MANSON v. BARR
Petitioner: LEON MANSON
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Case Number: 4:2020cv00306
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #5 Mail Returned. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)**Leon Manson no longer housed @ Wakulla County Jail-no forwarding ad dress effective 7/17/2020 per Booking & Releasing Personnel**
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to LEON MANSON Re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by LEON MANSON - R&R flag set (rcb)**Leon Manson no longer housed @ Wakulla County Jail-no forwarding address effective 7/17/2020 per Booking & Releasing Personnel**
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court Order. - R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/21/2020. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/18/2020. (rcb)
July 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)**Petition not filed nor fee paid by 7/11/2020**
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER.The Clerk of Court shall provide Petitioner with a 2241 habeas petition form and an in forma pauperis application packet. Petitioner has until 7/11/2020, to file a proper petition on the form provided to him and to either pay the filing fee or submit an in forma pauperis motion. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Petitioner's compliance with this Order or no later than 7/11/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/12/2020. (rcb)** 2241 Habeas Petition Form forwarded as directed**
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
June 10, 2020 ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** ACTION IS NO LONGER REQUIRED REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is no longer needed Re: #1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant To 18 USC 3006A.
June 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant To 18 USC 3006A Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant To 18 USC 3006A by LEON MANSON. (rcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANSON v. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEON MANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?