IN RE: HEPHZIBAH
Appellee: OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Appellant: SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH
Case Number: 4:2020cv00250
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned Return to Sender Attempted-Not Known Unable to Forward. #5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order returned. 6 Remailed to SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH at additional address of 422 EAST 27TH STREET, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32206 obtained from Bankruptcy Court order dated 6/9/20. Bankruptcy case #18-40381, doc 117. (blb)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court will dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction unless Hephzibah shows cause within 14 days why it should not. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/26/20. (Show Cause Response due by 7/10/2020) (blb) *Also mailed to to 7643 Gate Parkway Ste 104-705, Jacksonville, Fl 32256 with address change form*
June 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Appellant Brief due by 6/24/2020, none filed. (blb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned Refused Re: #12 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Resent to 7643 Gate Parkway Ste 104-705, Jacksonville, Fl 32256 with address change form. (blb)
June 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #12 Order of DISQUALIFICATION. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. (blb)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. I hereby disqualify myself from participation as a judge in this case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 6/10/20. SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. (blb) *Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:20cv250-AW/MAF*
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Remailed to additional address of 422 EAST 27TH STREET, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32206 for SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH obtained from Bankruptcy Court order dated 6/9/20. Bankruptcy case #18-40381, doc 117. (blb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 6/24/2020. Appellee Brief due by 7/9/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/19/2020. (blb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Complete Record on Appeal Transmittal Sheet. (lmi)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH pages 171-180 (Attachments: #1 pages 181-186) (blb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH pages 141-150 (Attachments: #1 pages 151-160, #2 pages 161-170) (blb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH pages 101-110 (Attachments: #1 pages 111-120, #2 pages 121-130, #3 pages 131-140) (blb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH pages 61-70 (Attachments: #1 pages 71-80, #2 pages 81-90, #3 pages 91-100 (blb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH pages 1-20 Attachments: #1 pages 21-30 , #2 pages 31-40 , #3 pages 41-60 (blb)
May 12, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal. (blb)
May 8, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Appellant Brief due by 6/5/2020. (blb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Record of Appeal Part 3 of 3 by SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH (Attachments: #1 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 1, affid of merits, #2 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 2, ex B ord DC, #3 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 3, Jacksonville Sheriff, #4 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 4, mot permission file IFP, #5 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 5, notice of appeal, #6 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 6, notice to principal, #7 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 7, ord grant in part, #8 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 8, tax information, #9 Hephzibah bkr doc 87 attach 9, USC title) (Romine, Carolyn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Record of Appeal Part 2 of 3 by SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH (Attachments: #1 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 1, notary cert of svs, #2 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 2, ord at bkr doc 72, #3 Hephaibah bkr doc 79 ex 3, letter, #4 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 4, USC title, #5 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 5, FCI Tallahassee, #6 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 6, oath Governor, ord re Hephzibah, #7 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 7, oath, order re Hephzibah, #8 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 8, email, #9 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 9, ss statement, #10 Hephzibah bkr doc 79 ex 10, oath, sugg bkr, #11 Hepzibah bkr doc 79 ex 11, afidavit) (Romine, Carolyn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet, Record of Appeal Part 1 of 3 by SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH (Attachments: #1 Hephzibah cert docket sheet, #2 Hephzibah, mot permission appeal IFP, bkr 90, #3 Hephzibah order, bkr 72, #4 Hephzibah order on notice of appeal, bkr 96) (Romine, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: HEPHZIBAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SYTERIA HEPHZIBAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?