WILSON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: CHIQULA LYNETTE WILSON
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and ANDREW M SAUL
Case Number: 4:2021cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed ANDREW M SAUL served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 USAG, #2 USSA) (blb)
February 10, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. (blb)
January 19, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Acknowledgment. (blb)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from USMS for receipt of Doc #4 , Summons, Form 285 & Complaint. (blb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 USAG, #2 US Attorney) (blb)*sent to USMS as directed by ORDER #4 *
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re Service copies required by #4 ORDER. 3 copies received. (blb)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #3 , is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee. No later than March 5, 2021, (60 days) Plaintiff is required to submit three (3) identical copies of her/his Complaint for service purposes. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(1). Upon receipt of the service copies, the Clerk of Court shall send prepared summons, three certified copies of this Order, the service copies of the Complaint, and prepared USM 285 forms to the United States Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court shall return this case upon the filing of Defendant's answer or other response to the Complaint, or if Plaintiff has not complied with the requirement to submit service copies of the Complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 1/4/21. (blb)
January 4, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint and #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb)
January 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHIQULA LYNETTE WILSON. (FENNER, RILEY)
January 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (FENNER, RILEY)
January 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by CHIQULA LYNETTE WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285 Form, #5 USM-285 Form, #6 USM-285 Form) (FENNER, RILEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIQULA LYNETTE WILSON
Represented By: RILEY LOUIS FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?