JULES v. BARR
Petitioner: JEAN JULES
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Case Number: 4:2020cv00287
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 6 Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 3:20-cv-00701, filed 07/07/2020. (blb)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING MOTION AS MOOT. Petitioner has filed his Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. ECF No. #7 . This Court entered its Order Accepting and Adopting Report and Recommendation on July 6, 2020, in which it transferred this case to the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division. ECF No. #5 . The motion, ECF No. #7 , is DENIED as moot. This case is closed. Petitioner must file his motion in the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk must close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/8/20. (blb)
July 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss (blb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by JEAN JULES. (blb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Interdistrict Transfer to the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville located at 300 North Hogan Street Jacksonville, Florida 32202. (blb)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall also close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/6/20. (blb)
July 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #4 Notice of Inquiry. (blb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Inquiry by JEAN JULES re #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (blb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is RECOMMENDED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/5/20. R&R flag set. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/6/2020. (blb)
June 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (blb)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (blb)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JEAN JULES. (blb)*No copies, No fee*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JULES v. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEAN JULES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?