LARA-GARCIA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: WILFREDO LARA-GARCIA
Respondent: JARED MILLER, WILLIAM P BARR, CHAD WOLF, MICHAEL MEADE and MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Case Number: 4:2020cv00293
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: #13 Order of Dismissal. (cle)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The #11 magistrate judge's report and recommendation is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus is hereby DISMISSED as moot based on Petitioner's release from detention. The clerk shall enter judgment stating: "All claims are DISMISSED." Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 7/16/2020. (cle) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/16/2020) (cle).
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Wilfredo Lara-Garcia and returned: #10 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court does not have a better address for the Petitioner. (cle)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the motion to dismiss the petition as moot, ECF No. #7 , be GRANTED. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/30/2020. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/28/2020. (cle)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Clerk of Court shall provide a copy of this Order and Report and Recommendation to Petitioner at his address listed in the Order of Supervision, ECF No. #7 -1 at 2. Petitioner's pending motion requesting the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #3 , is DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/30/2020. (cle)*** This Order sent to the Petitioner's Hialeah address. ***
June 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Moot. The deadline to file Response has expired. No response has been filed. (cle)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Wilfredo Lara-Garcia and returned: #5 ORDER. The court is unable to find a better address for the Petitioner. (cle)
June 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Moot. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Wilfredo Lara-Garcia and returned: 4 Notice to Pro Se. (cle) (cle)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Moot by WILLIAM P BARR, CHAD WOLF. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/26/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_Order of Release on Supervision, #2 Exhibit 2_I-830 Form) (REGISTER, LENNARD)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW T ALBENCE, WILLIAM P BARR, and U.S. Attorney. (cle)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence as Respondent in place of Chad Wolf, the Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security. Ruling is DEFERRED on Petitioner's motion for the appointment of counsel. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence. The Clerk of Court shall prepare copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those documents to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until 8/4/2020, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until 8/25/2020, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than 8/4/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/5/2020. (cle) *** All paperwork prepared and sent to the USA, US AG, and Acting Director of ICE. ***.
June 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel, filed by WILFREDO LARA-GARCIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (cle)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Filing Fee: $5.00, receipt number FLN400039277. Fee status updated to paid. (cle)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by WILFREDO LARA-GARCIA. (cle) *** No service copies provided. ***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LARA-GARCIA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JARED MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL MEADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILFREDO LARA-GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?