KANZ v. HALL et al
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ
Defendant: JANE DOES, JOHN DOES, LISA SALIBA and CAROL HALL
Case Number: 4:2020cv00406
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss, ECF No. #8 , construed as a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), is ACCEPTED. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/27/2020. (rcb)
August 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #8 Verified Motion To Dismiss Bivens Actions. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Verified Motion To Dismiss Bivens Actions by DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ. (rcb)
August 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Affidavit with attachments (ECF #1 , #4 , & #5 ) Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit with attachments (ECF #1 , #4 , & #5 ) by DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ (rcb) Modified on 8/21/2020 (rcb).
August 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #6 Affidavit with attachments (ECF 1 & 4 ), #5 Affidavit/Motion for Order of Declaratory Judgment Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit with attachments (ECF #1 & #4 ) by DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ (rcb)
August 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ. (rcb)
August 19, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, #1 Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit/Motion for Order of Declaratory Judgment by DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ. (rcb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis by DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ. (rcb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ. (rcb)**No service copy provided**

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KANZ v. HALL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA SALIBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS PAUL KANZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?