JIMENEZ-PABON v. U S ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Petitioner: JUAN RAMON JIMENEZ-PABON
Respondent: U S ATTORNEY GENERAL, JOHN KELLY and MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Case Number: 4:2020cv00272
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by MATTHEW T ALBENCE, U S ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_DDO Leyva affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2_IJ Removal Order, #3 Exhibit 3_FL Comprehensive Case Information System, #4 Exhibit 4_Texas Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5_Parole Termination, #6 Exhibit 6_Notice to Appear) (REGISTER, LENNARD)
July 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Notice of Appearance. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by LENNARD B REGISTER, III on behalf of U S ATTORNEY GENERAL (REGISTER, LENNARD)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (rcb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/27/2020) (rcb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW T ALBENCE, U S ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued-ICE Acting Director Matthew T Albence) (rcb) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/27/2020) (rcb). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/27/2020) (rcb).
May 26, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers on 7/27/2020. Government's Answer due by 7/27/2020. Petitioner's Reply due by 8/24/2020. (rcb)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER.The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence as Respondent in place of John Kelly, the former Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Petitioner's motion for in forma pauperis status, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED and Petitioner is not required to pay the filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence. The Clerk of Court shall prepare copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those documents to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until July 27, 2020, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until August 24, 2020, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than July 27, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/26/2020. (rcb) **ECF #1 , ECF #4 & Summons for US Attorney General Barr & ICE Acting Director Albence forwarded as directed**
May 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
May 25, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by JUAN RAMON JIMENEZ-PABON. (rcb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JUAN RAMON JIMENEZ-PABON. (rcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JIMENEZ-PABON v. U S ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U S ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JUAN RAMON JIMENEZ-PABON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?