FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP et al v. LEE
Plaintiff: FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA and COMMON CAUSE
Defendant: LAUREL M. LEE, LAUREL M LEE, KIM A BARTON, CHRIS MILTON, MARK ANDERSEN, AMANDA SEYFANG, LORI SCOTT, JOE SCOTT, SHARON CHASON, PAUL A STAMOULIS, MAUREEN BAIRD, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, TOMI S BROWN, MARK F NEGLEY, STARLET CANNON, MIKE HOGAN, DAVID H STAFFORD, KAITI LENHART, HEATHER RILEY, SHIRLEY G KNIGHT, CONNIE SANCHEZ, ALETRIS FARNAM, JOHN HANLON, LAURA HUTTO, DIANE SMITH, BRENDA HOOTS, SHIRLEY ANDERSON, PENNY OGG, CRAIG LATIMER, THERISA MEADOWS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, CAROL DUNAWAY, MARTY BISHOP, TRAVIS HART, ALAN HAYS, TOMMY DOYLE, MARK EARLEY, TAMMY JONES, GRANT CONYERS, HEATH DRIGGERS, MICHAEL BENNETT, WESLEY WILCOX, VICKI DAVIS, CHRISTINA WHITE, JOYCE GRIFFIN, JANET H ADKINS, PAUL A LUX, MELISSA ARNOLD, BILL COWLES, MARY JANE ARRINGTON, WENDY SARTORY LINK, BRIAN E CORLEY, JULIE MARCUS, LORI EDWARDS, CHARLES OVERTURF, TAPPIE A VILLANE, RON TURNER, CHRIS ANDERSON, VICKY OAKES, GERTRUDE WALKER, WILLIAM KEEN, JENNIFER M KINSEY, DANA SOUTHERLAND, DEBORAH K OSBORNE, LISA LEWIS, JOSEPH MORGAN, BOBBY BEASLEY and CAROL F RUDD
Intervenor Defendant: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE and NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Case Number: 4:2021cv00187
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP -- Process Server's Proof of Service on Christina White of Summons, First Amended Complaint, and Discovery Requests (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
July 2, 2021 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP -- Process Server's Proof of Service on Wendy Link of Summons, First Amended Complaint, and Discovery Requests (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING #106 MOTION TO EXCEED WORD LIMITS. Plaintiffs' #106 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/02/2021. (rcb)
July 1, 2021 Filing 106 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WORD-COUNT EXTENSION by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/2/2021 (rcb).
July 1, 2021 Filing 105 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. MAUREEN BAIRD waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 30, 2021 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by DALE A SCOTT on behalf of MAUREEN BAIRD (SCOTT, DALE)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The #108 in 4:21CV186 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/30/2021. (rcb)
June 29, 2021 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. LORI SCOTT waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. CONNIE SANCHEZ waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. PENNY OGG waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. MARK F NEGLEY waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. KAITI LENHART waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. JOHN HANLON waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. HEATH DRIGGERS waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. MARTY BISHOP waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING #93 EXTENSION OF TIME. Given the holiday weekend, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their response on or before 7/16/2021). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/29/2021. (rcb)
June 29, 2021 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #92 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 25, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LAUREL M LEE. (Attachments: #1 Memo. in Support, #2 Exhibit A) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
June 25, 2021 Filing 91 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (NORRIS, CAMERON)
June 25, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK MICHAEL MARI on behalf of MARTY BISHOP, HEATH DRIGGERS, KAITI LENHART, MARK F NEGLEY, PENNY OGG, CONNIE SANCHEZ, LORI SCOTT (MARI, FRANK)
June 25, 2021 Filing 89 Summons Issued as to MARTY BISHOP, WENDY SARTORY LINK, MARK F NEGLEY, PENNY OGG, CONNIE SANCHEZ, LORI SCOTT, CHRISTINA WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SUMMONS ISSUED LORI SCOTT, #2 Exhibit SUMMONS ISSUED WENDY LINK, #3 Exhibit SUMMONS ISSUED PEGGY OGG, #4 Exhibit SUMMONS ISSUED CONNIE SANCHEZ, #5 Exhibit SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA WHITE, #6 Exhibit SUMMONS ISSUED MARTY BISHOP) (rcb)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #87 MOTION TO EXCEED WORD LIMITS. The #87 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/25/2021. (rcb)
June 24, 2021 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by LAUREL M LEE. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
June 24, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE -- Amended Notice of Summonses to be Issued by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP (Attachments: #1 Summons to be Issued to Marty Bishop, #2 Summons to be Issued to Wendy Link, #3 Summons to be Issued to Mark Negley, #4 Summons to be Issued to Peggy Ogg, #5 Summons to be Issued to Connie Sanchez, #6 Summons to be Issued to Lori Scott, #7 Summons to be Issued to Christina White) (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 24, 2021 Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. MIKE HOGAN waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 24, 2021 Filing 84 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. LISA LEWIS waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 83 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. MELISSA ARNOLD waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. TAMMY JONES waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. THERISA MEADOWS waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. BRENDA HOOTS waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. DIANE SMITH waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. ALETRIS FARNAM waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK MICHAEL MARI on behalf of JOHN HANLON (MARI, FRANK)
June 23, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE J BENDA on behalf of SHIRLEY ANDERSON (BENDA, KYLE)
June 21, 2021 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. PAUL A STAMOULIS waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. CHRIS ANDERSON waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. BRIAN E CORLEY waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 72 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. JOYCE GRIFFIN waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. WESLEY WILCOX waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. MICHAEL BENNETT waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. TOMMY DOYLE waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. ALAN HAYS waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. JENNIFER J EDWARDS waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2021 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SHIRLEY ANDERSON. (JOUBEN, JON)
June 21, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by JON A JOUBEN on behalf of SHIRLEY ANDERSON (JOUBEN, JON)
June 18, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by LONDON LEE OTT on behalf of LISA LEWIS (OTT, LONDON)
June 18, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM KEVIN BLEDSOE on behalf of LISA LEWIS (BLEDSOE, WILLIAM)
June 17, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDY V BARDOS on behalf of CHRIS ANDERSON, MICHAEL BENNETT, BRIAN E CORLEY, TOMMY DOYLE, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, JOYCE GRIFFIN, ALAN HAYS, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, WESLEY WILCOX (BARDOS, ANDY)
June 17, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by KIA M JOHNSON on behalf of DAVID H STAFFORD (JOHNSON, KIA)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE. Defendant's motions, ECF Nos. 87, #49 , 5, are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; this Court will consolidate NAACP, No.: 4:21cv187, and Harriet Tubman, No.: 21cv242, with League of Women Voters, No. 4:21cv186, for discovery purposes only, and will defer ruling on the question of consolidation for trial until after discovery is completed and all dispositive motions have been ruled on All parties in each of the three cases must meet for a joint scheduling conference on or before 7/6/2021 and file a corresponding Rule 26 report in League of Women Voters, No.: 4:21cv186, on or before 7/19/2021. Finally, Defendants motion is DENIED without prejudice as to Florida Rising, No.: 21cv201. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/17/2021. (rcb)
June 17, 2021 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE. DAVID H STAFFORD waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 17, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY LYNN VICARI on behalf of JULIE MARCUS (VICARI, KELLY)
June 17, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Summonses to be Issued. Summons to Janet H. Adkins. by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP (Attachments: #1 Summons to Mark Andersen, #2 Summons to Christopher Anderson, #3 Summons to Shirley Anderson, #4 Summons to Melissa Arnold, #5 Summons to Mary Jane Arrington, #6 Summons to Maureen Baird, #7 Summons to Bobby Beasley, #8 Summons to Michael Bennett, #9 Summons to Marty Bishop, #10 Summons to Tomi Stinson Brown, #11 Summons to Starlet Cannon, #12 Summons to Chris H. Chambless, #13 Summons to Sharon Chason, #14 Summons to Grant Conyers, #15 Summons to Brian E. Corley, #16 Summons to Bill Cowles, #17 Summons to Vicki Davis, #18 Summons to Tommy Doyle, #19 Summons to Heath Driggers, #20 Summons to Carol A. Dunaway, #21 Summons to Mark S. Earley, #22 Summons to Lori Edwards, #23 Summons to Jennifer J. Edwards, #24 Summons to Aletris Farnam, #25 Summons to Joyce Griffin, #26 Summons to John Hanlon, #27 Summons to Travis Hart, #28 Summons to Alan Hays, #29 Summons to Mike Hogan, #30 Summons to Brenda Hoots, #31 Summons to Laura Hutto, #32 Summons to Tammy Jones, #33 Summons to William Keen, #34 Summons to Jennifer Musgrove Kinsey, #35 Summons to Shirley G. Knight, #36 Summons to Kaiti Lenhart, #37 Summons to Lisa Lewis, #38 Summons to Wendy Sartory Link, #39 Summons to Paul Lux, #40 Summons to Julie Marcus, #41 Summons to Therisa Meadows, #42 Summons to Christopher Milton, #43 Summons to Joseph Morgan, #44 Summons to Mark F. Negley, #45 Summons to Vicky Oakes, #46 Summons to Penny Ogg, #47 Summons to Deborah K. Osborne, #48 Summons to Charles Overturf, #49 Summons to Heather Riley, #50 Summons to Carol F. Rudd, #51 Summons to Connie Sanchez, #52 Summons to Joe Scott, #53 Summons to Lori Scott, #54 Summons to Amanda Seyfang, #55 Summons to Diane Smith, #56 Summons to Dana Southerland, #57 Summons to Paul A. Stamoulis, #58 Summons to Leslie Rossway Swan, #59 Summons to Tappie A. Villane, #60 Summons to Gertrude Walker, #61 Summons to Christina White, #62 Summons to Wesley Wilcox) (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
June 17, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA MASTERS JOHNSON on behalf of KIM A BARTON (JOHNSON, DIANA)
June 17, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN on behalf of KIM A BARTON (SWAIN, ROBERT)
June 17, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KIM A BARTON. KIM A BARTON waiver sent on 6/17/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (SWAIN, ROBERT)
June 17, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN MARK TODD on behalf of CRAIG LATIMER (TODD, STEPHEN)
June 17, 2021 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RON TURNER. RON TURNER waiver sent on 6/17/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (BENTLEY, MORGAN)
June 17, 2021 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CRAIG LATIMER. CRAIG LATIMER waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (TODD, STEPHEN)
June 16, 2021 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by LAUREL M LEE. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 6/17/2021 to complete the document title. (kjw)
June 14, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Address by GARY VERGIL PERKO (PERKO, GARY)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Defendant's motion is thus DENIED as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/14/2021. (rcb)
June 11, 2021 Filing 46 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SECRETARY OF STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- As-Filed Amended Complaint) (KHAZEM, JAD) Modified to edit title on 6/14/2021 (rcb).
June 11, 2021 Filing 45 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE, DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA. (KHAZEM, JAD)
June 10, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Change of Address by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #37 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Plaintiffs' oppose the intervention. ECF No. #37 . For the reasons provided below, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/08/2021. (rcb)
June 7, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re #19 MOTION to Intervene (NORRIS, CAMERON)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/18/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2021. Discovery due by 10/4/2021. Status Report due by 7/5/2021. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/04/2021. (rcb)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ADMITTING STEVEN C. BEGAKIS PRO HAC VICE. The #38 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/04/2021. (rcb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 39 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: ISO placed in Judge Walker's folder (rcb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven C. Begakis.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6120724.) by National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (NORDBY, DANIEL)
June 3, 2021 Filing 37 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 6/4/2021 (rcb).
May 28, 2021 Filing 36 SECRETARY OF STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/11/2021). (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 6/2/2021 (rcb).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADMITTING P. BENJAMIN DUKE PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the motion to admit P. Benjamin Duke pro hac vice, ECF No. #34 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Duke has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/28/21. (blb)
May 27, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by P. Benjamin Duke.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6112314.) by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (DUKE, P)
May 27, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JAD H KHAZEM on behalf of DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP (KHAZEM, JAD)
May 26, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by AMBER STONER NUNNALLY on behalf of National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (NUNNALLY, AMBER)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADMITTING MORGAN E. SAUNDERS PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the motion to admit Morgan E. Saunders pro hac vice, ECF No. #30 . The motion is GRANTED. Ms. Saunders has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/25/21. (blb)
May 25, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morgan E. Saunders.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6107431.) by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (SAUNDERS, MORGAN)
May 25, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY VERGIL PERKO on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (PERKO, GARY)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADMITTING TYLER GREEN PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler Green. ECF No. #23 . The motion is GRANTED conditioned on payment of the applicable fee. Mr. Green has otherwise fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Proposed Intervenor-Defendants. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/24/21. (blb)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADMITTING CAMERON T. NORRIS PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cameron T. Norris. ECF No. #24 . The motion is GRANTED conditioned on payment of the applicable fee. Mr. Norris has otherwise fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Proposed Intervenor-Defendants. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/24/21. (blb)
May 24, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL JOSEPH SHAPIRO on behalf of National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (SHAPIRO, DANIEL)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADMITTING ROBERT DANIEL FRAM PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Daniel Fram. ECF No. #22 . The motion is GRANTED conditioned on payment of the applicable fee.1 Mr. Fram has otherwise fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/24/21. (blb)
May 21, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cameron T. Norris.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6103679.) by National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (NORDBY, DANIEL)
May 21, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tyler Green.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6103677.) by National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (NORDBY, DANIEL)
May 21, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. Fram.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6103552.) by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing) (FRAM, ROBERT)
May 20, 2021 Filing 21 Proposed Intervenor Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (NORDBY, DANIEL)
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Intervene filed by National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (NORDBY, DANIEL)
May 20, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene by Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee. (NORDBY, DANIEL)
May 17, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN LOUIS BAER CAVATARO on behalf of DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP (CAVATARO, BENJAMIN)
May 17, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (KING, NELLIE)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 5/14/21. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR no longer assigned to case (tss)
May 14, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings Answer due by 5/31/2021 for Laurel M. Lee (rcb)
May 13, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Laurel M. Lee on 5/10/2021, filed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP re #3 Summons Issued (KING, NELLIE)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 05/13/2021. (rcb)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER.It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear prohac vice, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 05/13/2021. (rcb)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 05/13/2021. (rcb)
May 13, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Appearance (rcb)**An ISO is needed**
May 13, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Pernick.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6090101.), #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Z. Morris. ( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6090013.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of LAUREL M. LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of LAUREL M. LEE (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Pernick.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6090101.) by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing) (PERNICK, MICHAEL)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Z. Morris.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6090013.) by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MORRIS, JOHN)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morenike Fajana.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6089951.) by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA, COMMON CAUSE, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (FAJANA, MORENIKE)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M. LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY)
May 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morenike Fajana.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6089951.) - Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (tss)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE INVOLVING ISSUES OF FACT OR LAW IN COMMON (KING, NELLIE) Modified to edit title on 5/11/2021 (rcb).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. I hereby disqualify myself from participation as a judge in this case. SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 05/07/2021. (rcb)Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:21cv187-AW/MAF
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LAUREL M. LEE. (rcb)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KING, NELLIE)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against LAUREL M. LEE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6079487.), filed by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP, COMMON CAUSE, DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KING, NELLIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP et al v. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF BRANCHES AND YOUTH UNITS OF THE NAACP
Represented By: NELLIE LINN KING
Represented By: BENJAMIN LOUIS BAER CAVATARO
Represented By: JAD H KHAZEM
Represented By: JOHN Z MORRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL JEREMY PERNICK
Represented By: MORENIKE FAJANA
Represented By: MORGAN ELIZABETH SAUNDERS
Represented By: P BENJAMIN DUKE
Represented By: ROBERT DANIEL FRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA
Represented By: NELLIE LINN KING
Represented By: BENJAMIN LOUIS BAER CAVATARO
Represented By: JAD H KHAZEM
Represented By: JOHN Z MORRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL JEREMY PERNICK
Represented By: MORENIKE FAJANA
Represented By: MORGAN ELIZABETH SAUNDERS
Represented By: P BENJAMIN DUKE
Represented By: ROBERT DANIEL FRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE
Represented By: NELLIE LINN KING
Represented By: BENJAMIN LOUIS BAER CAVATARO
Represented By: JAD H KHAZEM
Represented By: JOHN Z MORRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL JEREMY PERNICK
Represented By: MORENIKE FAJANA
Represented By: MORGAN ELIZABETH SAUNDERS
Represented By: P BENJAMIN DUKE
Represented By: ROBERT DANIEL FRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL M. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL M LEE
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM A BARTON
Represented By: DIANA MASTERS JOHNSON
Represented By: ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS MILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA SEYFANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI SCOTT
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON CHASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL A STAMOULIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAUREEN BAIRD
Represented By: DALE A SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS H CHAMBLESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER J EDWARDS
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMI S BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK F NEGLEY
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARLET CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H STAFFORD
Represented By: KIA M JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAITI LENHART
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY G KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE SANCHEZ
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALETRIS FARNAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HANLON
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA HUTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA HOOTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY ANDERSON
Represented By: JON A JOUBEN
Represented By: KYLE J BENDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNY OGG
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG LATIMER
Represented By: STEPHEN MARK TODD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERISA MEADOWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL DUNAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY BISHOP
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN HAYS
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMMY DOYLE
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK EARLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRANT CONYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATH DRIGGERS
Represented By: FRANK MICHAEL MARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BENNETT
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESLEY WILCOX
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKI DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOYCE GRIFFIN
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET H ADKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL A LUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL COWLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY JANE ARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY SARTORY LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN E CORLEY
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE MARCUS
Represented By: KELLY LYNN VICARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES OVERTURF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAPPIE A VILLANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS ANDERSON
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKY OAKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERTRUDE WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM KEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER M KINSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA SOUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH K OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA LEWIS
Represented By: LONDON LEE OTT
Represented By: WILLIAM KEVIN BLEDSOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBY BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL F RUDD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: BENJAMIN J GIBSON
Represented By: CAMERON THOMAS NORRIS
Represented By: STEVEN CHRISTOPHER BEGAKIS
Represented By: TYLER R GREEN
Represented By: AMBER STONER NUNNALLY
Represented By: DANIEL ELDEN NORDBY
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: BENJAMIN J GIBSON
Represented By: CAMERON THOMAS NORRIS
Represented By: STEVEN CHRISTOPHER BEGAKIS
Represented By: TYLER R GREEN
Represented By: AMBER STONER NUNNALLY
Represented By: DANIEL ELDEN NORDBY
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?