LING v. SAUL
Plaintiff: BRUCE A LING, JR
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 4:2021cv00034
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jcw)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: 3 service copies of #1 Complaint received. (jcw)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS (3/22/2021) of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit three (3) services copies of the complaint that are identical to the one filed with the court. Upon the receipt of the service copies, the clerk of the court is directed to send three certified copies of this order, the services copies of the complaint, and the prepared USM 285 forms to the United States Marshal. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 2/19/2021. (jcw) Documents provided to USMS on 3/1/2021 (jcw).
January 21, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by BRUCE A LING, JR. (jcw)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: BRUCE A LING, JR, 2236 DAVID AND SIBBIE LANE, TALLAHASSEE, FL 32317. (kdm)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by BRUCE A LING, JR. (No service copies received, no fee paid.) (kdm) (Modified on 1/21/2021 to include IFP motion received with complaint) (jcw).
January 20, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Social Security COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by BRUCE A LING, JR. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received). (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LING v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE A LING, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?