TURNER v. CANADY et al
Plaintiff: MADISON B TURNER
Defendant: JOSHUA E DOYLE, FLORIDA BOARD OF BAR EXAMINERS, ALAN LAWSON, MICHELLE A GAVAGNI, JORGE LABARGA, FLORIDA SUPREME COURT, JOHN D COURIEL, JAMIE R GROSSHANS, FLORIDA BAR, CHARLES T CANADY, CARLOS S MUNIZ and JAMES T ALMON
Case Number: 4:2021cv00163
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Notice, #6 Amended Complaint. On or before 6/25/2021, Plaintiff shall: a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i); or b. file a second amended complaint in compliance with this order, which shall be typed or clearly written, and marked as Plaintiff's "second amended complaint." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/27/2021. (jcw)
May 19, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Notice, #8 Notice, #6 Amended Complaint. (jcw)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE TO FLA. STAT. 454.021(1)-(2) by MADISON B TURNER (jcw)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HANDWRITTEN COMPLAINT by MADISON B TURNER (jcw)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by MADISON B TURNER. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Authorization of Electronic Filing. The courts in this district generally do not permit pro se parties to file documents electronically. Plaintiff has not shown good cause to grant Plaintiff the privilege of electronic filing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/12/2021. (jcw)
April 16, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION FOR WAIVER OF LOCAL RULE 5.7(A), #3 MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION OF ELECTRONIC FILING, #1 Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION OF ELECTRONIC FILING by MADISON B TURNER. (jcw)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION FOR WAIVER OF LOCAL RULE 5.7(A) by MADISON B TURNER. (jcw)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402., Receipt # FLN4-41553), filed by MADISON B TURNER. (No service copies filed.) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summonses) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER v. CANADY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA E DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA BOARD OF BAR EXAMINERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE A GAVAGNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE LABARGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA SUPREME COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN D COURIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE R GROSSHANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA BAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES T CANADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS S MUNIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES T ALMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADISON B TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?