CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC v. WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA
Plaintiff: City Walk - Urban Mission, Inc. and CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC
Defendant: WAKULLA COUNTY and WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00244
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION #23 FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/20. (blb)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #32 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Discovery due by 9/10/2020, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/1/2020, Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER, Mediation Report due by 10/22/2020, Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/20. (blb)
June 25, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FACTUAL DEVELOPMENT by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction With Memorandum of Law (STERETT, NOEL)
June 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #32 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (blb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (WARNER, WILLIAM)
June 18, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (REUTER, ALEXANDER)
June 15, 2020 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON THE ISSUE OF RIPENESS filed by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (STERETT, NOEL) Modified Title on 6/16/2020 (blb).
June 15, 2020 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING RIPENESS OF INJURY TO BRING AN AS APPLIED EQUAL TERMS CLAIM UNDER RLUIPA by WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA (KREBS, ERIC) Modified Title on 6/16/2020 (blb).
June 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 6/11/2020, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 8504220011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2020. (mah)
June 12, 2020 Set Discovery Status Report Deadline - Status Report due by 7/13/2020. (cle)
June 12, 2020 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT JOINT by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (STERETT, NOEL)
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2020 re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Court hears argument from both sides. Ruling by Court: Parties to file supplemental briefs, as directed on the record, by 11:59 pm on 6/15/2020. Order to follow (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction With Memorandum of Law filed by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Declaration of Renee Miller, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Jenkins, #3 Exhibit) (STERETT, NOEL)
June 5, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction With Memorandum of Law filed by WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (KREBS, ERIC)
June 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for More Definite Statement by WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/19/2020). (WARNER, WILLIAM)
May 26, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction With Memorandum of Law Supplemental filed by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Renee Miller) (STERETT, NOEL)
May 26, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (STERETT, NOEL)
May 26, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2020 01:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment, please contact Victoria Milton McGee at 850-521-3510 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. INTERESTED PARTIES MAY OBSERVE THIS HEARING BY CALLING THE NUMBER ABOVE--PLEASE MUTE YOUR LINE. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER. This Court conducted a telephonic conference on May 22, 2020. The parties consented to the following Court ordered timeline. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #14 , on or before 6/5/2020. Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before 6/9/2020. This Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on June 11, 2020 at 1:00 pm. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/22/20. Hearing set for 6/11/2020 01:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. (blb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/22/2020. Parties discuss schedule for preliminary injunction hearing. Ruling by Court: Response to #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 6/5/20; Reply due by 6/9/20. Telephonic Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 6/11/20 at 1:00 p.m. EDT. Order to follow (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
May 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC ALEXANDER KREBS on behalf of WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA (KREBS, ERIC)
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2020 11:30 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment, please contact Victoria Milton McGee at 850-521-3510 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made.s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE SCHEDULE. Plaintiff has filed its Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief. ECF No. #14 . In order to promote the orderly and prompt resolution of the motion, IT IS ORDERED: The attorneys for both parties must confer prior to the scheduling conference. The Clerk shall set this matter for a TELEPHONIC scheduling conference on Friday, May 22, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. (EDT). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/14/20. (blb)
May 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction With Memorandum of Law by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (STERETT, NOEL)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM G WARNER on behalf of WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA (WARNER, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS served on WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA on MAY 12, 2020, filed by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (STERETT, NOEL)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/27/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2020. Discovery due by 9/10/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/1/2020. Status Report due by 6/13/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/13/20. (blb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS R THOMPSON on behalf of CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC (THOMPSON, THOMAS)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADMITTING ALEXANDER R. REUTER PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexander R. Reuter. ECF No. #8 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Reuter has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/13/20. (blb)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Reuter.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5207986.) by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (REUTER, ALEXANDER)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC (STERETT, NOEL)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADMITTING NOEL W. STERETT PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Noel W. Sterett. ECF No. #2 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Sterett has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/7/20. (blb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA. (blb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney NOEL W STERETT Re #1 COMPLAINT- Counsel is advised by this entry, that in future case openings the Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Further, please review the procedures in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website)) specifically in regards to the use of UPPERCASE in the parties names and style of the case. (blb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC (STERETT, NOEL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Noel W. Sterett.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5184664.) by City Walk - Urban Mission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (STERETT, NOEL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WAKULLA COUNTY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5182015.), filed by City Walk - Urban Mission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (STERETT, NOEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC v. WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Walk - Urban Mission, Inc.
Represented By: NOEL W STERETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY WALK - URBAN MISSION INC
Represented By: NOEL W STERETT
Represented By: THOMAS R THOMPSON
Represented By: ALEXANDER REUTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKULLA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKULLA COUNTY FLORIDA
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Represented By: ERIC ALEXANDER KREBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?