DANIELS v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff: JIMMY DANIELS
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00284
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT pursuant to #9 Order Closing File. (blb)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CLOSING FILE. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. ECF No. #8 . Inasmuch as Defendant has not filed an answer or motion for summary judgment, the notice of dismissal is effective without an order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Accordingly, the Clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)." The Clerk must also close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/9/20. (blb)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JIMMY DANIELS (DERRY, JASON)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. ECF No. #6 . The motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading to the complaint on or before 8/7/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/23/20. (blb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (STEVENS, ROBERT)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.. (STEVENS, ROBERT)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY DANIELS. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (DERRY, JASON)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (blb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DERRY, JASON)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5279633.), filed by JIMMY DANIELS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Equifax) (DERRY, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANIELS v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Represented By: ROBERT C STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY DANIELS
Represented By: JASON ROBERT DERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?