FLEMING v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: RHONDA FLEMING
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNKNOWN OFFICER, WHITE, STRONG, DIRECTOR OF BOP and SAILER
Case Number: 4:2020cv00545
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION FOR ORDER TO PROVIDE DEFENDANTS' ADDRESS TO PERFORM SERVICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A WAIVER OF SERVICE FROM DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEYS. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION FOR ORDER TO PROVIDE DEFENDANTS' ADDRESS TO PERFORM SERVICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A WAIVER OF SERVICE FROM DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEYS by RHONDA FLEMING. (jcw)
January 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 5 Filing Fee Received. (jcw)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Partial Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN3-14264. (jcw)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Clerk re Filing Fee Withdrawal. (jcw)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by RHONDA FLEMING. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(No service copies filed.) (jcw)
December 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #3 Amended Complaint. (jcw)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
November 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RHONDA FLEMING. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLEMING v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR OF BOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?