HERNANDES-VELASQUEZ v. BARR et al
Petitioner: ALEXIS ROMAN HERNANDES-VELASQUEZ
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR and JOHN KELLY
Case Number: 4:2020cv00486
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ALEXIS ROMAN HERNANDES VELASQUEZ Re: #9
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #8 Order Of Dismissal. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 2/1/2021 (rcb)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED as moot and for failure to prosecute. The clerk shall enter judgment stating: "All claims are DISMISSED." Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 11/2/2020. (rcb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ALEXIS ROMAN HERNANDES VELASQUEZ Re: #3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb) (rcb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ALEXIS ROMAN Re: #4 & #5 (rcb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -R&R flag set. In light of the foregoing, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that thispetition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. #1 , filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for theWestern District of Louisiana, Alexandria Division, for all furtherproceedings. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/4/2020.Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 10/07/2020. (rcb)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Petitioner's motion for in forma pauperis status, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED. Petitioner is not required to pay the filing fee for this case. In light of the foregoing, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this petition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. #1 , filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Alexandria Division, for all further proceedings. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 10/07/2020. (rcb)
October 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by ALEXIS ROMAN HERNANDES-VELASQUEZ. (rcb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ALEXIS ROMAN HERNANDES-VELASQUEZ. (rcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDES-VELASQUEZ v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALEXIS ROMAN HERNANDES-VELASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?