BUCHANNON v. ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: NOBLE T. BUCHANNON
Defendant: ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00402
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Staff Notes (Email on 9/2/2020) (rcb)**An ISO is needed**
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's FL SOS filings 2000-2020 (public record)) (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 10/5/2020 (rcb).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STRIKING #9 AMENDED COMPLAINT, GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, AND ORDERING RESPONSE TO #5 MOTION TO DISMISS. The motion for judicial notice, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. The first amended complaint, ECF No. #9 , is STRICKEN as unauthorized. Plaintiff must file a response to the motion to dismiss no later than 10/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/28/2020. (rcb)
September 26, 2020 Filing 10 OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb).
September 26, 2020 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN PER ECF #11 ** AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's FL SOS filings 2000-2020, #2 Exhibit B -Redacted copy of the letter sent by Plaintiff, on or about April 209, 2020, to Defendant) (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title & link ECF #11 on 9/28/2020 (rcb). .
September 26, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/18/20. Plaintiff must file responses to #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and #6 Motion for Judicial Notice by 9/25/2020. (tss)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter) (BURNETTE, LAUREN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb).
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(2) WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter) (BURNETTE, LAUREN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb).
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service served on Defendant Associated Credit Services, Inc. on August 11, 2020, filed by NOBLE T. BUCHANNON. (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb).
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.. (rcb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.) (PONDER, BRIAN)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5570301.), filed by NOBLE T. BUCHANNON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 8/10/2020 (rcb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCHANNON v. ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOBLE T. BUCHANNON
Represented By: BRIAN LAMAR PONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: LAUREN MARSHALL BURNETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?