SMITH v. GLENDINEN et al
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN C SMITH
Defendant: LAWRENCE WEBB, RYAN, GLENDINEN, STACEY MCMILLAN, JOSH WATSON, ASHLEY FITZPATRICK and MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Case Number: 4:2021cv00176
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #9 Amended Complaint. (jcw)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ASHLEY FITZPATRICK, MARTIN A FITZPATRICK, GLENDINEN, filed by FRANKLIN C SMITH. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
June 4, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #8 Amended Complaint. (jcw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by FRANKLIN C SMITH. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Amended Complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff a pro se civil rights complaint form for use by non-prisoners. On or before 6/14/2021, Plaintiff shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal or second amended complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/24/2021. (jcw)(Form sent as ordered.)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall assign another Magistrate Judge to this action based upon my recusal. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK recused. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 05/14/2021. (rcb)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:21cv-176-AW/MJF**
May 14, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #6 Order. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (rcb)
May 13, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #5 First Amended Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAUGHTER ASHLEY FITZPATRICK, JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK, filed by FRANKLIN C SMITH. (rcb)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for in forma pauperis status, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee for this case. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form for use by non-prisoners so Plaintiff can file the amended complaint as explained above. Plaintiff shall have until May 28, 2021, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted oncourt forms. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff'samended complaint or no later than May 28, 2021. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 04/28/2021. (rcb)** 1983 ComplaintForm Non-prisoners forwarded as directed**
April 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
April 28, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers & Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2021. (rcb)
April 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by FRANKLIN C SMITH. (rcb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLENDINEN, STACEY MCMILLAN, RYAN, JOSH WATSON (Filing fee $402.), filed by FRANKLIN C SMITH. (rcb)**No filing fee nor service fee received**

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. GLENDINEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN C SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE WEBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENDINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACEY MCMILLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY FITZPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?