SMALL v. CANADY et al
Plaintiff: BRUCE L SMALL
Defendant: FLORIDA SUPREME COURT and CHARLES CANADY
Case Number: 4:2021cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, ECF No. #7 , filed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), is ACCEPTED. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/1/2021. (cle)
February 26, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #7 MOTION (Petition) to Voluntarily Dismiss Action. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION (Petition) to Voluntarily Dismiss Action - filed by BRUCE L SMALL. (cle)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - re: #1 Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint. Plaintiff has until 3/10/2021, to file an amended civil rights complaint. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 3/10/2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 2/9/2021. (cle) *** 1983 Complaint sent to the Plaintiff. ***
February 2, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #5 Initial Partial Filing Fee received. (cle)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL PARTIAL Filing Fee: $20.00, receipt number FLN400040970. (cle)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - The in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff is not required to prepay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $10.80. Plaintiff has until 2/16/2021 to submit the initial partial filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall mail this Order with an appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon payment of the assessed initial partial filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 1/13/2021. (cle) *** A copy of this Order and Cover Letter sent to FDOC. ***
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
January 11, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by BRUCE L SMALL. (cle)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARLES CANADY and FLORIDA SUPREME COURT, filed by BRUCE L SMALL. (cle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMALL v. CANADY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA SUPREME COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES CANADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE L SMALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?