19-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 55, #20 Exhibit 20-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 56, #21 Exhibit 21-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 57, #22 Exhibit 22-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 58, #23 Exhibit 23-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 59, #24 Exhibit 24-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 61, #25 Exhibit 25-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 62, #26 Exhibit 26-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 63, #27 Exhibit 27-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 64, #28 Exhibit 28-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 65, #29 Exhibit 29-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 66, #30 Exhibit 30-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 67, #31 Exhibit 31-Deposition of Maria Matthews Ex 69, #32 Exhibit 32-Email from NFB to Matthews 6/26/2017, #33 Exhibit 33-Email from Matthews to Underwood 6/8/2018, #34 Exhibit 34-Email from Matthews to Mathes and Hastings 2/19/2019, #35 Exhibit 35-Email from Matthews to Rivera and Hastings 5/13/2019, #36 Exhibit 36-Email from Hastings to Matthews to and Halter 6/12/2019, #37 Exhibit 37-Email from Harris to Matthews 11/12/2019, #38 Exhibit 38-Email from FCB to Matthews and Young 2/6/2020, #39 Exhibit 39-Email from Harris to Matthews and Hastings 2/12/2020, #40 Exhibit 40-Email from Rivera to Matthews and Hastings 5/18/2020, #41 Exhibit 41-Email from Matthews to Hastings 6/5/2019, #42 Exhibit 42-Email from Marconnet to Matthews and Kennedy 6/16/2020, #43 Exhibit 43-Letter to Ms. Harrington from Secretary of State 5/15/2020, #44 Exhibit 44-Email from Matthews to Hastings 6/25/2020, #45 Exhibit 45-Email from Dover to Kennedy, Fitz, Matthews and Marconnet 6/25/2020, #46 Exhibit 46-U.S. Election Assistance Commission -2020 CARES Act Grant FAQs 7/1/2020, #47 Exhibit 47-U.S. Election Assistance Commission- Voting by Mail/ Absentee Voting 7/1/2020) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 503 THE STATE LEVEL DEFENDANTS AND NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' JOINT1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND ACCEPT THEIR RESPECTIVE OUT-OF-TIME PRETRIAL FILINGS (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 502 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Witness List, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit List) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 501 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS 137198 OF TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 137-1 - Brevard Cty May 14, 2020 Emails, #2 Exhibit 137-2 - Brevard Cty May 14, 2020 Emails, #3 Exhibit 137-3 - Brevard Cty May 14, 2020 Emails, #4 Exhibit 138-1 - B. Philbrook May 14, 2020 Emails, #5 Exhibit 138-2 - B. Philbrook May 14, 2020 Emails, #6 Exhibit 138-3 - B. Philbrook May 14, 2020 Emails, #7 Exhibit 139 - Martin Cty May 22, 2020 Email, #8 Exhibit 140-1 DHS June 1, 2020 Email, #9 Exhibit 140-2 DHS June 1, 2020 Email, #10 Exhibit 140-3 DHS June 1, 2020 Email, #11 Exhibit 141 - S. Healy June 3, 2020 Email, #12 Exhibit 142 - Hillsborough Cty June 11, 2020 Emails, #13 Exhibit 143 - D. Griffin June 15, 2020 Emails, #14 Exhibit 144 - Miami-Dade June 16, 2020 Draft COVID Res., #15 Exhibit 145 - DOE June 17, 2020 Email, #16 Exhibit 146 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (1), #17 Exhibit 147-1 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (2), #18 Exhibit 147-2 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (2), #19 Exhibit 147-3 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (2), #20 Exhibit 147-4 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (2), #21 Exhibit 147-5 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (2), #22 Exhibit 147-6 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (2), #23 Exhibit 148 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (3), #24 Exhibit 149 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (4), #25 Exhibit 150 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (5), #26 Exhibit 151 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (6), #27 Exhibit 152-1 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #28 Exhibit 152-2 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #29 Exhibit 152-3 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #30 Exhibit 152-4 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #31 Exhibit 152-5 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #32 Exhibit 152-6 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #33 Exhibit 152-7 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #34 Exhibit 152-8 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #35 Exhibit 152-9 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #36 Exhibit 152-10 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #37 Exhibit 152-11 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #38 Exhibit 152-12 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (7), #39 Exhibit 153 - Brevard Rejected Aug. 2018 Ballots (8), #40 Exhibit 154 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (1), #41 Exhibit 155-1 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #42 Exhibit 155-2 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #43 Exhibit 155-3 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #44 Exhibit 155-4 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #45 Exhibit 155-5 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #46 Exhibit 155-6 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #47 Exhibit 155-7 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #48 Exhibit 155-8 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #49 Exhibit 155-9 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #50 Exhibit 155-10 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #51 Exhibit 155-11 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #52 Exhibit 155-12 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #53 Exhibit 155-13 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #54 Exhibit 155-14 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #55 Exhibit 155-15 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #56 Exhibit 155-16 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #57 Exhibit 155-17 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #58 Exhibit 155-18 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #59 Exhibit 155-19 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (2), #60 Exhibit 156 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (3), #61 Exhibit 157 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (4), #62 Exhibit 158 - Brevard Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots (5), #63 Exhibit 159 - Holmes Cty Rejected Nov. 2018 Ballots, #64 Exhibit 160 - Holmes Cty Rejected Mar. 2020 Ballots, #65 Exhibit 161 - T. Jones Dep. Exh. 8, #66 Exhibit 162 - C. White Dep. Exh. D, #67 Exhibit 163 - T. Jones Dep. Exh. 4, #68 Exhibit 164 - T. Jones Dep. Exh. 10, #69 Exhibit 165 - T. Jones Dep. Exh. 13, #70 Exhibit 166 - C. Latimer Dep. Exh. 9, #71 Exhibit 167 - Flagler 2018 Voter Guide, #72 Exhibit 168 - Holmes 2019-2020 Voter Guide, #73 Exhibit 169 - Flagler 2019 Voter Guide, #74 Exhibit 170 - Fla. Voter Hotline 2020 Manual, #75 Exhibit 171 - Sample VBM Ballot & Envelope, #76 Exhibit 172 - Hendry Cty VBM FAQs, #77 Exhibit 173 - Miami-Dade Cty 2018 Presentation, #78 Exhibit 174 - Holmes Cty Rejection Form, #79 Exhibit 175 - Hillsborough Cty Rejection Form, #80 Exhibit 176 - St. Jones Cty Rejection Form, #81 Exhibit 177 - Columbia Cty Rejection Form, #82 Exhibit 178 - Broward Cty Absentee Request Form, #83 Exhibit 179 - CARES Act Budget Form, #84 Exhibit 180 - Fla. Election COVID Recommendations, #85 Exhibit 181 - Clay Cty Notice to Voters, #86 Exhibit 182 - Broward Cty Notice to Voters, #87 Exhibit 183-1 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #88 Exhibit 183-2 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #89 Exhibit 183-3 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #90 Exhibit 183-4 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #91 Exhibit 183-5 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #92 Exhibit 183-6 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #93 Exhibit 183-7 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #94 Exhibit 183-8 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #95 Exhibit 183-9 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #96 Exhibit 183-10 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #97 Exhibit 183-11 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #98 Exhibit 183-12 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #99 Exhibit 183-13 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #100 Exhibit 183-14 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #101 Exhibit 183-15 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #102 Exhibit 183-16 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #103 Exhibit 183-17 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #104 Exhibit 183-18 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #105 Exhibit 183-19 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #106 Exhibit 183-20 - 2020 FSASE Manual, #107 Exhibit 184 - Return Postage Analysis, #108 Exhibit 185 - Holmes Cty VBM Advisory, #109 Exhibit 186 - Miami Dade VBM Issue List, #110 Exhibit 187 - Brevard Rejected Ballot Totals, #111 Exhibit 188 - Fla. SOE 2020 Ltr. Goals, #112 Exhibit 189 - Chart of Key Election Dates, #113 Exhibit 190 - USPS 2016 Fla. Map, #114 Exhibit 191 - USPS 2018 Fla. Map, #115 Exhibit 192 - CARES Act Agreement Memo., #116 Exhibit 193 - CARES Act Expend. Rpt., #117 Exhibit 194 - CARES Act Attach. A, #118 Exhibit 195 - CARES Act Attach. E, #119 Exhibit 196 - CARES Act Attach. C, #120 Exhibit 197-1 - Monroe Cty. Rejected Nov. 2018 Ballots & Other Production, #121 Exhibit 197-2 - Monroe Cty. Rejected Nov. 2018 Ballots & Other Production, #122 Exhibit 197-3 - Monroe Cty. Rejected Nov. 2018 Ballots & Other Production, #123 Exhibit 198-1 - St. Jones Cty Doc. Production, #124 Exhibit 198-2 - St. Jones Cty Doc. Production, #125 Exhibit 198-3 - St. Jones Cty Doc. Production, #126 Exhibit 198-4 - St. Jones Cty Doc. Production, #127 Exhibit 198-5 - St. Jones Cty Doc. Production, #128 Exhibit 198-6 - St. Jones Cty Doc. Production) (VELEZ, ALEXI) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 500 NOTICE OF DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) Exhibits 51-100 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Tammy Jones, #2 Exhibit 52 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Lisa Lewis, #3 Exhibit 53 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Paul Lux, #4 Exhibit 54 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Stephanie Porta, #5 Exhibit 55 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Christina White, #6 Exhibit 56 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Sheila Young, #7 Exhibit 57 - Miami-Dade County Sample Ballot, #8 Exhibit 58 - Bay Harbor Islands 2017 Example Ballot, #9 Exhibit 59 - Sweetwater 2015 Example Ballot, #10 Exhibit 60 - Miami-Dade Social Media Post 1, #11 Exhibit 61 - Miami-Dade Social Media Post 2, #12 Exhibit 62 - Miami-Dade Social Media Post 3, #13 Exhibit 63 - Miami-Dade Operation Manual: Processing Cure Affidavits, #14 Exhibit 64 - Sarasota County Emergency Polling Place Changes (Mar. 17, 2020), #15 Exhibit 65 - Sarasota County Emergency Polling Place Changes (Mar. 17, 2020) v2, #16 Exhibit 66 - Pinellas Cty Emergency Polling Place Changes - Assisted Living Facilities, #17 Exhibit 67 - Pinellas Cty Cure Attempts and Dispositions Chart, #18 Exhibit 68 - Pinellas Cty Notice - Coronavirus Preparedness Measures, #19 Exhibit 69 - Escambia Referred VBM Ballots 2016, #20 Exhibit 70 - Escambia Referred VBM Ballots 2018, #21 Exhibit 71 - Escambia Additional Referred VBM Ballots 2016, #22 Exhibit 72 - Escambia UOACAVA Tabulation - 2020 PPP, #23 Exhibit 73 - Escambia Email - Poll Worker COVID Concern, #24 Exhibit 74 - Escambia Email - Poll Worker COVID Concern - 2, #25 Exhibit 75 - part 1 of 2 - Escambia - Detailed Report of 2018 Referred VBM Ballots, #26 Exhibit 75 - part 2 of 2 - Escambia - Detailed Report of 2018 Referred VBM Ballots, #27 Exhibit 76 - Escambia - Detailed Report of 2018 Referred VBM Ballots - 2, #28 Exhibit 77 - Escambia - Detailed Report of 2014 Referred VBM Ballots, #29 Exhibit 78 - Escambia - Detailed Report of 2016 Referred VBM Ballots, #30 Exhibit 79 - Escambia 2020 Polling Place Changes - 3.17.20, #31 Exhibit 80 - Escambia 2020 Polling Place Change - Precinct 25, #32 Exhibit 81 - Escambia 2020 Polling Place Change - Precinct 88, #33 Exhibit 82 - FSASE Canvassing Board Manual 2020, #34 Exhibit 83 - Hillsborough - Precinct 433 Unavailable, #35 Exhibit 84 - Hillsborough Polling Place Changes - 3.16.20, #36 Exhibit 85 - Hillsborough Nextdoor Polling Place Change Notice, #37 Exhibit 86 - Duval Signature Cure Affidavit Guidelines, #38 Exhibit 87 - Duval Polling Place Changes - 3.12.20, #39 Exhibit 88 - Osceola Consent Decree, #40 Exhibit 89 - Highlands Example VBM Envelope, #41 Exhibit 90 - Leon Notice Encouraging All Vote by Mail, #42 Exhibit 91 - Email - Records Lacking Signature Image Reports, #43 Exhibit 92 - Email - Registration Failure for Elderly Voter, #44 Exhibit 93 - M. Matthews Email - Temporary SOE Office Closures, #45 Exhibit 94 - Hernando Drop Box - Front View, #46 Exhibit 95 - Hernando Drop Box - Side View, #47 Exhibit 96 - T. Jones Email - Updating SOEs on 4.7.20 Letter, #48 Exhibit 97 - L. Lee 6.17.20 Letter to SOEs, #49 Exhibit 98 - Fla. Voting Systems Standards Manual, #50 Exhibit 99 - Volusia Notice of Polling Place Changes - 3.17.20, #51 Exhibit 100 - M. Cook Email - Daily Ballot Logs) (MILLER, JEFFREY) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 499 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS 74136 OF TRIAL EXHIBIT LIESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 74 - Miami Res. 739-12, #2 Exhibit 75 - M. Matthews Oct. 6, 2012 Emails, #3 Exhibit 76 - M. Matthews Aug. 22, 2016 Emails, #4 Exhibit 77 - M. Matthews Aug. 31, 2016 Emails, #5 Exhibit 78 - M. Matthews Oct. 7, 2016 Emails, #6 Exhibit 79 - M. Matthews Oct. 13, 2016 Emails, #7 Exhibit 80 - Advisory Op. DE 16-02, #8 Exhibit 81 - DOS Dec. 19, 2017 Slides, #9 Exhibit 82 - DOS Sept. 19, 2018 Email, #10 Exhibit 83 - Oct. 18, 2018 USPS Delays Email (1), #11 Exhibit 84 - Oct. 18, 2018 USPS Delays Emails (2), #12 Exhibit 85 - Oct. 18, 2018 USPS Delays Email (3), #13 Exhibit 86 - M. Matthews Oct. 19, 2018 Emails, #14 Exhibit 87 - D. Clark Oct. 19, 2018 Emails, #15 Exhibit 88 - Oct. 22, 2018 USPS Delays Emails (1), #16 Exhibit 89 - Oct. 22, 2018 USPS Delays Email (2), #17 Exhibit 90 - Oct. 25, 2018 VBM Ballot Delays Email, #18 Exhibit 91 - M. Matthews Oct. 25, 2018 Emails, #19 Exhibit 92 - Oct. 25, 2018 Postal Region Problems Email (1), #20 Exhibit 93 - Oct. 25, 2018 Postal Region Problems Emails (2), #21 Exhibit 94 - Oct. 25, 2018 Postal Region Problems Email (3), #22 Exhibit 95 - DOS Nov. 2, 2018 Email, #23 Exhibit 96 - E. West Nov. 26, 2018 Emails, #24 Exhibit 97 - USPS Nov. 28, 2018 Emails, #25 Exhibit 98 - W. Link Apr. 22, 2019 Emails, #26 Exhibit 99 - L. Lewis Apr. 22, 2019 Emails, #27 Exhibit 100 - T. Doyle Apr. 22, 2019 Emails, #28 Exhibit 101 - D. Clark Apr. 26, 2019 Emails, #29 Exhibit 102 - USPS July 22, 2019 Emails, #30 Exhibit 103 - M. Matthews July 23, 2019 Email, #31 Exhibit 104 - Hillsborough Cty Mar. 4, 2020 Voter Advisory, #32 Exhibit 105 - Leon Cty. Mar. 4, 2020 COVID Accommodations Email, #33 Exhibit 106 - SOS Mar. 6, 2020 Tweet, #34 Exhibit 107 - Fla. Exec. Order 20-52 & Associated Emails, #35 Exhibit 108 - K. Graham Mar. 13, 2020 Emails, #36 Exhibit 109 - Jimenez Mar. 17, 2020 Post-Election Report, #37 Exhibit 110 - Miami-Dade Mar. 17, 2020 Presentation, #38 Exhibit 111 - SOEs Mar. 25, 2020 Emails, #39 Exhibit 112 - W. Grimes Mar. 25, 2020 Emails (1), #40 Exhibit 113 - P. Lux Mar. 25, 2020 Emails, #41 Exhibit 114 - W. Grimes Mar. 25, 2020 Emails (2), #42 Exhibit 115 - M. Hogan Mar. 25, 2020 Emails, #43 Exhibit 116 - Mar. 25, 2020 Election Infrastructure Summary, #44 Exhibit 117 - D. Clark Mar. 26, 2020 Emails (1), #45 Exhibit 118 - D. Clark Mar. 26, 2020 Emails (2), #46 Exhibit 119 - D. Hagan Mar. 31, 2020 Emails, #47 Exhibit 120 - T. Jones Mar. 31, 2020 Emails, #48 Exhibit 121 - Brevard Cty Apr. 6, 2020 Email, #49 Exhibit 122 - SOE Apr. 8, 2020 Draft Ltr (1), #50 Exhibit 123 - SOE Apr. 8, 2020 Draft Ltr (2), #51 Exhibit 124 - SOE Apr. 8, 2020 Draft Ltr (3), #52 Exhibit 125 - T. Jones Apr. 8, 2020 Emails, #53 Exhibit 126 - Flagler Cty Apr. 9, 2020 Emails, #54 Exhibit 127 - Apr. 13, 2020 COVID Recommendation Email and Ltr., #55 Exhibit 128 - Apr. 13, 2020 COVID Recommendation Ltr., #56 Exhibit 129 - Hillsborough & Orange Cty Apr. 22, 2020 Email, #57 Exhibit 130 - Hillsborough & Polk Cty Apr. 22, 2020 Email, #58 Exhibit 131 - M. Munro Apr. 24, 2020 Emails, #59 Exhibit 132-1 - Broward Cty. Apr. 30, 2020 Ltr, #60 Exhibit 132-2 - Broward Cty. Apr. 30, 2020 Ltr, #61 Exhibit 132-3 - Broward Cty. Apr. 30, 2020 Ltr, #62 Exhibit 132-4 - Broward Cty. Apr. 30, 2020 Ltr, #63 Exhibit 133 - Brevard Cty Poll Workers May 2020 Emails, #64 Exhibit 134 - USPS May 4, 2020 Email, #65 Exhibit 135 - M. Matthews May 7, 2020 Emails, #66 Exhibit 136-1 - Hillsborough Cty May 12, 2020 Emails, #67 Exhibit 136-2 - Hillsborough Cty May 12, 2020 Emails, #68 Exhibit 136-3 - Hillsborough Cty May 12, 2020 Emails) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 7, 2020 Filing 498 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS by FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, LAUREL M LEE, ASHLEY MOODY.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30- Declaration of Robert T. Ball, Jr., #2 Exhibit 31- Early Transmission Dynamics in Wuhan, China, #3 Exhibit 32- Declaration of CEO Democracy Live Bryan Finney, #4 Exhibit 33- M. McKown Declaration, #5 Exhibit 34- Kousser political contributions) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 497 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19-6 FSASE Canvassing Manual, #2 Exhibit 20- Citizens for Strong Schools, #3 Exhibit 21- Fla. Lt. Gov. Quits Amid $300M Charity Scam Probe, #4 Exhibit 22- Science Direct, Crowd-Out 10 Years Later, #5 Exhibit 23- NBER Working Paper Series, #6 Exhibit 24- Ex. Sen. Martinez to join DLA Piper, #7 Exhibit 25- Review Form for OmniBallot, #8 Exhibit 26- General Election Schedule, #9 Exhibit 27- Lockerbie Expert Report, #10 Exhibit 28- Plunkett Expert Report, #11 Exhibit 29- Hood Expert Report) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 496 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS by FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, LAUREL M LEE, ASHLEY MOODY.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19-5 FSASE Canvassing Manual) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 495 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19-4 FSASE Canvassing Manual) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb). Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 494 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19-3 FSASE Canvassing Manual) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 493 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19-2 FSASE Canvassing Manual) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 492 NOTICE OF DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) Exhibits 101-150 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101 - M. Cook Email - Daily Ballot Logs - Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit 102 - M. Matthews Email - USPS Out-of-County Ballots, #3 Exhibit 103 - M. Matthews Email - 2016 Brevard County USPS Issue, #4 Exhibit 104 - A. Marconnet Email - CARES Act Materials, #5 Exhibit 105 - M. Cook Email - Reply re 2020 PPP USPS Issues, #6 Exhibit 106 - FSE Legislative Committee Summary - 3.25.2020, #7 Exhibit 107 - Indian River 2020 PPP Referred VBM Ballots, #8 Exhibit 108 - Miami-Dade VBM Mailing Instructions, #9 Exhibit 109 - Miami-Dade VBM Envelope Printing Proof Image, #10 Exhibit 110 - Verified Voting Letter to Gov. DeSantis - 4.14.20, #11 Exhibit 111 - Miami-Dade - Notes re Recommendations to Governor, #12 Exhibit 112 - Seminole 2018 Referred VBM Ballots, #13 Exhibit 113 - Seminole 2020 Referred VBM Ballots, #14 Exhibit 114 - Seminole 2016 Referred VBM Ballots, #15 Exhibit 116 - M. Matthews Email - Cured and Overseas Ballot Handling, #16 Exhibit 117 - Levy 2020 PPP Referred VBM Ballots, #17 Exhibit 118 - C. Latimer Email - BOD Call 4.1.20, #18 Exhibit 119 - D. Stafford Email - Bod Call 4.1.20, #19 Exhibit 120 - T. Jones Email - Reply to M. Early 4.7.20, #20 Exhibit 121 - T. Jones Email - Reply to C. White 4.8.20, #21 Exhibit 122 - V. Davis Email - Committee Summary 3.26.20, #22 Exhibit 123 - W. Link Email - PPP Issues 3.25.20, #23 Exhibit 124 - T. Hardee Email - PPP Issues 3.25.20, #24 Exhibit 125 - D. Hagan Email - BOD Meeting 3.31.20, #25 Exhibit 126 - T. Jones Email - DeSantis Letter 3.31.20, #26 Exhibit 127 - C. Latimer Email - DeSantis Letter 3.31.20, #27 Exhibit 128 - A. Marconnet Email - Instructions re Callers and OVR, #28 Exhibit 129 - DHS Email - COVID Best Practices, #29 Exhibit 130 - T. Jones Email to L. Edwards - 4.4.20, #30 Exhibit 131 - Palm Beach Coronavirus Preparedness Update - 4.15.20, #31 Exhibit 132 - Palm Beach COVID-19 Statement - 3.11.20, #32 Exhibit 133 - Polk Notice of Polling Place Changes, #33 Exhibit 134 - Polk Notice of Polling Place Changes - Press Release, #34 Exhibit 135 - B. Corley Email - COVID Concerns 3.24.20, #35 Exhibit 136 - C. Latimer Email to V. Cannon 5.12.20, #36 Exhibit 137 - M. Matthews Email to P. Ogg 11.8.18, #37 Exhibit 138 - M. Matthews Email to L. Lee 4.20.20, #38 Exhibit 139 - P. Antonacci to P. Lux 3.35.20, #39 Exhibit 140 - S. Anderson Email re Drop Box - 5.20.20, #40 Exhibit 141 - C. White Email re Voting Sites - 4.16.20, #41 Exhibit 142 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2016 General Race -Black, #42 Exhibit 143 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2016 General Race - Hispanic, #43 Exhibit 144 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2016 General Race - White, #44 Exhibit 145 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2016 General Race - All, #45 Exhibit 146 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2018 general race - Black, #46 Exhibit 147 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2018 general race - Hispanic, #47 Exhibit 148 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2018 general race - White, #48 Exhibit 149 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2018 general race - All, #49 Exhibit 150 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2020 PPP race - Black) (ORTEGA, JAVIER) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 491 ANSWER AND DEFENSES BY KIM BARTON, ALACHUA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND THE ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF 292-1) OF THE NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 490 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19-1 FSASE Canvassing Manual) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 489 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DREAM DEFENDERS' MOTION IN LIMINE (ECF No. #476 ) AND MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES LOCKERBIE (ECF No. #486 ) AND PLUNKETT (ECF No. #485 )(VELEZ, ALEXI) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 488 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN NIELSON PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT STATE'S PROPOSED EXPERT DR. M.V. HOOD III AND MEMORANDOM IN SUPPORT (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 487 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13- Building Confidence in U.S. Elections, #2 Exhibit 14- Polling Place Procedures Manual, #3 Exhibit 15- USPS Election Mail letter, #4 Exhibit 16- USPS, State and Local Election Mail, #5 Exhibit 17- Email from Brittany Dover, #6 Exhibit 18-Draft Qualification Test Report) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 486 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATIONS' PROPOSED EXPERT DR. BRAD LOCKERBIE AND MEMORANDOM IN SUPPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Rule 26 Designation, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Lockerbie Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Lockerbie Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 Lockerbie CV, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 Herron Rebuttal Report) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 485 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL K. PLUNKETT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - DD Nielsen - Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures, #2 Exhibit Exh. B - Plunkett Exp. Rep. (Plunkett Dep. Exh. 1), #3 Exhibit Exh. C - Plunkett Dep. Tr., #4 Exhibit Exh. D - 2018 Service Performance of Election and Political Mail 2018 (Plunkett Dep. Exh. 7), #5 Exhibit Exh. E - Postal Bulletin 22539 (Plunkett Dep. Exh. 8), #6 Exhibit Exh. F - Publication 632 (Plunkett Dep. Exh. 9), #7 Exhibit Exh. G - Postal Bulletin 22546 (Plunkett Dep. Exh. 13), #8 Exhibit Exh. H - USPS Kit 600 (Plunkett Dep. Exh. 3)) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb). Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 484 ANSWER AND DEFENSES BY KIM BARTON, ALACHUA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF 341-1) OF THE DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 483 ANSWER AND DEFENSES BY KIM BARTON, ALACHUA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND THE ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD TO INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT (ECF #121 -1) (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 482 NOTICE OF DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) Exhibits 151-186 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 151 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2020 PPP race - Hispanic, #2 Exhibit 152 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2020 PPP race - White, #3 Exhibit 153 - Data Delivery Date and Late Return 2020 PPP race - All, #4 Exhibit 154 - Data Rejection Differences Black Hispanic White 2016 - General, #5 Exhibit 155 - Data Rejection Differences Black Hispanic White 2018 - General, #6 Exhibit 156 - Data Rejection Differences Black Hispanic White 2020 - PPP, #7 Exhibit 157 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2016 General Race - Black, #8 Exhibit 158 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2016 General Race - Hispanic, #9 Exhibit 159 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2016 General Race - White, #10 Exhibit 160 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2016 General Race - All, #11 Exhibit 161 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2018 General Race - Black, #12 Exhibit 162 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2018 General Race - Hispanic, #13 Exhibit 163 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2018 General Race - White, #14 Exhibit 164 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2018 General Race - All, #15 Exhibit 165 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2020 PPP Race - Black, #16 Exhibit 166 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2020 PPP Race - Hispanic, #17 Exhibit 167 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2020 PPP Race - White, #18 Exhibit 168 - Data Undeliverable Ballots 2020 PPP Race - All, #19 Exhibit 169 - Data Undeliverable Ballots by Age - 2016 General, #20 Exhibit 170 - Data Undeliverable Ballots by Age - 2018 General, #21 Exhibit 171 - Data Undeliverable Ballots by Age - 2020 PPP, #22 Exhibit 172 - Data Undeliverable Ballots by Needing Assistance Status - 2016 General, #23 Exhibit 173 - Data Undeliverable Ballots by Needing Assistance Status - 2018 General, #24 Exhibit 174 - Data Undeliverable Ballots by Needing Assistance Status - 2020 PPP, #25 Exhibit 175 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2016 General Race - Black, #26 Exhibit 176 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2016 General Race - Hispanic, #27 Exhibit 177 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2016 General Race - White, #28 Exhibit 178 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2016 General Race - All, #29 Exhibit 179 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2018 General Race - Black, #30 Exhibit 180 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2018 General Race - Hispanic, #31 Exhibit 181 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2018 General Race - White, #32 Exhibit 182 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2018 General Race - All, #33 Exhibit 183 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2020 PPP Race - Black, #34 Exhibit 184 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2020 PPP Race - Hispanic, #35 Exhibit 185 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2020 PPP Race - White, #36 Exhibit 186 - Data Voter Caused Error Rates and Missing Signature Rates 2020 PPP Race - All) (WIESNER, JOCELYN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 481 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Voting by Mail and Ballot Rejection paper, #2 Exhibit 2- Final Report of Miami-Dade County Grand Jury, #3 Exhibit 3- Executive Order No. 20-149, #4 Exhibit 4-Executive Order No. 20-52, #5 Exhibit 5- DEM Emergency Order No. 20-002, #6 Exhibit 6- SOE Paul Lux Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7- SOE Christina White Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8- SOE Peter Antonacci Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9- SOE Oakes' Responses to ROGs, #10 Exhibit 10- Security Analysis of the Democracy Live Online Voting System, #11 Exhibit 11-CDC, Considerations for Election Polling Locations and Voters, #12 Exhibit 12- Voter Assistance Hotline Manual) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 480 NOTICE OF DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) Exhibits 1-50 (Attachments: #1 Master Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Daniel A. Smith Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit 2 - Lockerbie Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Michael C. Herron Rebuttal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Form DS-DE 139 VMB Cure Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 5 - Canvassing Board Workshop Slides, #7 Exhibit 6 - Volusia County Response to DD Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit 7 - Hillsborough SOE Coronavirus Preparedness Update, #9 Exhibit 8 - Emergency Polling Place Changes for Marion County Voters, #10 Exhibit 9 - Miami-Dade County Presidential Primary Election Polling Place Changes, #11 Exhibit 10 - Palm Beach County 2020 Polling Place Changes, #12 Exhibit 11 - Pinellas County Emergency Polling Place Change Notice, #13 Exhibit 12 - Sarasota County Emergency Polling Place Changes, #14 Exhibit 13 - Palm Beach County SOEs Objections and Responses to Nielsen Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #15 Exhibit 14 - Fla. Exec. Order No. 20-91, #16 Exhibit 15 - Fla. Exec. Order No. 20-114, #17 Exhibit 16 - Florida Supervisors of Elections, Letter to Governor Ron DeSantis, (May 13, 2020), #18 Exhibit 17 - Florida Executive Order 19-262, #19 Exhibit 18 - Fla. Exec. Order No. 20-149 (Emergency Management-COVID-19-Primary and General Elections), #20 Exhibit 19 - NewFM 2020 Civic Engagement Plan, #21 Exhibit 20 - NewFM 2020 Civic Engagement Plan, #22 Exhibit 21 - NewFM CSG Sales Order, #23 Exhibit 22 - NewFM's Responses to Nine SOEs Second Set of Interrogatories, #24 Exhibit 23 - DOS CARE Grant Dispersal, #25 Exhibit 24 - B. Finney Email to M. Matthews - 6.15.20., #26 Exhibit 25 - Broward County SOE's Answers to Nielsen's First Set of Interrogatories, #27 Exhibit 26 - Expert Report of Daniel A. Smith, #28 Exhibit 27 - Expert Report of J. Morgan Kousser, #29 Exhibit 28 - Expert Report of Michael C. Herron, #30 Exhibit 29 - Article: Where Is The New Epicenter for Covid-19?, #31 Exhibit 30 - Article: Florida Covid-19 Spikes Approach New York April Peak With Less Than One-Tenth of Deaths, #32 Exhibit 31 - C.D.C. Figures: Cases in the U.S., #33 Exhibit 32 - Article: Covid-19 highlights a particular vulnerability for Florida: Its regressive tax system, #34 Exhibit 33 - Article: Voter registration in Florida plunged amid the coronavirus pandemic, #35 Exhibit 34 - Article: Covid-19 Changed How We Vote. It Could Also Change Who Votes, #36 Exhibit 35 - Article: A mess: Florida's online voter registration system panned, #37 Exhibit 36 - Article: Is Florida's online voter registration system ready for an election surge?, #38 Exhibit 37 - Article: Florida's voter registration system experienced intermittent issues, #39 Exhibit 38 - Article: Online Voter Registration - Trends in development and implementation, #40 Exhibit 39 - Bradford County SOE Homepage, #41 Exhibit 40 - Hamilton County SOE Homepage, #42 Exhibit 41 - Jefferson County SOE Homepage, #43 Exhibit 42 - Suwannee County SOEHhomepage, #44 Exhibit 43 - Union County SOE Homepage, #45 Exhibit 44 - Volusia County SOE Homepage, #46 Exhibit 45 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Christopher Anderson, #47 Exhibit 46 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Bianca Baez, #48 Exhibit 47 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Robert T. Ball, #49 Exhibit 48 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Jennifer J. Edwards, #50 Exhibit 49 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Rachel Gilmer, #51 Exhibit 50 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Joyce Griffin) (KARPATKIN, JEREMY) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 479 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORT OF M.V. HOOD III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Expert Report of M.V. Hood III), #2 Exhibit B (Hood Table A), #3 Exhibit C (Hood Table B), #4 Exhibit D (Hood Tables C & D), #5 Exhibit E (Hood CV)) (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 478 STATE DEFENDANTS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Deposition Designations, #2 Exhibit B- Exhibit List) (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 477 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE STATE'S PROFFERED EXPERT DR. M.V. HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hood Tr., #2 Exhibit 2 - Hood Rpt., #3 Exhibit 3 - League Tr.) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 476 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY AT TRIAL. (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 475 STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORT OF MICHAEL PLUNKETT(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Expert Report of Michael Plunkett)) (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 474 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' MOTION TO STRIKE REBUTTAL REPORT OF MICHAEL C. HERRON, PH.D., AND MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE NEW EXPERT OPINIONS, WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Report of Dr. Michael Herron) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 473 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 472 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES(GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 471 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORT OF DR. BRAD LOCKERBIE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Dr. Brad Lockerbie) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 470 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' NOTICE OF PRE-FILING EXHIBITS(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Expert Report of Brad Lockerbie, Ph.D, #2 Exhibit B-1 - Mission Statement (Our Priorities) from Priorities USA Website, #3 Exhibit B-2 - Mission Statement (Our Priorities) from Priorities USA Website, #4 Exhibit B-3 -Mission Statement (Persuading and Mobilizing Voters) from Priorities USA Website, #5 Exhibit B-4 Mission Statement (Protecting Right to Vote) from Priorities USA Website, #6 Exhibit B-5 -Mission Statement (Supporting Grassroots Action) from Priorities USA Website, #7 Exhibit C- Mission Statement and Statement of Objectives and Principles from Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, Inc. Website, #8 Exhibit D-1 - Mission Statements from Alianza for Progress, Inc. website, #9 Exhibit D-2 Mission Statement (About) from Alianza for Progress, Inc. Website) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 469 MIAMI-DADE DEFENDANTS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 468 DEFENDANTS, ORANGE COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND ORANGE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF (ECF NO. #292 -1) (SHANNIN, NICHOLAS) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 467 MIAMI-DADE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO GRUBB PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 466 MIAMI-DADE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (D.E. #341 -1). (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 465 MIAMI-DADE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (D.E. #292 -1). (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 464 STATE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE NIELSON PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 463 STATE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE DREAM DEFENDER'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 462 ANSWER OF LAKE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD TO THIRD AMENDED WILLIAMS COMPLAINT (JOHNSON, DIANA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 461 ANSWER OF LAKE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD TO INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT (JOHNSON, DIANA) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 460 STATE DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF J. MORGAN KOUSSER, PH.D., AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Expert Report of Dr. J. Morgan Kousser), #2 Exhibit B (Deposition Transcript of Dr. J. Morgan Kousser)) (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 459 ANSWER to #37 Amended Complaint, Neilson Complaint (Doc 292-1) by LAKE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (JOHNSON, DIANA)
July 6, 2020 Filing 458 STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE REBUTTAL REPORT OF DANIEL A. SMITH, PH.D., AND MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE NEW EXPERT OPINIONS, WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Rebuttal and Supplemental Expert Report Daniel A. Smith)) (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 457 DEFENDANTS THE 24 SUPERVISORS RULE 26(a)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES. (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 456 PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a)(3)(A). (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 455 DEFENDANT, LISA LEWIS IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR VOLUSIA COUNTY'S AND THE VOLUSIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARDS ANSWER TO INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT(CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 454 DEFENDANT, PINELLAS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [ECF #341 -1] (DONNELL, ASHLEY) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 453 DEFENDANT, LISA LEWIS IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR VOLUSIA COUNTY AND THE VOLUSIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S ANSWER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF FILED BY THE NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 452 TEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 451 TEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by CHRIS ANDERSON, PETER ANTONACCI, MICHAEL BENNETT, BRIAN E CORLEY, TOMMY DOYLE, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, JOYCE GRIFFIN, ALAN HAYS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, WESLEY WILCOX. (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 450 TEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 449 INTERVENORS' NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBITS LIST (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 448 INTERVENORS' RULE 26 (a)(3) DISCLOSURES (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 447 SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by MARTY BISHOP, JOHN HANLON, THOMAS R HARDEE, KAITI LENHART, PENNY OGG, CONNIE SANCHEZ, LORI SCOTT. (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 446 TWENTY-FOUR SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER TO INTERVENORS COMPLAINT #121 -1 AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 445 SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 444 TEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS RULE 26(A)(3) DISCLOSURES (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 443 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 442 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DREAM DEFENDER PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 441 TWENTY-FOUR SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER TO WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [342-1] AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 440 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 439 SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 438 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 437 TWENTY-FOUR SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [292-1] BY NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES(ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 436 DEFENDANT, LISA LEWIS IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR VOLUSIA COUNTY AND THE VOLUSIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 435 INTERVENORS' CORRECTED NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS REFRENCED IN ITS TRIAL BRIEF (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 434 DEFENDANTS RON TURNER SARASOTA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND SARASOTA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S ANSWER TO INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT (BENTLEY, MORGAN) Modified to edit on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 433 DEFENDANTS RON TURNER SARASOTA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND SARASOTA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (BENTLEY, MORGAN) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 432 DEFENDANTS, RON TURNER, SARASOTA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS, AND SARASOTA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF ON THE NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS (BENTLEY, MORGAN) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 431 DEFENDANTS' RULE 26(a)(3) MANDATORY DISCLOSURES (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 430 SIX SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO GRUBB INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (ECF NO. #121 -1) (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 429 SIX SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF (ECF NO. #292 -1) (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 428 DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 26 MANDATORY DISCLOSURES (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 427 DEFENDANTS' RULE 26(a)(3) MANDATORY DISCLOSURES. (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 426 DEFENDANT LEON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFFERAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' POSITIONS (O'STEEN, CHASITY) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 425 ANSWERS AND DEFENSES TO NIELSEN (Dkt. #292 -1), WILLIAMS (Dkt. #341 -1) AND GRUBB (Dkt. #341 -1) PLEADINGS BY DEFENDANTS CRAIG LATIMER, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS, AND HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (TODD, STEPHEN) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 424 9 SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (LAVIA, JOHN) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 423 SIX SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DREAM DEFENDER PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. #341 -1]). (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 422 9 SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (LAVIA, JOHN) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 421 9 SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER TO THE INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (ECF No. [121-1]) by MARY JANE ARRINGTON, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, VICKI DAVIS, MARK EARLEY, LORI EDWARDS, MIKE HOGAN, WENDY SARTORY LINK, PAUL STAMOULIS, GERTRUDE WALKER. (LABASKY, RONALD) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 420 9 SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' ANSWER TO THE INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT ECF No. [121-1]. (LAVIA, JOHN) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 419 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FOR SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS STAMOULIS, CHAMBLESS, HOGAN, EARLEY, DAVIS, ARRINGTON, EDWARDS, LINK, AND WALKER. (LABASKY, RONALD) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part #78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/6/2020. (sms)
July 6, 2020 Filing 417 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO INTERVENORSCOMPLAINT by SHIRLEY ANDERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 416 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT(JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 415 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 414 RULE 26(a)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES OF DEFENDANTS PAUL LUX, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Ballot Envelopes for Plaintiff Morgan Outlaw) (STEWART, GREGORY) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 413 DEFENDANT MARION COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES. (MINTER, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 412 DEFENDANT MARION COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF (MINTER, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 411 NOTICE OF HEARING: Bench Trial set for 7/20/2020 10:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 571-353-2300Access code: 901398587# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
July 6, 2020 Filing 410 DEFENDANTS', ORANGE COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND ORANGE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY MARION COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (ECF NO. #373 ) (SHANNIN, NICHOLAS) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 409 Sealed Document. (ckm)
July 6, 2020 Filing 408 NOTICE OF HEARING: Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2020 10:15 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 571-353-2300Access code: 901398587# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
July 6, 2020 Filing 407 Sealed Document. (ckm)
July 6, 2020 Filing 406 DEFENDANT, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS KIM A. BARTON'S RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES by KIM A BARTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rivera Madera v. Lee - Order, #2 Exhibit VRA Amendments 2006, #3 Exhibit Sec 203 of Voting Rights Act) (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 405 NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL ON BEHALF OF THE COLLIER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (LABASKY, RONALD) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 404 ANSWER OF PAUL A. LUX, AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND THE OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, TO THE INTERVENORS COMPLAINT by (STEWART, GREGORY) Modified to edit title on 7/7/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 403 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #392 : Attorney Edward Genger is advised that for all future pleadings in this case and any future cases assigned to Judge Hinkle, exhibits attached to a document filing should be properly identified in the docket text when posting the document. (Example: Deposition of John Doe rather than Exhibit A.) (rcb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 402 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL A. LUX, AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND THE OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (STEWART, GREGORY) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 401 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint of Nielsen Plaintiffs (DOC 292-1) by PAUL A LUX, OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (STEWART, GREGORY)
July 6, 2020 Filing 400 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL A. LUX, AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND THE OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (TODD, STEPHEN) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 399 DEFENDANT, LISA LEWIS IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR VOLUSIA COUNTY'S, RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Register 2016) (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 398 DEFENDANT, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS SHIRLEY ANDERSON'S, RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Prelim. Inj. Madera Rivera v. Lee, #2 Exhibit B - 81 Fed. Reg. 87,532, #3 Exhibit C - 2016 Census Bureau Covered Juris. Visualization) (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 7/9/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Filing 397 MOTION to Seal Document #392 Notice (Other) by ORGANIZE FLORIDA. (SCOTT, SHARION)
July 6, 2020 Filing 396 INTERVENORS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (CARES Act funding per county)) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 6, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Designation of Confidential Information Deadline - by 7/6/2020. (rcb)
July 5, 2020 Filing 395 DEFENDANT ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 4, 2020 Filing 394 INTERVENORS' AMENDED TRIAL BRIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - 30(b)(6) Deposition of Maria Matthews) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER on #381 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/4/20. (sms)
July 3, 2020 Filing 392 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF TRIAL BRIEF OF SECRETARY OF STATE, ATTORNEY GENERAL, INDIVIDUAL FLORIDA CANVASSING COMMISSIONERS, ANDFIFTY-THREE COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS (WENGER, EDWARD) #1 Exhibit A Deposition of Bianca Baez #2 Exhibit B Deposition of Celcio Romero) #3 Exhibit C Deposition of Kirk Nielsen) #4 Exhibit D Deposition of Felicia Bruce) (rcb). #5 Exhibit E Deposition of Barbara Devane #6 Exhibit F Deposition of Raymond Davis (rcb). #7 Exhibit G Deposition of Donesa Jackson #8 Exhibit H Exhibit of Rachel Gilmer. #9 Exhibit I Deposition of Andrea Mercado #10 Exhibit J Deposition of Stephanie Porta #11 Exhibit K Videotaped Teleconference of the Deposition of Marcos Vilar #12 Exhibit L Deposition of Florida Alliance for Retired Americans Inc #13 Exhibit M AFFIDAVIT AND REPORT OF MICHAEL PLUNKETT) #14 Exhibit N Deposition of Michael Heron #15 Exhibit O Deposition of Daniel Smith, #16 Exhibit P Expert Report of Daniel A Smith (rcb). #17 Exhibit Q Expert Report of Michael C. Herron, Ph.D.(rcb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2020: #18 Exhibit R Videotaped Deposition of Christina White (rcb). Modified to edit title and rename attachments (rcb)
July 3, 2020 Filing 391 TRIAL BRIEF OF SECRETARY OF STATE,ATTORNEY GENERAL, INDIVIDUAL FLORIDA CANVASSING COMMISSIONERS, AND FIFTY-THREE COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 390 MIAMI-DADE DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF AND,IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Christina White, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Christina White, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Dr. Daniel Smith) (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 389 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS PRE-TRIAL BRIEF. Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 388 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL BRIEF (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 387 SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' TRIAL BRIEF (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 386 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS 173 OF TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nielsen Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Outlaw Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Lubin Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Bruce Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - DeVane Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Davis Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - Jackson Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 - Vilar Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 - Sauers Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 - Cecil Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 - Liberman Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 - Biggs Declaration, #13 Exhibit 13 - K. Werthman Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 - G. Werthman Declaration, #15 Exhibit 15 - Rodriguez-Sanjurjo Declaration, #16 Exhibit 16 - Farmer Declaration, #17 Exhibit 17 - Konopasek Declaration, #18 Exhibit 18 - Herron Expert Report, #19 Exhibit 19 - Ball Expert Report, #20 Exhibit 20 - Herron Rebuttal Expert, #21 Exhibit 21 - DeVane Depo. Tr., #22 Exhibit 22 - Jackson Depo. Tr., #23 Exhibit 23 - Jones Depo. Tr., #24 Exhibit 24 - Jones Depo. Exh. 3, #25 Exhibit 25 - Jones Depo. Exh. 5, #26 Exhibit 26 - Jones Depo. Exh. 6, #27 Exhibit 27 - Jones Depo. Exh. 9B, #28 Exhibit 28 - Jones Depo. Exh. 11, #29 Exhibit 29 - Jones Depo. Exh. 16, #30 Exhibit 30 - Latimer Depo. Tr., #31 Exhibit 31 - Latimer Depo. Exh. 19, #32 Exhibit 32 - Latimer Depo. Exh. 20, #33 Exhibit 33 - Griffin Depo. Tr., #34 Exhibit 34 - Griffin Depo. Exh. F, #35 Exhibit 35 - Griffin Depo. Exh. G, #36 Exhibit 36 - Griffin Depo. Exh. H, #37 Exhibit 37 - Plunkett Depo. Tr., #38 Exhibit 38 - Plunkett Depo. Exh. 3, #39 Exhibit 39 - Plunkett Depo. Exh. 7, #40 Exhibit 40 - Plunkett Depo. Exh. 9, #41 Exhibit 41 - Hood Depo. Tr., #42 Exhibit 42 - Lockerbie Depo. Tr., #43 Exhibit 43 - White Depo. Tr., #44 Exhibit 44 - White Depo. Exh. D., #45 Exhibit 45 - Lake ROG Responses, #46 Exhibit 46 - Brevard ROG Responses, #47 Exhibit 47 - Broward ROG Responses, #48 Exhibit 48 - Calhoun ROG Responses, #49 Exhibit 49 - Indian River ROG Responses, #50 Exhibit 50 - Orange ROG Responses, #51 Exhibit 51 - Palm Beach ROG Responses, #52 Exhibit 52 - Polk ROG Responses, #53 Exhibit 53 - Seminole ROG Responses, #54 Exhibit 54 - Alachua ROG Responses, #55 Exhibit 55 - Okaloosa ROG Responses, #56 Exhibit 56 - Highlands ROG Responses, #57 Exhibit 57 - Madison ROG Responses, #58 Exhibit 58 - Sarasota ROG Responses, #59 Exhibit 59 - Hillsborough ROG Responses, #60 Exhibit 60 - Tampa Bay Times Oct. 10, 2012 Article, #61 Exhibit 61 - Fla. Sec. of State May 2014 Presentation Excerpt, #62 Exhibit 62 - USPS OIG July 30, 2018 Report, #63 Exhibit 63 - Wash. Post Apr. 21, 2020 Article, #64 Exhibit 64 - Fla. Voter Registr. Totals, #65 Exhibit 65 - USPS May 29, 2020 Letter, #66 Exhibit 66 - Fla. County by Land Size, #67 Exhibit 67 - Fla. EV Locations, #68 Exhibit 68 - Pinellas VBM Web Statement, #69 Exhibit 69 - Citrus VBM Web Statement, #70 Exhibit 70 - St. Lucie VBM Web Statement, #71 Exhibit 71 - Collier VBM Twitter Statement, #72 Exhibit 72 - Levy and Taylor EV Site Map, #73 Exhibit 73 - Wisc. Absentee Vote Rep.) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 385 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN STATE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ADD USPS-RELATED EXHIBITS AND SUPPLEMENT THEIR WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Prelim. Inj. Madera Rivera v. Lee) (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb). Modified to edit title on 7/20/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 384 TRIAL BRIEF and Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATIONS. (GIBSON, BENJAMIN)
July 3, 2020 Filing 383 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS REFERENCED IN INTERVENORS' TRIAL BRIEF by FLORIDA COUNCIL OF THE BLIND, DOLOR GINCHEREAU, DEBORAH C GRUBB, DOUGLAS E HALL, JAMES K KRACHT, CARL F MCCOY re #382 Trial Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Deposition of Bryan Finney, #2 Exhibit B - FCB responses to interrogatories, #3 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 37, #4 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 38, #5 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 39, #6 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 40, #7 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 41, #8 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 42, #9 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 43, #10 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 44, #11 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 45, #12 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 46, #13 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 47, #14 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 48, #15 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 49, #16 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 50, #17 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 51, #18 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 53, #19 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 54, #20 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 55, #21 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 56, #22 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 57, #23 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 58, #24 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 59, #25 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 61, #26 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 62, #27 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 63, #28 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 64, #29 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 65, #30 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 66, #31 Exhibit Depo of M. Matthews Ex. 67) (DIETZ, MATTHEW)
July 3, 2020 Filing 382 TRIAL BRIEF by FLORIDA COUNCIL OF THE BLIND, DOLOR GINCHEREAU, DEBORAH C GRUBB, DOUGLAS E HALL, JAMES K KRACHT, CARL F MCCOY. (DIETZ, MATTHEW)
July 3, 2020 Filing 381 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by ORGANIZE FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (SCOTT, SHARION) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 380 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S NOTICE OF PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO THE POSITIONS OF CO-DEFENDANT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 379 SIX SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' TRIAL BRIEF(SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 378 NOTICE OF JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS BY THE 6 CANVASSING BOARDS (SHEARMAN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 3, 2020 Filing 377 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION (78] FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION BY MARK F NEGLEY (CUFFE, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 7/3/2020 (rcb).
July 2, 2020 Filing 376 NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL IN SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS by PASCO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (WOLFGRAM, JORDAN)
July 2, 2020 Filing 375 NOTICE OF JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS BY THE 24 CANVASSING BOARDS (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 7/6/2020 (rcb).
July 2, 2020 Filing 374 NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL ON BEHALF OF THE CANVASSING BOARDS OF CHARLOTTE COUNTY, CLAY COUNTY, DUVAL COUNTY, MARTIN COUNTY, OSCEOLA COUNTY, PALM BEACH COUNTY, POLK COUNTY, AND ST. LUCIE COUNTY (LABASKY, RONALD) Modified to edit title on 7/3/2020 (rcb).
July 2, 2020 Filing 373 TRIAL BRIEF OF DEFENDANT MARION COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (MINTER, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 7/2/2020 (rcb).
July 2, 2020 Filing 372 PINELLAS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO THE POSITIONS OF CO-DEFENDANT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS (VICARI, KELLY) Modified to edit title on 7/2/2020 (rcb).
July 2, 2020 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT C SHEARMAN on behalf of ALETRIS FARNAM, GLADES COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, DIANE HAGEN, HARDEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, HENDRY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, HOLMES COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, BRENDA HOOTS, TAMMY JONES, LEVY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, THERISA MEADOWS, OKEECHOBEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, DIANE SMITH (SHEARMAN, ROBERT)
July 2, 2020 Filing 370 SIX SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF FILING IN SUPPORT OF FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brenda Hoots) (OLIVO, GERALDO) Modified to edit title on 7/2/2020 (rcb).
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER DENYING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The remaining parts of the preliminary-injunction motions, ECF Nos. #86 and #230 , are denied. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/2/2020. (rcb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 368 DEFENDANT BROWARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS (KATZMAN, ADAM) Modified to edit title on 7/2/2020 (rcb).
July 1, 2020 Filing 365 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE-Governor Ron DeSantis (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 7/2/2020 (rcb). Modified to edit title on 7/2/2020 (rcb).
July 1, 2020 Filing 364 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE-Attorney General Ashley Moody (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit on 7/2/2020 (rcb). Modified to edit title on 7/2/2020 (rcb).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER AMENDING THE SCHEDULE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THE THIRD AMENDED WILLIAMS COMPLAINT. The trial set for 7/20/2020 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE, and will be conducted entirely by videoconference. The Grubb plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #318 , to advance the deadline for the Secretary to respond to the Grubb plaintiffs' request for production is granted. The deadline is advanced to 7/1/2020. The Williams plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend, ECF No. #341 , is granted. Their third amended complaint, ECF No. [341-1], is deemed filed as of June 26. The deadline for the defendants to respond is 7/6/2020. The deadline to answer the Nielsen and Grubb complaints is 7/6/2020. The deadline for trial briefs remains 7/3/2020 and is not extended even though July 3 is a holiday. Supplements may be filed by 7/6/2020 to address information from the deposition of Guy Cecil. The deadline remains 7/6/2020) for Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3) disclosures and prefiling all exhibits. But any document first received during discovery after 6/30/2020 may be included on a supplemental exhibit list and prefiled by 7/10/2020. The deadline for objections to exhibits is 7/13/2020. But the deadline is 7/15/2020 for objections to exhibits on a supplemental list. The parties have waived first-level hearsay objections to reports of experts who testify at the trial. The reports for all such witnesses must be filed by 7/6/2020. Motions in limine must be filed by 7/6/2020. Transcripts of depositions that will be offered into evidence, based either on an agreement or as allowed under the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure even in the absence of an agreement, must be filed by 7/13/2020. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a pretrial conference by video for 7/15/2020, 2020 at 10:15 a.m. The video may be made available for viewing by members of the public in the courtroom if a request is made to the courtroom deputy clerk by not later than 7/14/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/30/2020. (rcb)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER DISMISSING THE NIELSEN AND WILLIAMS COMPLAINTS IN PART. These motions to dismiss are granted in part and denied in part: ECF Nos. #80 , #82 , #84 , #95 (as amended by #97 ), #105 , #114 , #140 , #157 , #208 , #237 , #256 , and #322 . These motions to dismiss are denied: ECF Nos. #234 and #277 . This motion to dismiss is denied as moot: ECF No. #79 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/1/2020. (rcb)
June 30, 2020 Filing 363 HERNANDO COUNTY SUPERVISOR'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN RESPONSES TO INTERVENORS' PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION(JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/30/2020 (rcb).
June 30, 2020 Filing 362 Summons Issued as to Chief Financial Officer Jimmy Patronis Florida Election Canvassing Commission (rcb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 361 SEVENTEEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Supervisor Antonacci, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Supervisor Doyle, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Supervisor Arrington, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Supervisor Edwards) (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 6/30/2020 (rcb).
June 29, 2020 Filing 360 SIX SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF FILING IN SUPPORT OF FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Jones) (OLIVO, GERALDO) Modified to edit title on 6/30/2020 (rcb).
June 29, 2020 Filing 359 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF No. #352 ) (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/30/2020 (rcb).
June 29, 2020 Filing 358 Summons Issued as to ASHLEY MOODY in her official capacity as commissioner of the FloridaElections Canvassing Commission (rcb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 357 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
June 29, 2020 Filing 356 Summons Issued as to GOVERNOR RON DESANTIS IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS A COMMISSIONER OF THE FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION. (rcb)
June 28, 2020 Filing 355 ALACHUA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS, KIM BARTON'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF No. #352 ) (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/29/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 Filing 354 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO THE SECRETARY OF STATE'S, ATTORNEY GENERAL'S, FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISSION'S, AND SIXTY COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSEN AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (DOC. 290) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/29/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 Filing 353 THE SECRETARY OF STATE'S ANSWER TO THE INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 6/29/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 Filing 352 FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PLAINTIFF INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chambless Declaration, #2 Affidavit Oakes Declaration, #3 Affidavit Fusco Declaration) (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 6/29/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 Filing 351 REPLY TO SECRETARY OF STATE'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO GRUBB INTERVENORS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Finney) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 6/29/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 Filing 350 NOTICE of Summonses to be Issued by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (Attachments: #1 Summons to Ashley Moody) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 349 LAKE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' POSITIONS (JOHNSON, DIANA) Modified to edit title on 6/29/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 Filing 348 Defendant, Sarasota County Canvassing Board's Notice of Superseding Joinder and Agreed Prospective Deferral In Supervisor of Elections Positions (BENTLEY, MORGAN) Modified to edit title on 6/26/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 Filing 347 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/26/2020. Ruling by Court: Intervenors' Motion to Shorten Time is granted; the response deadline is July 1. Motion for Leave to Amend is granted. Motions to Dismiss are granted in part and denied in part (postage and hurricane claims are dismissed; all other claims will go forward). Deadline for Secretary's response to Grubb complaint is extended to July 1. Deadline to file answers to complaints is July 6. Any exhibits not filed by June 30 to be filed by July 10. Expert reports to be filed by July 6. Trial briefs to be filed by July 3. Motions in Limine due by July 6 and a hearing on those motions will be set by video for July 15 at 10:15 a.m. Bench trial remains set for July 20 and will take place remotely (by video). An order detailing the rulings will follow. (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder) (ckm)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting #340 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Florence Bryan is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/26/2020. (jcw)
June 26, 2020 Filing 345 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS LISA LEWIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND CANVASSING BOARD OF VOLUSIA COUNTY, NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF SECRETARY OF STATES, ATTORNEY GENERALS, FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISIONS, AND SIXTY COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSON AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (DOC. #339 ) by LISA LEWIS, VOLUSIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (CARROLL, FRANCIS)
June 26, 2020 Filing 344 NOTICE OF FILING ADDITIONAL NEW 11TH CIRCUIT AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF INTERVENOR'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [DE230] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Eleventh Circuit Order, #2 Exhibit District Court Preliminary Injunction) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 6/26/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 Filing 343 NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' POSITIONS(MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 6/29/2020 (rcb).
June 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #340 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Florence Bryan.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5400947.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
June 25, 2020 Filing 342 SECRETARY OF STATE'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO GRUBB PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- June 7, 2020 MIT/UMich Paper, #2 Exhibit B- Timeline Correspondence with Sen. Simmons, #3 Exhibit C- Review Form for OmniBallot, #4 Exhibit D- May Draft Test Report) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 6/26/2020 (rcb).
June 25, 2020 Filing 341 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Service for DeSantis, #3 Exhibit Waiver of Service for FECC) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/26/2020 (rcb).
June 25, 2020 Filing 340 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Florence Bryan.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5400947.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia) (BRYAN, FLORENCE) Modified to edit title on 6/26/2020 (rcb).
June 25, 2020 Filing 339 DEFENDANTS LISA LEWIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND CANVASSING BOARD OF VOLUSIA COUNTY, NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF SECRETARY OF STATES, ATTORNEY GENERALS, FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISIONS, AND SIXTY COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSON AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (DOC. 290) by LISA LEWIS, VOLUSIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 6/26/2020 (rcb).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER ON CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/25/2020. (rcb)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/25/2020. (rcb)
June 25, 2020 Filing 336 DEFENDANT SECRETARY OF STATE LAUREL M. LEE'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO INTERVENORS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY (PRICE, TARA) Modified to edit title on 6/26/2020 (rcb).
June 25, 2020 Filing 335 PLAINTIFF_INTERVENORS' OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT filed by FLORIDA COUNCIL OF THE BLIND, DOLOR GINCHEREAU, DEBORAH C GRUBB, DOUGLAS E HALL, JAMES K KRACHT, CARL F MCCOY. (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 6/25/2020 (rcb).
June 25, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings All Defendant's Responses to the Grubb plaintiffs preliminary-injunction motion due by 7/2/2020. Defendant Secretary of State Response by 6/25/2020. (rcb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 334 Joint MOTION To Enter Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Protective Order) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/25/2020 (rcb).
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting #319 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney BROOKE M GAFFNEY terminated. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/24/20. (sms)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER DENYING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ON ALL ISSUES BUT ONE. The Williams plaintiffs preliminary-injunction motion, ECF No. 86, is denied in part and remains pending in part. The Nielsen plaintiffs preliminary-injunction motion, ECF No. 89, is denied. The Grubb plaintiffs preliminary-injunction motion, ECF No. 230, remains pending. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/24/20. (sms)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting in part #317 . The deadline is July 2, 2020 ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/2/2020). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/24/20. (sms)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER denying #323 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/24/20. (sms)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #284 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #288 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #292 Motion to Amend/Correct. The second version of the second amended complaint [292-1] is deemed filed as of June 24, 2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/24/20. (sms)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER ADVANCING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND BY JUNE 25, 2020, TO THE GRUBB PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXPEDITE DISCOVERY. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/24/20. (sms)
June 24, 2020 Filing 327 RESPONSE TO FIFTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINITIFF-INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 6/25/2020 (rcb).
June 24, 2020 Filing 326 DEFENDANT DAVID H. STAFFORD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF No. #317 ) (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 24, 2020 Filing 325 SIX SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN 57 SUPERVISORS' OF ELECTIONS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF #317 ) (OLIVO, GERALDO) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 24, 2020 Filing 324 LEVY COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' OBJECTIONS TO CORPORATE-DEPOSITION TOPICS (OLIVO, GERALDO) Modified to edit title on 6/25/2020 (rcb).
June 24, 2020 Response to County Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 6/22/2020 terminated-ECF #312 & #313 filed (rcb) Modified to edit docket text & terminate deadline on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 24, 2020 Supervisors & County Canvassing Boards Responses due by 6/22/2020) terminated-ECF #309 , #311 , #317 , #323 , #325 & #326 (rcb) Modified to edit docket text & terminate deadline on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 23, 2020 Filing 323 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND TO INCREASE THE WORD LIMIT FOR THE NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED REPLY TO THE STATE- AND COUNTY-LEVEL DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITIONS TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED ON JUNE 19 AND 22, RESPECTIVELY (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 23, 2020 Filing 322 DEFENDANT LEON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (O'STEEN, CHASITY) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 23, 2020 Filing 321 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL (RIGGANS, LASHAWN) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 23, 2020 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by CHASITY HOPE O'STEEN on behalf of LEON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (O'STEEN, CHASITY)
June 23, 2020 Filing 319 MOTION FOR LEA VE TO WITHDRAW AL AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS, LISA LEWIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAP A CITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR VOLUSIA COUNTY AND VOLUSIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD(GAFFNEY, BROOKE) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 23, 2020 Filing 318 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY AND TO SHORTEN TIME TO RESPOND TO THIS MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiff, Dream Defenders First Request for Production to Florida Secretary of State, #2 Exhibit 2- Intervenors First Request for Production to Florida Secretary of State) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 23, 2020 Filing 317 FIFTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFINTERVENORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 23, 2020 Filing 316 DEFENDANTS LISA LEWIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND CANVASSING BOARD OF VOLUSIA COUNTY, NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (DKT. #277 ) (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 315 DECLARATION OF PAMELA CATALDO (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 314 DECLARATION OF EMERSON GORDON-MARVIN(NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 313 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Angel Munoz, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ericka Gomez-Tejeda) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 312 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO THE TWENTY-EIGHT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF 140), HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (ECF #157 ), JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT BY DEFENDANTS CRAIG LATIMER, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (ECF #208 ) AND MIAMI-DADE COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW FOR WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF JOINDER (ECF #256 ) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 311 DEFENDANT PASCO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN THE OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSON AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (WOLFGRAM, JORDAN) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER DENYING #298 MR. NOLAN'S AMICUS MOTION.Mr. Nolan's motion for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae, ECF No. #298 , is denied. The proposed brief, ECF No. [26-1], is struck. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/22/2020. (rcb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 309 LISA LEWIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR THE COUNTY OF VOLUSIAS RESPONSE TO THE PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND JOINDER IN THE RESPONSE FILED BY LAUREL LEE AND SUPERVISORS (DKT. #290 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Of Lisa Lewis, #2 Exhibit Response to Request For Admissions) (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 308 ESCAMBIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS DAVID H. STAFFORD'S POSITION(JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 307 DEFENDANT, ORANGE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS (MCHENRY, SCOTT) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER INCREASING THE WORD LIMIT FORTHE PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION RESPONSE. The defendants' motion, ECF No. #289 , to exceed the word limit for their response to the preliminary-injunction motions is granted. The response is deemed properly filed. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/22/2020. (rcb)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE INTERVENORS COMPLAINT. The Secretary's unopposed motion, ECF No. #275 , to extend the deadline to respond to the intervenors complaint is granted. The deadline is extended to 6/26/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/22/2020. (rcb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 304 LAKE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (JOHNSON, DIANA) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 303 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, LAKE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (JOHNSON, DIANA) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #297 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jocelyn Wiesner is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Plaintiffs pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/22/2020. (jcw)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting #266 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam Lioz is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs (Bianca Maria Baez, Dream Defenders, Murray Heller, Paulina Hernandez Morales, New Florida Majority Education Fund, Organize Florida, Celcio Eduardo Romero, Sheila Young, and Zebra Coalition) in this matter pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/22/2020. (jcw)
June 22, 2020 Filing 300 DEFENDANTS CRAIG LATIMER, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY AND THE HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE'S, ATTORNEY GENERAL'S, FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISSION'S, AND SIXTY COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSEN AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (DOC. 290) (TODD, STEPHEN) Modified to edit title on 6/23/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 299 MONROE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS (SHILLINGER, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 298 Motion For Leave To File Brief Of Amicus Curiae Qualified Federal Write-In Candidate With No Party Affiliation, by John G. "Gerry" Nolan. (rcb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2020: #1 Exhibit) (rcb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2020: #2 Exhibit) (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 297 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia) (WIESNER, JOCELYN) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 296 THE HERNANDO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL TO SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 295 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN THE OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSON AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 294 DEFENDANT ESCAMBIA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTION'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN THE SECRETARY OF STATES, ATTORNEY GENERAL'S, FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISSIONS, AND SIXTY COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSEN AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (ECF No. 290) (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 Filing 293 DEFENDANT PINELLAS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE'S, ATTORNEY GENERAL'S, FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISION'S, AND SIXTY COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSON AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (DOC. #290 ) (VICARI, KELLY) Modified to edit title n 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 22, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #297 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jocelyn Wiesner.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5374380.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb) Modified to edit docket text on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 21, 2020 Filing 292 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISSION (WITH REVISED EXHIBIT) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 20, 2020 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDY V BARDOS on behalf of CHRIS ANDERSON (BARDOS, ANDY)
June 19, 2020 Filing 290 THE SECRETARY OF STATE'S, ATTORNEY GENERAL'S, FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISIONS, AND SIXTY COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NIELSEN AND DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 289 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXCEED WORD LIMIT IN OPPOSITION TO THE PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (WENGER, EDWARD) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 288 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISSION (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 287 DEFENDANT, ORANGE COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (ECF No. 277) (SHANNIN, NICHOLAS) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 286 Miami-Dade County Defendants' Notice of Joinder (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 285 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 284 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE FLORIDA ELECTION CANVASSING COMMISSION. Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 283 DEFENDANT PINELLAS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTION'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF THE FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFINTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (DONNELL, ASHLEY) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 282 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION(GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 281 ALACHUA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS, KIM BARTON'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (ECF No. #277 ) (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 280 DEFENDANT BROWARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION IN MOTION TO DISMISS (KATZMAN, ADAM) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 279 DEFENDANT, INDIAN RIVER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF SUPERSEDING JOINDER AND AGREED PROSPECTIVE DEFERRAL IN SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS POSITIONS (REINGOLD, DYLAN) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 278 ESCAMBIA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT (ECF No. 277) (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 277 FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT by CHRIS ANDERSON, PETER ANTONACCI, MICHAEL BENNETT, BRIAN E CORLEY, TOMMY DOYLE, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, JOYCE GRIFFIN, ALAN HAYS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, WESLEY WILCOX. (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 276 DEFENDANT PINELLAS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD ,NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF H E RNAND O COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISINTERVENORS' COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (KAHN, JARED) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 19, 2020 Filing 275 SECRETARY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT(JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 6/22/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER EXTENDING THE PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Williams plaintiffs' second motion, ECF No. #271 , to extend the deadline to respond to the county defendants motions to dismiss or for summary judgment is granted. The deadline is extended to June 22, 2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/18/2020.(MKB) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR ADDITIONAL SUPERVISORS TO RESPOND TO THE PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION MOTION. The deadline for all supervisors and county canvassing boards to respond to the preliminary-injunction motion is extended to June 22, 2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/18/2020.(MKB) Modified to edit title on 6/24/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 272 NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ATTORNEY GENERAL'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/19/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 271 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #256 MOTION to Dismiss the Williams Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Notice of DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/19/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 270 DEFENDANTS PAUL LUX, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS (STEWART, GREGORY) Modified to edit title on 6/19/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 269 DEFENDANT PASCO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (WOLFGRAM, JORDAN) Modified to edit title on 6/19/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 268 ESCAMBIA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS (ECF No. #234 , #237 and #256 ) (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/19/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 Filing 267 DEFENDANTS PAUL LUX, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ELLIS, ELIZABETH) Modified to edit title on 6/19/2020 (rcb).
June 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #266 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Lioz.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5362793.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 266 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Lioz.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5362793.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Adam Lioz) (LIOZ, ADAM)
June 17, 2020 Filing 265 ATTORNEY GENERAL OF FLORIDA'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ASHLEY MOODY (AGARWAL, AMIT) Modified to edit title on 6/18/2020 (rcb).
June 17, 2020 Filing 264 DEFENDANTS LISA LEWIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND CANVASSING BOARD OF VOLUSIA COUNTY, NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND UNOPPSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 6/18/2020 (rcb).
June 17, 2020 Filing 263 DEFENDANT MARION COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS (MINTER, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 6/18/2020 (rcb).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #244 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Andrew Bergman is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs in this matter pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/17/2020. (jcw)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #242 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alexi M. Velez is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs Kirk Nielsen, Morgan Outlaw, Revel Lubin, Felicia Bruce, Barbara DeVane, Ray Davis, Donesa Jackson, Alianza for Progress, Inc., Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, Inc., and Priorities USA pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/17/2020. (jcw)
June 17, 2020 Filing 260 HERNANDO AND ESCAMBIA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CLARIFY OR AMEND THIS COURT'S ORDER OF JUNE 16, 2020, WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/18/2020 (rcb).
June 17, 2020 Filing 259 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATIONS (NUNNALLY, AMBER) Modified to edit title on 6/18/2020 (rcb).
June 17, 2020 Filing 258 DEFENDANT, MANATEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND NOTICE OF JOINDER (LEVITT, MARK) Modified to edit title on 6/18/2020 (rcb).
June 17, 2020 Filing 257 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/26/2020 10:15 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
June 16, 2020 Filing 256 Miami-Dade County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and incorporated memorandum of law for Williams Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Joinder (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 6/17/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 255 DEFENDANT KIM A. BARTON'S, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF ALACHUA COUNTY, FLORIDA, MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified on 6/17/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR 58 SUPERVISORS TO RESPOND TOTHE PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION MOTION #247 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #86 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #89 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/22/2020).). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/16/20. (sms)
June 16, 2020 Filing 253 DEFENDANT PINELLAS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF THE FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by DEBORAH CLARK. (DONNELL, ASHLEY) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 252 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (OLIVELLA, MIGUEL) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 251 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (PATEL, ANITA) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 250 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 249 ESCAMBIA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 248 MOTION FOR SHAWN T. SHEEHY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING ON BEHALF OF INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATIONS(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 247 FIFTY-SEVEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #242 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexi Velez.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5348364.), #244 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Bergman.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5348454.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
June 16, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Per ECF #254 re: #247 & #253 Responses not filed earlier: 6/22/2020). (rcb)
June 16, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Seminole County Canvassing Board Answer due by 7/6/2020. (rcb)
June 15, 2020 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Dismiss with Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #79 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (KARPATKIN, JEREMY)
June 15, 2020 Filing 245 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE STATE AND REPUBLICANS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 15, 2020 Filing 244 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Bergman.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5348454.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Texas) (BERGMAN, ANDREW)
June 15, 2020 Filing 243 RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF DEFENDANTS KIM A. BARTON, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR ALACHUA COUNTY, AND ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 15, 2020 Filing 242 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexi Velez.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5348364.) by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 241 NOTICE Of Joinder in Motions by KIM A BARTON re #208 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #233 Notice (Other), #234 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Intervenors' Complaint (SWAIN, ROBERT)
June 15, 2020 Filing 240 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE-(VOSE, WADE) Modified to edit title on 6/16/2020 (rcb).
June 15, 2020 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK E LEVITT on behalf of MANATEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (LEVITT, MARK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 238 NOTICE of Joinder and Adoption of Hernando County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Intervenors' Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by LISA LEWIS, VOLUSIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (CARROLL, FRANCIS)
June 12, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Attorneys Dennis Polio and David Anstaett Admissions Deadline by 6/26/2020. (rcb)
June 12, 2020 Filing 237 Miami-Dade County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and incorporated memorandum of law for Nielsen Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [D.E. #37 ] and Notice of Joinder. (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 6/14/2020 (rcb).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting #231 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David Anstaett is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs Kirk Nielsen, Morgan Outlaw, Revel Lubin, Felicia Bruce, Barbara DeVane, Ray Davis, Donesa Jackson, Alianza for Progress, Inc., Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, Inc., and Priorities USA pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/12/2020. (jcw)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #227 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Dennis W. Polio is admitted pro hac vice to represent Intervenor-Defendants, the Republican National Committee, the National Republican Congressional Committee, and the Republican Party of Florida, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/12/2020. (jcw)
June 12, 2020 Filing 234 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/12/2020 (rcb).
June 12, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #231 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Anstaett.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5334663.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 233 DEFENDANTS LISA LEWIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND CANVASSING BOARD OF VOLUSIA COUNTY, NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF THE JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dkt. 47) AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, BY DEFENDANTS CRAIG LATIMER, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS, AND HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (Dkt. #208 ) (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 6/12/2020 (rcb).
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER DENYING #138 THE BAKER MOTIONTO DISMISS THE WILLIAMS COMPLAINT. The motion of the Baker County Supervisor of Elections and others, ECF No. #138 , to dismiss the Williams plaintiffs second amended complaint, or for a more definite statement, is denied.. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/11/2020. (rcb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 231 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DAVID ANSTAETT TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING FOR PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/12/2020 (rcb).
June 11, 2020 Filing 230 INTERVENORS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Kracht, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Deborah Grub, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Finney, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Douglas Hall, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Dolor Ginchereau, #6 Exhibit Declaration of McCoy) (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 6/12/2020 (rcb).
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #206 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Lilian Timmermann is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs Kirk Nielsen, Morgan Outlaw, Revel Lubin, Felicia Bruce, Barbara DeVane, Ray Davis, Donesa Jackson, Alianza for Progress, Inc., Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, and Priorities USA pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/11/2020. (jcw)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #213 THE MOTION TO FILE AREPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF INTERVENTION.The Grubb plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #213 , for leave to file a reply memorandum in support of their motion to intervene is denied as moot. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/11/2020. (rcb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 227 MOTION FOR DENNIS W. POLIO TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING ON BEHALF OF INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATIONS( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5331414.) by Republican Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 6/11/2020 (rcb).
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR THE MIAMI-DADE RESPONSE TO THE NIELSEN AMENDED COMPLAINT. The consented motion, ECF No. #225 , to extend the deadline for the Miami-Dade County Supervisor of Elections to respond to the Nielsen plaintiffs' amended complaint is granted. The deadline is extended to 6/12/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/11/2020. (rcb)
June 11, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #227 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennis W. Polio.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5331414.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
June 10, 2020 Filing 225 Defendant Christina White's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Nielsen Complaint by CHRISTINA WHITE. (VALDES, MICHAEL) Modified to edit title on 6/11/2020 (rcb).
June 10, 2020 Filing 224 THREE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARDS NOTICE OF JOINDER IN TWENTY-EIGHT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. #140 ) (OLIVO, GERALDO) Modified to edit title on 6/11/2020 (rcb).
June 10, 2020 Filing 223 DEFENDANT, KIM BARTON, AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF ALACHUA COUNTY AMENDED NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER ON THE REQUIRED RESPONSE TO THE FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSIONS MOTION TO DISMISS. The plaintiffs should address not only the issues raised in the Commission's motion but also this issue: whether some or all of the claims against the Commission are barred by the Eleventh Amendment. See Seminole Tribe of Fla. v. Florida, 517 U.S. 44 (1996) (holding that a state sued in its own name has Eleventh Amendment immunity, regardless of the relief sought, unless the immunity has been waived or validly abrogated by Congress under the Fourteenth Amendment. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/10/2020. (rcb)
June 10, 2020 Filing 221 ESCAMBIA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 10, 2020 Filing 220 DEFENDANT ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASING BOARD'S NOTICE IN JOINDER IN MOTIONS (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 10, 2020 Filing 219 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 10, 2020 Filing 218 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF BEHALF OF THE CANVASSING BOARDS OF CHARLOTTE COUNTY, CLAY COUNTY, DUVAL COUNTY, OSCEOLA COUNTY, MARTIN COUNTY, POLK COUNTY, AND ST. LUCIE COUNTY (LABASKY, RONALD) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SECOND ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE AND INCREASING THE WORD LIMIT FORRESPONSES TO THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The deadline to respond to the state-level defendants' and Republican organizations' motions is 6/15/2020. The deadline to respond to county-level defendants motions is 6/19/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/10/2020. (rcb)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER ALLOWING INTERVENTION. The motion for leave to intervene, ECF No. #121 in Case No. 1:20cv67, is granted. The intervention complaint, ECF No. [121-1] in Case No. 1:20cv67, is deemed filed as of June 10, 2020. The deadline for responses to the intervention complaint is 6/19/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/10/2020. (rcb)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE CLAIMS AGAINST THE GOVERNOR. All claims against the Governor are dismissed without prejudice. I do not direct the entry of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/10/2020. (rcb)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE AND INCREASING THE WORD LIMIT FOR RESPONSES TO THE #188 , #194 and #197 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The deadline to respond to the state-level defendants' and Republican organizations' motions is 6/15/2020. The deadline to respond to county-level defendants' motions is 6/19/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/10/2020. (rcb)
June 10, 2020 Filing 213 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO THE SECRETARY OF STATE'S RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO INTERVENE (DIETZ, MATTHEW) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 10, 2020 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW WILSON DIETZ on behalf of DEBORAH C GRUBB, DOUGLAS E HALL, CARL F MCCOY, JAMES K. KRACHT, DOLOR GINCHEREAU, FLORIDA COUNCIL OF THE BLIND (DIETZ, MATTHEW)
June 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #206 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lilian Timmermann.(Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5324706.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 211 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE OF NO OBJECTION TO DEBORAH C. GRUB, DOUGLAS E. HALL, CARL F. MCCOY, JAMES K. KRACHT, DOLOR GINCHEREAU, AND THE FLORIDA COUNCIL OF THE BLINDS MOTION TO INTERVENE AS PLAINTIFFS filed by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 210 NINE SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO INTERVENE by PETER ANTONACCI, MICHAEL BENNETT, BRIAN E CORLEY, TOMMY DOYLE, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, JOYCE GRIFFIN, ALAN HAYS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, WESLEY WILCOX (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 209 SECRETARY'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE (ECF #121 , CASE NO. 1:20-CV-67-RH) filed by LAUREL M LEE. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 208 JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dkt. #47 ) AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, BY DEFENDANTS CRAIG LATIMER, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS, AND HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (TODD, STEPHEN) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 207 DEFENDANT PASCO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINTS IN THE DREAM DEFENDERS AND NIELSEN CASES by Pasco County Canvassing Board. (WOLFGRAM, JORDAN) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 206 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LILIAN TIMMERMANN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING FOR PLAINTIFFS( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5324706.) by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 205 DEFENDANTS PAUL LUX, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE by PAUL A LUX, OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (ELLIS, ELIZABETH) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 204 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF BEHALF OF DEFENDANT'S WENDY SARTORY LINK, PALM BEACH COUNTY SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS AND THE PALM BEACH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (LABASKY, RONALD) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 203 DEFENDANT, PINELLAS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER. (KAHN, JARED) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 202 DEFENDANT BROWARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS> by BROWARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (MCINTOSH, KRISTEN) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 8, 2020 Filing 201 REPUBLICAN PARTY ORGANIZATION INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Texas Democratic Party v. Abbott, No. 20-50407, 2020 WL 2982937 (5th Cir. June 4, 2020)) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 6/9/2020 (rcb).
June 8, 2020 Filing 200 DREAM DEFENDERS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO INCREASE WORD COUNT OF PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSES by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/9/2020 (rcb).
June 8, 2020 Filing 199 Summons Issued as to Honorable James DeKleva Chair Seminole County Canvassing Board. (rcb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 198 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation by all Plaintiffs, Defendant DeSantis and Defendant Lee by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 5, 2020 Filing 197 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED1 MOTION2 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE ON JUNE 19, 2020 TO COUNTY-LEVEL DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO INCREASE WORD COUNT LIMIT OF PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/8/2020 (rcb).
June 5, 2020 Filing 195 DEFENDANT SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF PALM BEACH COUNTY'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS (LAVIA, JOHN) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 5, 2020 Filing 194 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION1 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE ON JUNE 19, 2020 TO COUNTY-LEVEL DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO INCREASE WORD COUNT LIMIT OF PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 5, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
June 5, 2020 Filing 192 DEFENDANT, SEMINOLE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN TWENTY-EIGHT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. #140 ) (VOSE, WADE) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 5, 2020 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by WADE CHRISTOPHER VOSE on behalf of Seminole County Canvassing Board (VOSE, WADE)
June 5, 2020 Filing 190 Summons Issued as to Honorable Kerra Smith Escambia County Canvassing Board (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued-David Stafford Escambia County Supervisor of Elections #2 Exhibit Summons Issued-Honorable August Bonavita Palm Beach County Canvassing Board (rcb) ).
June 5, 2020 Filing 189 AMENDED NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION #78 FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY THE 23 SUPERVISORS by MARK ANDERSEN, BOBBY BEASLEY, STARLET CANNON, VICKI P CANNON, SHARON CHASON, NITA CRAWFORD, TRAVIS HART, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, WILLIAM KEEN, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, GINA MCDOWELL, VICKY OAKES, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CHARLES OVERTURF, HEATHER RILEY, CAROL F RUDD, DANA SOUTHERLAND, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A VILLANE, HENRY WELLS, GLENDA B WILLIAMS re #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 6/8/2020 (rcb).
June 5, 2020 Filing 188 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE ON JUNE 15, 2020 TO STATE-LEVEL DEFENDANTS' AND INTERVENOR'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO INCREASE WORD COUNT OF PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 6/8/2020 (rcb).
June 5, 2020 Filing 187 Defendant's Ron Turner Supervisor Of Elections Of Sarasota County, Florida And Sarasota County Canvassing Board Notice Of Joinder In Motion To Dismiss Filed By Twenty-Eight Supervisors Of Elections #140 (BENTLEY, MORGAN) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 5, 2020 Filing 186 DEFENDANT, INDIAN RIVER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN SEVENTEEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. #78 ) (REINGOLD, DYLAN) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 4, 2020 Filing 196 Summons Issued as to Honorable James DeKleva Seminole County Canvassing Board. (rcb)
June 4, 2020 Filing 185 DEFENDANT SUSAN GILLS NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SCOTT, DALE) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 4, 2020 Filing 184 DEFENDANT SUSAN GILLS NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS (SCOTT, DALE) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 4, 2020 Filing 183 DEFENDANT PINELLAS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINTS IN THE DREAM DEFENDERS AND NIELSEN CASES (DONNELL, ASHLEY) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 4, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD PAUL CUFFE on behalf of MARK ANDERSEN, BOBBY BEASLEY, STARLET CANNON, VICKI P CANNON, SHARON CHASON, NITA CRAWFORD, TRAVIS HART, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, WILLIAM KEEN, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, GINA MCDOWELL, MARK F NEGLEY, VICKY OAKES, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CHARLES OVERTURF, HEATHER RILEY, CAROL F RUDD, DANA SOUTHERLAND, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A VILLANE, HENRY WELLS, GLENDA B WILLIAMS (CUFFE, EDWARD)
June 4, 2020 Filing 181 SIX SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN SEVENTEEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. #78 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Diane Smith-Ex A, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Brenda Hoots Ex B) (OLIVO, GERALDO) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 4, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by CORBIN FREDERICK HANSON on behalf of ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (HANSON, CORBIN)
June 4, 2020 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN on behalf of ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (SWAIN, ROBERT)
June 4, 2020 Filing 178 DEFENDANT, CHRIS ANDERSON, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR SEMINOLE COUNTY, AND DEFENDANT, OKEECHOBEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN TWENTY-EIGHT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. #140 ) (VOSE, WADE) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 4, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by WADE CHRISTOPHER VOSE on behalf of CHRIS ANDERSON, Okeechobee County Canvassing Board (VOSE, WADE)
June 4, 2020 Filing 176 NOTICE OF CORRECTED SUMMONSES by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Summons 1:20-cv-00067-RH-GRJ Exh. 53-16, #2 Exhibit Corrected Summons 1:20-cv-00067-RH-GRJ Exh. 53-83) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
June 4, 2020 Filing 175 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 174 ESCAMBIA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN TWENTY-EIGHT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. #140 ) AND HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY DEFENDANTS AMENDED JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF No. #97 ) (JOHNSON, KIA) Modified to edit title on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 4, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Response to ECF #121 by 6/9/2020). (rcb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 173 DEFENDANTS, BILL COWLES, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS FOR ORANGE COUNTY, AND ORANGE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARDS, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS (ECF NO. #105 & #140 ) (SHANNIN, NICHOLAS) Modified to edit title on 6/4/2020 (rcb).
June 3, 2020 Filing 172 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. Okeechobee County Canvassing Board waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 171 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. LEVY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 170 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. HOLMES COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 169 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. HENDRY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 168 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. HARDEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 167 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. GLADES COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL BENY VALDES on behalf of Miami-Dade County Canvassing Board (VALDES, MICHAEL)
June 3, 2020 Filing 165 DEFENDANTS LISA LEWIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND CANVASSING BOARD OF VOLUSIA COUNTY, NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINTS IN THE DREAM DEFENDERS AND NIELSEN CASES (CARROLL, FRANCIS) Modified to edit title on 6/3/2020 (rcb).
June 3, 2020 Filing 164 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. MARK ANDERSEN waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; BOBBY BEASLEY waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; STARLET CANNON waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; VICKI P CANNON waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; SHARON CHASON waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; NITA CRAWFORD waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; TRAVIS HART waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; ELIZABETH P HORNE waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; LAURA HUTTO waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; WILLIAM KEEN waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; SHIRLEY G KNIGHT waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; GINA MCDOWELL waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; MARK F NEGLEY waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; VICKY OAKES waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; DEBORAH K OSBORNE waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; CHARLES OVERTURF waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; HEATHER RILEY waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; CAROL F RUDD waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; DANA SOUTHERLAND waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; SYLVIA D STEPHENS waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; TERRY VAUGHAN waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; TAPPIE A VILLANE waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; HENRY WELLS waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 163 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. LISA LEWIS Supervisor of Elections for Volusia waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/3/2020 (rcb).
June 3, 2020 Filing 162 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. Volusia County Canvassing Board waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 161 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. BILL COWLES Orange County Supervisor of Elections waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 6/3/2020 (rcb).
June 3, 2020 Filing 160 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. Orange County Canvassing Board waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 159 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. SHIRLEY ANDERSON waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 158 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORGANIZE FLORIDA, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, SHEILA YOUNG, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, DREAM DEFENDERS. HERNANDO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (NAIFEH, STUART)
June 3, 2020 Filing 157 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/3/2020 (rcb).
June 3, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by OREN ROSENTHAL on behalf of Miami-Dade County Canvassing Board (ROSENTHAL, OREN)
June 3, 2020 Filing 155 DEFENDANTS PAUL LUX, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF OKALOOSA COUNTY, AND OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARDS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS (STEWART, GREGORY) Modified to edit title on 6/3/2020 (rcb).
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER ADVANCING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE KRACHT MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED IN CASE NO. 1:20cv67. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/3/20. (sms)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DISMISSING ACACIA WILLIAMS'S CLAIMS. Ms. Williams's claims are dismissed without prejudice. I do not direct the entry of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/2/2020. (rcb)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER ALLOWING A PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION MEMORANDUM OF EXCESSIVE LENGTH. The Dream Defenders plaintiffs' unopposed motions, ECF No. #87 and #112 , for leave to exceed the word limit for their preliminary-injunction memorandum is granted. The proffered memorandum, ECF No. 112-1, is deemed properly filed as of May 28, 2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/2/2020. (rcb) Modified correct filing date on 6/5/2020 (rcb).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER TREATING ECF NOS. #88 , #89 AND #90 AS TIMELY. The Nielsen plaintiffs' unopposed motion, ECF No. #106 , to treat as timely ECF Nos. #88 , #89 and #90 is granted. The documents are deemed timely. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/2/2020. (rcb)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER ON FILINGS IN WRONG DOCKET. This order treats improper filings in No. 1:20cv67, as well as filings that crossed in cyberspace, as properly before the court. But further filings should be made only in No. 4:20cv236, with only the specific exceptions noted in the May 26 consolidation order. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/2/2020. (rcb)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #128 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Omorogieva is admitted pro hac vice to represent "Dream Defenders Plaintiffs," pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/2/2020. (jcw)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Junghyun Baek is admitted pro hac vice to represent "Dream Defenders Plaintiffs," pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/2/2020. (jcw)
June 2, 2020 Filing 147 Summons Issued as to Honorable Cara F Rada Chair, LAKE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (rcb)
June 2, 2020 Filing 146 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 2, 2020 Filing 145 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 144 DEFENDENT KIM A. BARTON, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF ALACHUA COUNTY, FLORIDA, JOINDER IN MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY TWENTY-EIGHT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTION (ECF #140 ) (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 143 DEFENDENT KIM A. BARTON, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF ALACHUA COUNTY, FLORIDA, JOINDER IN MOTION TO DISMISS FILED SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS REGARDING WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS (DKT #138 ), ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 142 DEFENDENT KIM A. BARTON, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF ALACHUA COUNTY, FLORIDA, JOINDER IN MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY HERNANDO COUNTY REGARDING NIELSEN PLAINTIFFS (DKT 105) (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 141 DEFENDANT, INDIAN RIVER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN TWENTY-EIGHT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. #140 )(REINGOLD, DYLAN) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 140 TWENTY-EIGHT SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS MOTION TO DISMISS by PETER ANTONACCI, MICHAEL BENNETT, BRIAN E CORLEY, TOMMY DOYLE, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, JOYCE GRIFFIN, ALAN HAYS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, WESLEY WILCOX. (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 139 HERNANDO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 138 SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY WILLIAMS PLAINTIFFS ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by MARK ANDERSEN, BOBBY BEASLEY, STARLET CANNON, VICKI P CANNON, SHARON CHASON, NITA CRAWFORD, MARK EARLEY, TRAVIS HART, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, WILLIAM KEEN, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, GINA MCDOWELL, MARK F NEGLEY, VICKY OAKES, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CHARLES OVERTURF, HEATHER RILEY, CAROL F RUDD, DANA SOUTHERLAND, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A VILLANE, GERTRUDE WALKER, HENRY WELLS, GLENDA B WILLIAMS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/15/2020). (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN RIVERS WOLFGRAM on behalf of Pasco County Canvassing Board (WOLFGRAM, JORDAN)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING #81 , #87 , and #112 LEAVE TO EXCEED THE WORD LIMITS. The pending motions to exceed the word limits, ECF Nos. #81 , #87 , and #112 are granted. The limits are extended as requested. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/1/2020. (rcb)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Order Extending The Plaintiffs' 26(a)(2) Deadline. The Dream Defenders plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #71 , to extend the deadline for their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) disclosures is granted. The deadline is extended to 5/27/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/1/2020. (rcb)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #108 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jeffery Andrew Miller is admitted pro hac vice to represent "Dream Defenders Plaintiffs," pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 6/1/2020. (jcw)
June 1, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
June 1, 2020 Filing 132 Hernando County Supervisor of Elections' NOTICE of Joinder and Joinder in Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by SHIRLEY ANDERSON with (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Shirley Anderson) (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 6/1/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 131 Notice of Joinder In Motion #78 For Partial Summary Judgment By The 24 Supervisors by MARK ANDERSEN, BOBBY BEASLEY, STARLET CANNON, VICKI P CANNON, SHARON CHASON, NITA CRAWFORD, VICKI DAVIS, TRAVIS HART, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, WILLIAM KEEN, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, GINA MCDOWELL, MARK F NEGLEY, VICKY OAKES, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CHARLES OVERTURF, HEATHER RILEY, CAROL F RUDD, LORI SCOTT, DANA SOUTHERLAND, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A VILLANE, HENRY WELLS, GLENDA B WILLIAMS re #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (ERDELYI, SUSAN) Modified to edit title on 6/1/2020 (rcb).
June 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #127 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Junghyun Baek.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5282447.), #128 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Omorogieva.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5282405.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE of Joinder in Motion by MARTY BISHOP, JOHN HANLON, THOMAS R HARDEE, KAITI LENHART, PENNY OGG, CONNIE SANCHEZ, LORI SCOTT re #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (MARI, FRANK)
May 29, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK MICHAEL MARI on behalf of BREVARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, FLAGLER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, GILCHRIST COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, GULF COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, HIGHLANDS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, JEFFERSON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, Madison County Canvassing Board (MARI, FRANK)
May 29, 2020 Filing 128 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Omorogieva.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5282405.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, ACACIA WILLIAMS, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (OMOROGIEVA, WILLIAM)
May 29, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Junghyun Baek.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5282447.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia) (BAEK, JUNGHYUN)
May 29, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by DALE A SCOTT on behalf of CITRUS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (SCOTT, DALE)
May 29, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN RAY BENTLEY on behalf of RON TURNER (BENTLEY, MORGAN)
May 29, 2020 Filing 124 DEFENDENT KIM A. BARTON, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF ALACHUA COUNTY, FLORIDAS NOTICE OF JOINDER IN SEVENTEEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. #78 ) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim Barton) (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 5/31/2020 (rcb).
May 29, 2020 Filing 123 DEFENDANT PINELLAS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF DEFENDANT HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AMENDED JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dkt. 97), AND CITATION OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 5/31/2020 (rcb).
May 29, 2020 Filing 122 DEFENDANT PINELLAS COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND ADOPTION OF DEFENDANT HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AMENDED JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dkt. 97), AND CITATION OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY (VICARI, KELLY) Modified to edit title on 5/31/2020 (rcb).
May 29, 2020 Filing 121 DEFENDANT PAUL LUXS NOTICE OF JOINDER IN SEVENTEEN SUPERVISORS OF ELECTIONS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. #78 ) (ELLIS, ELIZABETH) Modified to edit title on 5/31/2020 (rcb).
May 29, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by DYLAN T REINGOLD on behalf of Indian River County Canvassing Board (REINGOLD, DYLAN)
May 29, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE of Joinder in Seventeen Supervisors of Elections' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 78) by DAVID H STAFFORD (JOHNSON, KIA)
May 29, 2020 Filing 118 Summons Issued as to Honorable James R Adams, Chair Lee County Canvassing Board (rcb)
May 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #108 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Andrew Miller.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5277710.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Amanda Callais is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs Kirk Nielsen, Morgan Outlaw, Revel Lubin, Felicia Bruce, Barbara DeVane, Ray Davis, Donesa Jackson, Alianza for Progress, Inc., Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, and Priorities USA pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/28/2020. (jcw)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jonathan P. Lienhard is admitted pro hac vice to represent the proposed Intervenor-Defendants the Republican National Committee ("RNC"), the National Republican Congressional Committee ("NRCC"), and the Republican Party of Florida ("RPOF"), pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/28/2020. (jcw)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Zachary Newkirk is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs Kirk Nielsen, Morgan Outlaw, Revel Lubin, Felicia Bruce, Barbara DeVane, Ray Davis, Donesa Jackson, Alianza for Progress, Inc., Florida Alliance for Retired Americans, and Priorities USA pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/28/2020. (jcw)
May 28, 2020 Filing 114 DEFENDENT KIM A. BARTON, SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF ALACHUA COUNTY, FLORIDA, JOINDER IN THE AMENDED MOTION TO DISMSS FILED BY DEFENDANT CRAIG LATIMER SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY (Dkt #97 ) (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified to edit title on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 113 DISCLOSURE BY DEFENDANT KIM BARTON OF SIMILAR CASE UNDER LOCAL RULE 5.6 (SWAIN, ROBERT) Modified on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 112 AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION IN EXCESS OF THE WORD LIMIT by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Proposed Memorandum) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE OF AMENDED EXHIBITSby BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION re #92 Affidavit, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from SOEs to Governor, #2 Exhibit B - Alachua Cty Errors Report 2020 PPP, #3 Exhibit C - Miami-Dade Cty Notice of Incomplete Registration, #4 Exhibit D - Baringer, et al, Voting by Mail and Ballot Rejection, #5 Exhibit E - Democracy Live Omniballot Online Flyer) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY KARPATKIN on behalf of BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION (KARPATKIN, JEREMY)
May 28, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE OF AMENDED EXHIBITS by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION re #86 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Daniel A. Smith) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 108 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Andrew Miller.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5277710.) by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (MILLER, JEFFREY)
May 28, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
May 28, 2020 Filing 106 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File And Accept Out of Time Notice of Filing ECF #88 , Motion For Preliminary Injunction ECF #89 , And Memorandum of Law In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction ECF #90 by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 105 Hernando County Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SHIRLEY ANDERSON, Hernando County Canvassing Board. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/11/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DMM Chapter 700, #2 Exhibit B - Postal Bulletin, #3 Exhibit C - AJC Article, #4 Exhibit D - Guardian Blog Post, #5 Exhibit E - Ch. 28670, L.O.F., #6 Exhibit F - Ch. 77-175, L.O.F.) (JOUBEN, JON) Modified to edit title on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by OREN ROSENTHAL on behalf of CHRISTINA WHITE (ROSENTHAL, OREN)
May 28, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL BENY VALDES on behalf of CHRISTINA WHITE (VALDES, MICHAEL)
May 28, 2020 Filing 102 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #63 Summons Issued,,,,, Acknowledgment filed by OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD. (STEWART, GREGORY)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ALLOWING REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATIONS TO INTERVENE RE #53 Motion to Intervene. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/28/20. (sms)
May 28, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by JARED DOUGLAS KAHN on behalf of Pinellas County Canvassing Board (KAHN, JARED)
May 28, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH DESLOGE ELLIS on behalf of OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (ELLIS, ELIZABETH)
May 28, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY THOMAS STEWART on behalf of OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (STEWART, GREGORY)
May 28, 2020 Filing 97 AMENDED* JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dkt. 37) AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, BY DEFENDANTS CRAIG LATIMER, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS AND HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (*Amended as to inclusion of Certificate of Compliance only) (TODD, STEPHEN) Modified to edit title on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 96 Summons Issued as Honorable Augustus D Aikens Jr Chair, Leon County Canvassing Board. (rcb)
May 28, 2020 Filing 95 Joint Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Dkt. #37 And Memorandum of law In Support By Defendants Craig Latimer In His Official Capacity As Hillsborough County Supervisor Of Elections And Hillsborough County Canvassing Board by Hillsborough County Canvassing Board, CRAIG LATIMER. (TODD, STEPHEN) Modified to edit title on 5/29/2020 (rcb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 94 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ALL COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that for all future pleadings in this case and any future cases assigned to Judge Hinkle, exhibits attached to a document filing should be properly identified in the docket text when posting the document. (Example: Deposition of John Doe rather than Exhibit A.) (rcb)
May 28, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by BROOKE M GAFFNEY on behalf of LISA LEWIS, Volusia County Canvassing Board (GAFFNEY, BROOKE)
May 28, 2020 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT re #86 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Kathryn Sadasivan by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (NAIFEH, STUART)
May 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan P. Lienhard.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5264268.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
May 27, 2020 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT re #86 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declarations in Support by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Marsha Bukala, #2 Affidavit Paulina Hernandez Morales, #3 Affidavit Celcio Eduardo Romero, #4 Affidavit Sheila Young, #5 Affidavit Robyn Wise) (NAIFEH, STUART)
May 27, 2020 Filing 90 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 87 Motion For Leave To File A Preliminary Injunction Motion In Excess Of The Word Limit by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 86 Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Acacia Williams, #2 Affidavit Alicia Wujciak, #3 Affidavit Bianca Baez, #4 Affidavit Dream Defenders, #5 Affidavit John Jordan, #6 Affidavit Murray Heller, #7 Affidavit New Florida Majority, #8 Affidavit Nicholas Ciriello, #9 Affidavit Organize Florida, #10 Affidavit Zetta Williams, #11 Affidavit Kousser Report, #12 Affidavit Smith Report) (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 85 Republican Party Organizations' Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 84 Republican Organizations' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Jugment (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/10/2020). (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 83 Dream Defenders Plaintiffs' Notice of Joinder In Nielsen Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition To Replublican Organizations' Motion To Intervene As Defendants filed by BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, DREAM DEFENDERS, MURRAY HELLER, PAULINA HERNANDEZ MORALES, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND, ORGANIZE FLORIDA, CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION. (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 82 Governor And Secretary's Motion To Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/10/2020). (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 81 Unopposed Motion To Exceed Word Limit In Governor And Secretary's Motion To Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 80 Attorney General of Florida's Motion To Dismiss And Memorandum of Law (DESOUSA, JEFFREY) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 79 Defendant Elections Canvassing Commission's Motion To Dismiss As An Improper Party (Case No. 4:20-cv-236) (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/10/2020). (TEEGEN, ELIZABETH) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 78 Seventeen Supervisor's of Elections' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Federal Register Publication, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Mary Hall, #3 Exhibit C Declaration of Supervisor Doyle, #4 Exhibit D Declaration of Supervisor Edwards, #5 Exhibit E Declaration of Supervisor Arrington) (BARDOS, ANDY) Modified to edit on 5/28/2020 (rcb). **Supervisors of Elections for Broward, Collier, Indian River, Lee, Lake Manatee, Marion, Monroe and Pasco Counties**
May 27, 2020 Filing 77 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition To Republican Organizations' Motion To Intervene As Defendants re #53 MOTION to Intervene filed by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by DALE A SCOTT on behalf of SUSAN A GILL (SCOTT, DALE)
May 27, 2020 Filing 75 Acceptance of Service (TODD, STEPHEN) Modified to edit on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 74 Motion For Jonathan P Lienhard To Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent To Designation, And Request To Electronically Receive Notices Of Electronic Filing On Behalf Of Proposed Intervenor-Defendants Repulican Organization (Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5264268.) by Republican Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 73 Notice of Dismissal by Acacia Williams Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 by ACACIA WILLIAMS (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 72 Summons Issued as to Hillsborough County Canvassing Board, Polk County Canvassing Board, St. Lucie County Canvassing Board, Suwannee County Canvassing Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued-Honorable Regers, #2 Exhibit Summons Issued-Honorable Taylor, #3 Exhibit Summons Issued-Honorable Williams) (rcb)
May 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Callais.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5215737.), #24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Newkirk.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5215452.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. *Action not required by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (kjw)
May 26, 2020 Filing 71 Motion For Extension Of Time To Serve Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures. Modified to edit title on 5/27/2020 (rcb).
May 26, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE Summonses to be Issued by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (Attachments: #1 Summons to Robert Regers, #2 Summons to Margaret Taylor, #3 Summons to William Williams) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
May 26, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY LYNN VICARI on behalf of DEBORAH CLARK (VICARI, KELLY)
May 26, 2020 Filing 68 Dream Defenders Plaintiffs' More Definite Statement by CELCIO EDUARDO ROMERO, SHEILA YOUNG, ZEBRA COALITION, MURRAY HELLER, Acacia Williams, BIANCA MARIA BAEZ, Paulina Hernandez Morales, Dream Defenders, Organize Florida, NEW FLORIDA MAJORITY EDUCATION FUND re #66 Order (NAIFEH, STUART) Modified to edit title on 5/26/2020 (rcb).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND SETTING THE SCHEDULE. The motions to consolidate, ECF No. 74 in Case No. 1:20cv67 and ECF No. #32 in Case No. 4:20cv236, are granted in part. The Republican organizations oral motion for leave to file a reply memorandum in support of the motion is denied, but the motions will not be denied without allowing a reply memorandum. The motions for protective orders, ECF No. 78-82 in ECF No. 1:20cv67, are denied. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/26/2020. (rcb) Modified to edit links on 5/28/2020 (rcb).
May 26, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings re: #67 -The combined preliminary-injunction hearing and trial on the merits is set for the two-week trial period that begins on Monday, 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. The deadline is 5/26/2020 for the Williams plaintiffs' Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) disclosures. The deadline is 5/27/2020 for responses to the Republican organizations' motion to intervene, ECF No. #53 in Case No. 4:20cv236. The deadline is 5/27/2020 for the Williams plaintiffs supplement to their preliminary-injunction motion. The deadline is 5/27/2020 for the Nielsen plaintiffs preliminary-injunction motion. The deadline is 5/27/2020 for summary-judgment motions (other than deemed summary-judgment motions included in trial briefs). The deadline for response to the production requests is 6/1/2020. The deadline for the Governor and Secretary of State to respond to the current versions of the complaints is 5/27/2020. The deadline for the Supervisors of Elections to respond to the current versions of the complaints is later of 6/1/2020 or 14 days after service of process or acceptance of service of process. The deadline for defendants to identify experts is 6/8/2020. The deadline for the defendants' 26(a)(2) disclosures is 6/15/2020. The deadline for the defendants responses to the preliminary-injunction motions is 6/19/2020. The deadline for any reply memorandum is 6/26/2020, but a trial brief and reply memorandum should not be repetitive. The discovery deadline is 6/30/2020. The deadline is 7/3/2020 for trial briefs. The deadline is 7/13/2020 for responses to trial briefs. Each party must file its Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3) disclosures by 7/6/2020. The deadline for objections is 7/13/2020. Each party must prefile all its exhibits by 7/6/2020. (rcb)
May 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REQUIRING A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/24/2020. (MKB)
May 22, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTEN M MCINTOSH on behalf of BROWARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (MCINTOSH, KRISTEN)
May 22, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM M KATZMAN on behalf of BROWARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (KATZMAN, ADAM)
May 22, 2020 Filing 63 Summons Issued as to BAKER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, CITRUS COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, Franklin County Canvassing Board, Hamilton County Canvassing Board, Holmes County Canvassing Board, Nassau County Canvassing Board, OKALOOSA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, Okeechobee County Canvassing Board, Pasco County Canvassing Board, Sarasota County Canvassing Board, St. Johns County Canvassing Board, Wakulla County Canvassing Board, Washington County Canvassing Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued Sestak, #2 Exhibit Summons Issued Brewer, #3 Exhibit Summons Issue Escambia County Canvassing Board, #4 Exhibit Holmes County Canvassing Board, #5 Exhibit Nassua County Canvassing Board, #6 Exhibit Summons Issued St Johns Canvassing Board, #7 Exhibit Summons Issued-Wakulla County Canvassing Board, #8 Exhibit Okeechobee County Canvassing Board, #9 Exhibit Okaloosa County Canvassing Board, #10 Exhibit Baker County Canvassing Board, #11 Exhibit Citrus County Canvassing Board, #12 Exhibit Sarasota County Canvassing Board) (rcb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2020: #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit Honorable Robert Plaines Chair, Jefferson County Canvassing Board, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit Honorable Erika Quartermaine Chair, Sarasota County Canvassing Board, #17 Exhibit Honorable Anthony Ritonous Chair, Highlands County Canvassing Board, #18 Exhibit) (rcb).
May 22, 2020 Filing 62 Summons Issued as to ALACHUA COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, BREVARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, BROWARD COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, DIXIE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, Gilchrist County Canvassing Board, Glades County Canvassing Board, Gulf County Canvassing Board, Indian River County Canvassing Board, Marion County Canvassing Board, Putnam County Canvassing Board, Volusia County Canvassing Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued- Dixie Canvassing Board, #2 Exhibit Volusia County Canvassing Board, #3 Exhibit Brevard Canvassing Board, #4 Exhibit Gilchrist Canvassing Board, #5 Exhibit Glades Canvassing Board, #6 Exhibit Broward County Canvassing Board, #7 Exhibit Marion County Canvassing Board, #8 Exhibit Gulf County Canvassing Board, #9 Exhibit Indian River Canvassing Board, #10 Exhibit Putnam County Canvassing Board) (rcb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 61 Summons Issued as to CALHOUN COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD, Gadsden County Canvassing Board, Hardee County Canvassing Board, Hendry County Canvassing Board, Hernando County Canvassing Board, Lafayette County Canvassing Board, Manatee County Canvassing Board, Monroe County Canvassing Board, Osceola County Canvassing Board, Santa Rosa County Canvassing Board, Walton County Canvassing Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued-Honorable Garner Gadsden Canvassing Board, #2 Exhibit Summons Issued Honorable Green Walton County Canvassing Board, #3 Exhibit Summons Issued Calhoun County Canvassing Board, #4 Exhibit Summons Issued Hon Hill Hendry County Canvassing Board, #5 Exhibit Summons Issue-Santa Rosa County Canvassing Board, #6 Exhibit Hernando County Canvassing Board, #7 Exhibit Hardee County Canvassing Board, #8 Exhibit Summons Issued-Hon Inman Manatee County Canvassing Board, #9 Exhibit Summons Issued-Hon Jackson Lafayette County Canvassing Baord, #10 Exhibit Summons Issued-Hon. Jancewica Osceola County Canvassing Board) (rcb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/22/2020. Courts hears argument of counsel on pending motions. Court conducts pretrial conference and addresses deadlines. Ruling by Court: Motions to Consolidate Cases are granted. The primary case will be 4:20cv236. Briefs on the Motion to Intervene are due by May 27. Plaintiffs are to file a short and succinct position of their claims against the Defendants. The Motions for Protective Order are denied as moot. Bench trial remains set for July 20. All deadlines and detailed rulings will be set out in an order to follow. (Court Reporter Megan Hague) (ckm)
May 22, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK MICHAEL MARI on behalf of JOHN HANLON (MARI, FRANK)
May 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge #24 Motion For Zachary Newkirk To Appear Pro Hac Vice Consent To Designation, And Request To Electronically Receive Notices Of Electronic Filing For PlaintiffS & #25 Motion For Amanda Callais To Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent To Designation, And Request To Electronically Receive Notices Of Electronic Filing For Plaintiffs Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK MICHAEL MARI on behalf of MARTY BISHOP, THOMAS R HARDEE, KAITI LENHART, CONNIE SANCHEZ (MARI, FRANK)
May 21, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY on behalf of Republican Organizations (TORCHINSKY, JASON)
May 21, 2020 Filing 56 Summons Issued as to Bay County Canvassing Board, Bradford County Canvassing Board, Charlotte County Canvassing Board, Clay County Canvassing Board, DeSoto County Canvassing Board, Duval County Canvassing Board, Flagler County Canvassing Board, Levy County Canvassing Board, Madison County Canvassing Board, Miami-Dade County Canvassing Board, Monroe County Canvassing Board, Orange County Canvassing Board, Pinellas County Canvassing Board, Taylor County Canvassing Board, Union County Canvassing Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued Tatum, #2 Exhibit Summons Issued Brewer, #3 Exhibit Summons Issued E Browning, #4 Exhibit Summons Issued Flower, #5 Exhibit Summons Issued J Browning, #6 Exhibit Summons Issued Bigney, #7 Exhibit Summons Issued Distler, #8 Exhibit Summons Issued Carassas, #9 Exhibit Summons Issued Ferrer, #10 Exhibit Summons Issued Collins, #11 Exhibit Summons Issued Campbell, #12 Exhibit Summons Issued Bishop, #13 Exhibit Summons Issued P Bell, #14 Exhibit Summons Issued Fowler) (rcb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN J GIBSON on behalf of Republican Organizations (GIBSON, BENJAMIN)
May 21, 2020 Filing 54 Republican Organizations' Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Intervene (GIBSON, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 5/22/2020 (rcb).
May 21, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Intervene by Republican Organizations. (GIBSON, BENJAMIN)
May 21, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by KIA M. JOHNSON on behalf of Escambia County Canvassing Board (JOHNSON, KIA)
May 21, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY LEEDS NEWHALL on behalf of FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, ASHLEY MOODY (NEWHALL, TIMOTHY)
May 21, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANN TEEGEN on behalf of FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, ASHLEY MOODY (TEEGEN, ELIZABETH)
May 21, 2020 Filing 49 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: TO ALL ATTORNEYS OF RECORD- A reminder, the parties named in the above-referenced document were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. For future reference: Please review the procedures for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website) at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (Click on CM/ECF link and go to General Info.) (rcb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE - Summonses to be Issued by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (Attachments: #1 Summons to Peter Bell, #2 Summons to Jeanette Bigney, #3 Summons to Mitchell Bishop, #4 Summons to Bill Blue, #5 Summons to Danielle Brewer, #6 Summons to James Browning, #7 Summons to Bailey Browning, #8 Summons to Timothy Campbell, #9 Summons to John Carassas, #10 Summons to Timothy Collins, #11 Summons to Tatum Davis, #12 Summons to Melissa Distler, #13 Summons to Victoria Ferrer, #14 Summons to Gary Flower, #15 Summons to Peary Fowler, #16 Summons to Kathy Garner, #17 Summons to David Green, #18 Summons to Kevin Grover, #19 Summons to Darrell Hill, #20 Summons to Robert Hillard, #21 Summons to Kurt Hitzemann, #22 Summons to David Horton, #23 Summons to Renee Inman, #24 Summons to Darren Jackson, #25 Summons to Stefania Jancewicz, #26 Summons to Thomas Jaworski, #27 Summons to Jennifer Johnson, #28 Summons to Christopher Kelly, #29 Summons to David C. Koenig, #30 Summons to Sheree Lancaster, #31 Summons to Jack Lundy, #32 Summons to Kathleen McCarthy, #33 Summons to Jim McCune, #34 Summons to Timothy McFarland, #35 Summons to Nicole Menz, #36 Summons to Elizabeth Morris, #37 Summons to Frederick Peel, #38 Summons to Robert Plaines, #39 Summons to Michael Provost, #40 Summons to Erika Quartermaine, #41 Summons to Anthony Ritonous, #42 Summons to Kathleen Roberts, #43 Summons to Sonny Scaff, #44 Summons to William Sestak, #45 Summons to Gordon Shuler, #46 Summons to Kerra Smith, #47 Summons to Lucas Taylor, #48 Summons to John Taylor, Jr., #49 Summons to Charles Tinlin, #50 Summons to Jill Walker, #51 Summons to William Wallace, #52 Summons to Jim Ward, #53 Summons to Joseph Williams, #54 Summons to Mark Yerman) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
May 21, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH DESLOGE ELLIS on behalf of PAUL A LUX (ELLIS, ELIZABETH)
May 21, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY THOMAS STEWART on behalf of PAUL A LUX (STEWART, GREGORY)
May 21, 2020 Filing 45 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Monroe County Canvassing Board. Amendment to #41 Notice of Appearance (SHILLINGER, ROBERT)
May 21, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS JOSEPH CARROLL, Jr on behalf of LISA LEWIS (CARROLL, FRANCIS)
May 21, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY)
May 21, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT BLAKE SHILLINGER, JR on behalf of JOYCE GRIFFIN (SHILLINGER, ROBERT)
May 21, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT BLAKE SHILLINGER, JR on behalf of Monroe County Canvassing Board (SHILLINGER, ROBERT)
May 21, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI on behalf of MARK ANDERSEN, BOBBY BEASLEY, VICKI P CANNON, SHARON CHASON, NITA CRAWFORD, TRAVIS HART, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, WILLIAM KEEN, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, GINA MCDOWELL, MARK F NEGLEY, VICKY OAKES, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CHARLES OVERTURF, HEATHER RILEY, CAROL F RUDD, DANA SOUTHERLAND, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A VILLANE, HENRY WELLS (ERDELYI, SUSAN)
May 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #24 Motion For Zachary Newkirk To Appear Pro Hac Vice Consent To Designation, And Request To Electronically Receive Notices Of Electronic Filing For PlaintiffS & #25 Motion For Amanda Callais To Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent To Designation, And Request To Electronically Receive Notices Of Electronic Filing For Plaintiffs. (rcb) Modified to add title of each motion and referred to Magistrate Judge on 5/22/2020 (rcb).
May 20, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDY V BARDOS on behalf of PETER ANTONACCI, MICHAEL BENNETT, BRIAN E CORLEY, TOMMY DOYLE, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, JOYCE GRIFFIN, ALAN HAYS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, WESLEY WILCOX (BARDOS, ANDY)
May 20, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY PAUL DESOUSA on behalf of ASHLEY MOODY (DESOUSA, JEFFREY)
May 20, 2020 Filing 37 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DONESA JACKSON, PRIORITIES USA, MORGAN OUTLAW, KIRK NIELSEN, RAY DAVIS, REVEL LUBIN, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, BARBARA DEVANE. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
May 20, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD A LABASKY on behalf of MARY JANE ARRINGTON, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, VICKI DAVIS, MARK EARLEY, LORI EDWARDS, MIKE HOGAN, THERISA MEADOWS, PAUL STAMOULIS, GERTRUDE WALKER (LABASKY, RONALD)
May 20, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN MARK TODD on behalf of CRAIG LATIMER (TODD, STEPHEN)
May 20, 2020 Filing 34 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: An ISO is needed (rcb)
May 20, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK MICHAEL MARI on behalf of PENNY OGG (MARI, FRANK)
May 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: 34 Docket Annotation (rcb)**An ISO is needed**
May 19, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by RON DESANTIS, LAUREL M LEE. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
May 18, 2020 Filing 31 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by FRANK MICHAEL MARI on behalf of LORI SCOTT (MARI, FRANK) Modified to edit title on 5/19/2020 (rcb).
May 18, 2020 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, TERRY VAUGHAN. (Attachments: #1 Bradford) (bkp)
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by SUMMER DENAY BROWN on behalf of MARK EARLEY (BROWN, SUMMER)
May 18, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by S DENAY BROWN on behalf of MARK EARLY (HERRON, MARK) Modified to edit title on 5/19/2020 (rcb).
May 18, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK HERRON on behalf of MARK EARLEY (HERRON, MARK)
May 15, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by KIA M. JOHNSON on behalf of DAVID H STAFFORD (JOHNSON, KIA)
May 14, 2020 Filing 25 Motion For Amanda Callais To Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent To Designation, And Request To Electronically Receive Notices Of Electronic Filing For Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5215737.) by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 5/15/2020 (rcb).
May 14, 2020 Filing 24 Motion For Zachary Newkirk To Appear Pro Hac Vice Consent To Designation, And Request To Electronically Receive Notices Of Electronic Filing For PlaintiffS( Filing fee $201 receipt number AFLNDC-5215452.) by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified to edit title on 5/15/2020 (rcb).
May 14, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to MIKE HOGAN. (bkp)
May 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA A FORD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (FORD, CHRISTINA)
May 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a telephonic preliminary Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 pretrial conference simultaneously in these two cases (1:20cv67-RH-GRJ and 4:20cv236-RH-MJF) for May 22, 2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/12/2020. (atm) Modified on 5/28/2020 - This is a duplicate entry of ECF #14 (atm).
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MICHAEL DEVANEY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DEVANEY, JOHN)
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E ELIAS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ELIAS, MARC)
May 12, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS INC, FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
May 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 09:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JON A JOUBEN on behalf of SHIRLEY ANDERSON (JOUBEN, JON)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a telephonic preliminary Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 pretrial conference simultaneously in these two cases for May 22, 2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/12/2020. (rcb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: An ISO is needed. (rcb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CORBIN FREDERICK HANSON on behalf of KIM A BARTON (HANSON, CORBIN)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN on behalf of KIM A BARTON (SWAIN, ROBERT)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to MARK ANDERSEN, MARY JANE ARRINGTON, BOBBY BEASLEY, MICHAEL BENNETT, MARTY BISHOP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (rcb)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to SHIRLEY KNIGHT, STARLET CANNON, SUSAN GILL, SYLVIA D STEPHENS, TAMMY JONES, VICKI P CANNON, VICKI DAVIS, TOMMY DOYLE, THOMAS R HARDEE, TRAVIS HART, WILLIAM KEEN, WENDY SARTORY LINK, THERISA MEADOWS, VICKY OAKES, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A VILLANE, WESLEY WILCOX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit) (rcb)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to SHIRLEY ANDERSON, PETER ANTONACCI, SHARON CHASON, NITA CRAWFORD, MIKE HOGAN, PAUL A LUX, PENNY OGG, PAUL STAMOULIS, RON TURNER, DIANE HAGAN, MARK ANDERSON, MARK EARLEY, MARK NEGLEY, MARTY BISHOP, MARY JANE ARRINGTON AND MICHAEL BENNETT . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit) (rcb)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. Plaintiffs have filed their Local Rule 5.6 Notice of Similar Case indicating there is a related case pending in the Gainesville Division of the Northern District of FloridaWilliams, et al. v. DeSantis, et al., 1:20cv67-RH/GRJ. Because Judge Robert Hinkles case and this case are related and Judge Hinkle's case was filed first, this Court directs the Clerk to reassign this case to Judge Hinkle. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/5/2020. (rcb)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to KIM A BARTON, RON DESANTIS, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, LORI EDWARDS, JOYCE GRIFFIN, JOHN HANLON, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, LAUREL M LEE, KAITI LENHART, LISA LEWIS, GINA MCDOWELL, HEATHER RILEY, DIANE SMITH, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, GERTRUDE WALKER, HENRY WELLS, ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION,GLENDA WILLIAMS AND LORI SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit) (rcb)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CHRIS ANDERSON, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, DEBORAH CLARK, MIKE HOGAN, CRAIG LATIMER, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, CONNIE SANCHEZ, DANA SOUTHERLAND, DAVID H STAFFORD, CHRISTINA WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (rcb)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRIAN E CORLEY, BILL COWLES, ALETRIS FARNAM, ALAN HAYS, ASHLEY MOODY, CHARLES OVERTURF, CAROL F RUDD, BOBBY BEASLEY AND BRENDA HOOTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (rcb)
May 5, 2020 JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE added. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. (rcb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Similar Case by ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS, INC., FELICIA BRUCE, RAY DAVIS, BARBARA DEVANE, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, DONESA JACKSON, REVEL LUBIN, KIRK NIELSEN, MORGAN OUTLAW, PRIORITIES USA (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against MARK ANDERSEN, CHRIS ANDERSON, SHIRLEY ANDERSON, PETER ANTONACCI, MARY JANE ARRINGTON, KIM A BARTON, BOBBY BEASLEY, MICHAEL BENNETT, MARTY BISHOP, STARLET CANNON, VICKI P. CANNON, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, SHARON CHASON, DEBORAH CLARK, BRIAN E. CORLEY, BILL COWLES, NITA CRAWFORD, VICKI DAVIS, RON DESANTIS, TOMMY DOYLE, MARK EARLEY, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, LORI EDWARDS, ALETRIS FARNAM, SUSAN A. GILL, JOYCE GRIFFIN, DIANE HAGEN, JOHN HANLON, THOMAS R. HARDEE, TRAVIS HART, ALAN HAYS, MIKE HOGAN, BRENDA HOOTS, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, TAMMY JONES, WILLIAM KEEN, SHIRLEY G. KNIGHT, CRAIG LATIMER, LAUREL M LEE, KAITI LENHART, LISA LEWIS, WENDY SARTORY LINK, PAUL A. LUX, GINA MCDOWELL, THERISA MEADOWS, ASHLEY MOODY, MARK F NEGLEY, VICKY OAKES, PENNY OGG, DEBORAH K. OSBORNE, CHARLES OVERTURF, HEATHER RILEY, CAROL F. RUDD, CONNIE SANCHEZ, LORI SCOTT, DIANE SMITH, DANA SOUTHERLAND, DAVID H STAFFORD, PAUL STAMOULIS, SYLVIA D. STEPHENS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, THE FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, RON TURNER, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A. VILLANE, GERTRUDE WALKER, HENRY WELLS, CHRISTINA WHITE, WESLEY WILCOX, GLENDA B. WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5172996.), filed by DONESA JACKSON, PRIORITIES USA, MORGAN OUTLAW, KIRK NIELSEN, RAY DAVIS, REVEL LUBIN, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS, INC., FELICIA BRUCE, BARBARA DEVANE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons M. Andersen, #3 Summons S. Anderson, #4 Summons C. Anderson, #5 Summons Antonacci, #6 Summons Arrington, #7 Summons Barton, #8 Summons Beasley, #9 Summons Bennett, #10 Summons Bishop, #11 Summons S. Cannon, #12 Summons Chambless, #13 Summons Chason, #14 Summons Clark, #15 Summons Corley, #16 Summons Cowles, #17 Summons Crawford, #18 Summons Davis, #19 Summons DeSantis, #20 Summons Doyle, #21 Summons Earley, #22 Summons J. Edwards, #23 Summons Elections Canvassing Commission, #24 Summons Farnam, #25 Summons Gill, #26 Summons Griffin, #27 Summons Hagan, #28 Summons Hanlon, #29 Summons Hardee, #30 Summons Hart, #31 Summons Hays, #32 Summons Hogan, #33 Summons Hoots, #34 Summons Horne, #35 Summons Hutto, #36 Summons Jones, #37 Summons Keen, #38 Summons Knight, #39 Summons Latimer, #40 Summons Lee, #41 Summons Lenhart, #42 Summons Lewis, #43 Summons Link, #44 Summons Lux, #45 Summons McDowell, #46 Summons Meadows, #47 Summons Moody, #48 Summons Negley, #49 Summons Oakes, #50 Summons Ogg, #51 Summons Osborne, #52 Summons Overturf, #53 Summons Riley, #54 Summons Rudd, #55 Summons Sanchez, #56 Summons Scott, #57 Summons Smith, #58 Summons Southerland, #59 Summons Stafford, #60 Summons Stamoulis, #61 Summons Stephens, #62 Summons Swan, #63 Summons Turner, #64 Summons Vaughan, #65 Summons Villane, #66 Summons Walker, #67 Summons Wells, #68 Summons White, #69 Summons Wilcox, #70 Summons Williams, #71 Summons V. Cannon, #72 Summons L. Edwards) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against MARK ANDERSEN, CHRIS ANDERSON, SHIRLEY ANDERSON, PETER ANTONACCI, MARY JANE ARRINGTON, KIM A BARTON, BOBBY BEASLEY, MICHAEL BENNETT, MARTY BISHOP, STARLET CANNON, VICKI P. CANNON, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, SHARON CHASON, DEBORAH CLARK, BRIAN E. CORLEY, BILL COWLES, NITA CRAWFORD, VICKI DAVIS, RON DESANTIS, TOMMY DOYLE, MARK EARLEY, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, LORI EDWARDS, ALETRIS FARNAM, SUSAN A. GILL, JOYCE GRIFFIN, DIANE HAGEN, JOHN HANLON, THOMAS R. HARDEE, TRAVIS HART, ALAN HAYS, MIKE HOGAN, BRENDA HOOTS, ELIZABETH P HORNE, LAURA HUTTO, TAMMY JONES, WILLIAM KEEN, SHIRLEY G. KNIGHT, CRAIG LATIMER, LAUREL M LEE, KAITI LENHART, LISA LEWIS, WENDY SARTORY LINK, PAUL A. LUX, GINA MCDOWELL, THERISA MEADOWS, ASHLEY MOODY, MARK F NEGLEY, VICKY OAKES, PENNY OGG, DEBORAH K. OSBORNE, CHARLES OVERTURF, HEATHER RILEY, CAROL F. RUDD, CONNIE SANCHEZ, LORI SCOTT, DIANE SMITH, DANA SOUTHERLAND, DAVID H STAFFORD, PAUL STAMOULIS, SYLVIA D. STEPHENS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, THE FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, RON TURNER, TERRY VAUGHAN, TAPPIE A. VILLANE, GERTRUDE WALKER, HENRY WELLS, CHRISTINA WHITE, WESLEY WILCOX, GLENDA B. WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5172996.), filed by DONESA JACKSON, PRIORITIES USA, MORGAN OUTLAW, KIRK NIELSEN, RAY DAVIS, REVEL LUBIN, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, ALIANZA FOR PROGRESS, INC., FELICIA BRUCE, BARBARA DEVANE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons M. Andersen, # 3 Summons S. Anderson, # 4 Summons C. Anderson, # 5 Summons Antonacci, # 6 Summons Arrington, # 7 Summons Barton, # 8 Summons Beasley, # 9 Summons Bennett, # 10 Summons Bishop, # 11 Summons S. Cannon, # 12 Summons Chambless, # 13 Summons Chason, # 14 Summons Clark, # 15 Summons Corley, # 16 Summons Cowles, # 17 Summons Crawford, # 18 Summons Davis, # 19 Summons DeSantis, # 20 Summons Doyle, # 21 Summons Earley, # 22 Summons J. Edwards, # 23 Summons Elections Canvassing Commission, # 24 Summons Farnam, # 25 Summons Gill, # 26 Summons Griffin, # 27 Summons Hagan, # 28 Summons Hanlon, # 29 Summons Hardee, # 30 Summons Hart, # 31 Summons Hays, # 32 Summons Hogan, # 33 Summons Hoots, # 34 Summons Horne, # 35 Summons Hutto, # 36 Summons Jones, # 37 Summons Keen, # 38 Summons Knight, # 39 Summons Latimer, # 40 Summons Lee, # 41 Summons Lenhart, # 42 Summons Lewis, # 43 Summons Link, # 44 Summons Lux, # 45 Summons McDowell, # 46 Summons Meadows, # 47 Summons Moody, # 48 Summons Negley, # 49 Summons Oakes, # 50 Summons Ogg, # 51 Summons Osborne, # 52 Summons Overturf, # 53 Summons Riley, # 54 Summons Rudd, # 55 Summons Sanchez, # 56 Summons Scott, # 57 Summons Smith, # 58 Summons Southerland, # 59 Summons Stafford, # 60 Summons Stamoulis, # 61 Summons Stephens, # 62 Summons Swan, # 63 Summons Turner, # 64 Summons Vaughan, # 65 Summons Villane, # 66 Summons Walker, # 67 Summons Wells, # 68 Summons White, # 69 Summons Wilcox, # 70 Summons Williams, # 71 Summons V. Cannon, # 72 Summons L. Edwards) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIELSEN et al v. DESANTIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENDA B. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY MOODY
Represented By: JEFFREY PAUL DESOUSA
Represented By: ANITA J PATEL
Represented By: MIGUEL A OLIVELLA, JR
Represented By: TIMOTHY LEEDS NEWHALL
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN TEEGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON CHASON
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN A. GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA WHITE
Represented By: MICHAEL BENY VALDES
Represented By: OREN ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARLET CANNON
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL F. RUDD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM KEEN
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H STAFFORD
Represented By: KIA M JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS HART
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMMY DOYLE
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA HUTTO
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL M LEE
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: GEORGE N MEROS, JR
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: TARA R PRICE
Represented By: EDWARD M WENGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA SOUTHERLAND
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK EARLEY
Represented By: SUMMER DENAY BROWN
Represented By: MARK HERRON
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER J EDWARDS
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER ANTONACCI
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NITA CRAWFORD
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH K. OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALETRIS FARNAM
Represented By: GERALDO FRANCIS OLIVO, III
Represented By: ROBERT C SHEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK F NEGLEY
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE SMITH
Represented By: GERALDO FRANCIS OLIVO, III
Represented By: ROBERT C SHEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI SCOTT
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL STAMOULIS
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA HOOTS
Represented By: GERALDO FRANCIS OLIVO, III
Represented By: ROBERT C SHEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS H CHAMBLESS
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERISA MEADOWS
Represented By: GERALDO FRANCIS OLIVO, III
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Represented By: ROBERT C SHEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER RILEY
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERTRUDE WALKER
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY ANDERSON
Represented By: JON A JOUBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS ANDERSON
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Represented By: WADE CHRISTOPHER VOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKY OAKES
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON DESANTIS
Represented By: NICHOLAS ALLEN PRIMROSE
Represented By: JOSEPH W JACQUOT
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BENNETT
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE SANCHEZ
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM A BARTON
Represented By: CORBIN FREDERICK HANSON
Represented By: ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH P HORNE
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN HAYS
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE HAGEN
Represented By: GERALDO FRANCIS OLIVO, III
Represented By: ROBERT C SHEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOYCE GRIFFIN
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Represented By: ROBERT BLAKE SHILLINGER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBY BEASLEY
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA D. STEPHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL A. LUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA MCDOWELL
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAPPIE A. VILLANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY SARTORY LINK
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY JONES
Represented By: GERALDO FRANCIS OLIVO, III
Represented By: ROBERT C SHEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL COWLES
Represented By: NICHOLAS ARI SHANNIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN E. CORLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES OVERTURF
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG LATIMER
Represented By: STEPHEN MARK TODD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKI DAVIS
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY JANE ARRINGTON
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ANDERSEN
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH CLARK
Represented By: KELLY LYNN VICARI
Represented By: ASHLEY N DONNELL
Represented By: CHRISTY DONOVAN PEMBERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI EDWARDS
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY VAUGHAN
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY WELLS
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY G. KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAITI LENHART
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESLEY WILCOX
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS R. HARDEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA LEWIS
Represented By: FRANCIS JOSEPH CARROLL, Jr
Represented By: BROOKE M GAFFNEY
Represented By: WILLIAM KEVIN BLEDSOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HANLON
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON TURNER
Represented By: MORGAN RAY BENTLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKI P. CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE HOGAN
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNY OGG
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY BISHOP
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH K OSBORNE
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAGLER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GADSDEN COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMTER COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESOTO COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN E CORLEY
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY G KNIGHT
Represented By: SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI
Represented By: EDWARD PAUL CUFFE
Represented By: AUSTIN COLE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN A GILL
Represented By: DALE A SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENDRY COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Represented By: ROBERT C SHEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEON COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Represented By: LASHAWN DONYALE RIGGANS
Represented By: CHASITY HOPE O'STEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIXIE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAFAYETTE COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION
Represented By: ANITA J PATEL
Represented By: MIGUEL A OLIVELLA, JR
Represented By: TIMOTHY LEEDS NEWHALL
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN TEEGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASSAU COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Docket