ROBINSON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: GREGORY ROBINSON
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 4:2021cv00178
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #4 Order. Clerk provided three certified copies of the order, the service copies of the complaint, the summonses, and the prepared USM 285 forms to the United States Marshal. (blr)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (blr)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Within seven (7) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the Court three (3) service copies of the complaint (ECF Doc. 1). Upon receipt, the clerk is directed to issue the summonses submitted by Plaintiff and send them, along with three (3) certified copies of this order, the service copies of the complaint, and the prepared USM-285 forms to the United States Marshals Service. (Service copies due by 5/7/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 4/30/2021. (mb)
April 29, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (mb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory Robinson. (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory Robinson, filed by Gregory Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons (Atty Gen), #3 Exhibit Summons (SSA), #4 Exhibit Summons (US Atty), #5 Exhibit USM-285 (Atty Gen), #6 Exhibit USM-285 (SSA), #7 Exhibit USM-285 (US Atty)) (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)
April 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #1 Complaint, (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINSON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY ROBINSON
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID LIEBENHAUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?