NETCHOICE LLC et al v. MOODY et al
Plaintiff: COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION doing business as CCIA, NETCHOICE, LLC doing business as NETCHOICE and NETCHOICE LLC doing business as NETCHOICE
Defendant: KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH, PATRICK GILLESPIE, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JASON TODD ALLEN and JOHN MARTIN HAYES
Amicus Curiae: TECHFREEDOM, CHAMBER OF PROGRESS, CONNECTED COMMERCE COUNCIL, CONSUMER TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION, ENGINE ADVOCACY, INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY & INNOVATION FOUNDATION, NATIONAL BLACK JUSTICE COALITION, PROGRESSIVE POLICY INSTITUTE, TECHNET, WASHINGTON CENTER FOR TECHNOLOGY POLICY INCLUSION, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA, AUTHORS GUILD INC, CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY, MEDIA LAW RESOURCE CENTER INC, PEN AMERICAN CENTER INC, INTERNET ASSOCIATION, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION and LEONID GOLDSTEIN
Case Number: 4:2021cv00220
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #115 Notice of Appeal, :( Clerk to check status of Appeal on 5/15/2023.) (sjb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number #22-277 for #115 Re: #135 (rcb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #115 Notice of Appeal #21-12355. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 2/13/2023. (rcb) ** Checked status of SC Certiorari Writ in SC #22-277-pending** (rcb).
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER of USCA as to #115 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 21-12355-GG. (The Clerk shall issue the mandate upon the filing of a copy of an order of the Supreme Court denying the writ, or upon expiration of the stay granted herein, unless the above mentioned certificate shall be filed with the Clerk of this Court within that time.) (sjb)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #115 Notice of Appeal, :Clerk to check status of Appeal on 11/11/2022. (sjb)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 11/11/2022. (sjb)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III on behalf of JASON TODD ALLEN, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH (STAFFORD, WILLIAM)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER of USCA as to #115 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 21-12355-GG. (The Clerk shall issue the mandate upon the filing of a copy of an order of the Supreme Court denying the writ, or upon expiration of the stay granted herein, unless the above mentioned certificate shall be filed with the Clerk of thisCourt within that time) (sjb)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #130 Order ( No Rule 26 Meeting Report filed) (sjb)
June 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER EXTENDING THE STAY - The joint motion to extend the stay, ECF No. #134 , is granted. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/18/22. (sjb)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Joint MOTION to Stay of Case by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW - YANG: The motion for leave for the attorney Meng Jia Yang to withdraw, ECF No. #132 , is granted, effective immediately. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/31/2022. (tpm) (Attorney MENG JIA YANG terminated) Modified as to judge on 6/1/2022 (tpm).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Meng Jia Yang) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL 26(f) ATTORNEY CONFERENCE - The attorneys must confer again and file a revised Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) report by 6/16/2022. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/26/22. (sjb)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 USCA JUDGMENT as to #115 Notice of Appeal. USCA # 21-12355. AFFIRM the preliminary injunction in part and VACATE and REMAND in part. (sjb)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings( Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 8/3/2022.), Set Deadlines re #115 Notice of Appeal, :( Clerk to check status of Appeal on 8/3/2022.) (sjb)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 4/25/2022. (sjb)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #115 Notice of Appeal: Clerk to check status of Appeal on 4/25/2022. (sjb)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines re #115 Notice of Appeal: Clerk to check status of Appeal on 1/13/2022. (vkm)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 10/27/2021. (vkm)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS - All proceedings are stayed until the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit hands down its decision on the pending appeal. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/25/2021 (Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 9/27/2021). (vkm)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW--WOLFSON granting #124 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney PAUL R WOLFSON terminated. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/23/2021. (vkm)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE by JASON TODD ALLEN, PATRICK GILLESPIE, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH re #123 Scheduling Order,, . (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC re #123 Scheduling Order,, . (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #115 Notice of Appeal,, Appeal No. 21-12355-GG. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (vkm)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Paul R.Q. Wolfson to Withdraw as Counsel for Amicus Internet Association by INTERNET ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (HOMER, PETER)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #122 Rule 26 Report: The parties must confer and file by 8/18/2021, a joint statement or separate unilateral statements, together with any supporting argument, on whether proceedings should be stayed pending a ruling on the appeal of the preliminary injunction. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 8/6/2021. Discovery due by 2/7/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/28/2022. A party may move to require mediation, but no requirement to mediate is established at this time. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/4/2021. (vkm)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 INITIAL CONFERENCE by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (KILBY, DOUGLAS) Modified on 8/4/2021 to correct document title (vkm).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RULE 26 Disclosures by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RULE 26 Disclosures by JASON TODD ALLEN, PATRICK GILLESPIE, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH. (WINSHIP, BLAINE)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by JASON TODD ALLEN, PATRICK GILLESPIE, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH. (COOPER, CHARLES)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 USCA Case Number 21-12355-GG is assigned to #115 NOTICE OF APPEAL. (cle)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Appeal Instructions - re: #115 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 7/27/2021. (cle)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals - re: #115 Notice of Appeal. (cle)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Appeal Status Deadline - re: #115 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 10/13/2021. Certificate of Readiness (FRAP 11) due by 7/28/2021. (cle)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #113 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by JASON TODD ALLEN, PATRICK GILLESPIE, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-6178675.) (COOPER, CHARLES)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Undertaking in Support of Injunction by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION re #113 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (BURHANS, GLENN)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/30/2021. (RH)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2021 before Judge Robert L. Hinkle. Court Reporter: Judy Gagnon, Telephone number: 850-443-7896. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021. (kjw)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2021. Court hears argument re: #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ruling by Court: #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction taken under advisement. Order to follow (Court Reporter Judy Gagnon). (vkm)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER ALLOWING GOLDSTEIN AMICUS BRIEF - Leonid Goldstein's unopposed motion for leave to file an amicus brief, ECF No. #107 , is granted. The brief is deemed properly filed. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/24/2021. (cle)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPLY by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC re #29 Affidavit, #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum of Law, #25 Affidavit, #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration, #26 Affidavit, #27 Affidavit, #23 Affidavit, #24 Affidavit, #28 Affidavit Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 BRIEF of Leonid Goldstein as AMICUS CURIAE in Support of Defendants in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For a Preliminary Injunction, filed by LEONID GOLDSTEIN. (cle)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION of Leonid Goldstein For Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For a Preliminary Injunction, file by LEONID GOLDSTEIN. (cle)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration filed by JASON TODD ALLEN, PATRICK GILLESPIE, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume 1, #2 Appendix Volume 2, #3 Appendix Volume 3, #4 Appendix Volume 4, #5 Appendix Volume 5) (COOPER, CHARLES)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WILLIAM UTHMEIER on behalf of PATRICK GILLESPIE (UTHMEIER, JAMES)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL WILLIAM BELL on behalf of JASON TODD ALLEN, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH (BELL, DANIEL)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH MASTERMAN on behalf of PATRICK GILLESPIE (MASTERMAN, JOSEPH)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID HENRY THOMPSON on behalf of PATRICK GILLESPIE (THOMPSON, DAVID)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES JUSTIN COOPER on behalf of PATRICK GILLESPIE (COOPER, CHARLES)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND FREDERICK TREADWELL on behalf of PATRICK GILLESPIE (TREADWELL, RAYMOND)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING on #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/28/2021 01:30 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Only attorneys of record may join by video (link will be provided separately). All others interested in listening to the proceeding may dial in using the information provided below: Call in number: 669-254-5252 (if calling from the west coast) or 646-828-7666 (if calling from the east coast) Meeting ID: 1619431903#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy Markley (ckm)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Sealed Notice of Video Hearing (ckm)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order **Duplicate - ORDER granting #89 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/17/2021. (lsd)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER - The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #89 , is GRANTED, as to Aaron Mackey on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/17/2021. (cle)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, as to Kurt Opsahl, for Electronic Frontier Foundation, ECF No. #90 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/17/2021. (cle)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER - The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, as to DAVID ALLEN GREENE, for Electronic Frontier Foundation, ECF No. #88 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/17/2021. (cle)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ALLOWING CHAMBER OF PROGRESS TO FILE AN AMICUS BRIEF - The unopposed motion of Chamber of Progress et al. for leave to file an amicus brief, ECF No. #57 , is granted. The brief is deemed properly filed. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/17/2021. (cle)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #89 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and #90 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6138263.) by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (GREENE, DAVID)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6138222.) by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (GREENE, DAVID)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6138151.) by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (GREENE, DAVID)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #80 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Berin Szoka. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER - Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, as to Berin M. Szoka, ECF No. #80 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/15/2021. (cle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER - Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, as to Ari Holtzblatt, ECF No. #76 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/15/2021. (cle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, as to Patrick J. Carome, ECF No. #75 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/15/2021. (cle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER - Motion for leave to appear prohac vice, as to Paul R.Q. Wolfson, ECF No. #74 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/15/2021. (cle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - Motion for leave to appear prohac vice, as to Brian W. Barnes, ECF No. #45 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/15/2021. (cle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER - re: #42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, re: Ilana H. Eisenstein, ECF No. #42 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/15/2021. (cle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFSThe unopposed motions to file amicus briefs, ECF Nos. #69 , #71 , and #77 , are granted. The briefs are deemed properly filed. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/15/2021. (kjw)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order **Duplicate - ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/15/2021. (lsd)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Berin Szoka.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6135440.) by TechFreedom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (SZOKA, BERIN)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE by PATRICK GILLESPIE re #57 MOTION for Leave to File re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration Brief of Amici Curiae, #68 Order,, Set Deadlines, . (BARNES, BRIAN)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO AMICI ATTORNEYS (re #69 , #71 and #77 Motions): The parties named in the above-referenced documents were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. For future reference, please review the procedures for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website) at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (Click on CM/ECF link and go to General Info.) (pll)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J. Carome.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6134927.), #76 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ari Holtzblatt.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6134931.), #74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R.Q. Wolfson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6134924.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (pll)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Internet Association. See Doc. #77 . (cle)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Authors Guild Inc, Center for Democracy and Technology, Media Law Resource Center, Inc, Pen American Center, Inc, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. See Doc. #71 . (cle)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation and Protect Democracy Project, Inc. See Doc. #69 . (cle)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Internet Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Brief) (HOMER, PETER)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ari Holtzblatt.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6134931.) by Internet Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (HOLTZBLATT, ARI)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J. Carome.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6134927.) by Internet Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CAROME, PATRICK)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R.Q. Wolfson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6134924.) by Internet Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (WOLFSON, PAUL)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER WINSLOW HOMER on behalf of Internet Association (HOMER, PETER)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. (HOPKINS, CHRISTOPHER)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION to File Amicus Brief (Unopposed) by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Authors Guild Inc., Center for Democracy and Technology, Media Law Resource Center, Inc., Pen American Center, Inc.. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/28/2021). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief) (SHULLMAN, DEANNA)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (HOPKINS, CHRISTOPHER)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to File Amicus Brief by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/28/2021). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief) (HOPKINS, CHRISTOPHER)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS - TechFreedom's unopposed motion, ECF No. #53 , for leave to file an amicus brief is granted. The defendants must respond by 6/15/2021 at noon to the attempt of Chamber of Progress et al. to confer on their motion for leave to file an amicus brief. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/14/2021. (ckm)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO AMICI ATTORNEYS (re #53 and #57 Motions): The parties named in the above-referenced documents were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. For future reference, please review the procedures for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website) at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (Click on CM/ECF link and go to General Info.) (ckm)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadline as to #57 Motion for Leave to File. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/25/2021.) (ckm)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by information technology & Innovation Foundation. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by consumer technology association. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by engine advocacy. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by connected commerce council. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by washington center for technology policy inclusion. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by technet. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by progressive policy institute. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by National Black Justice Coalition. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by chamber of progress. (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curia (re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction) by National Black Justice Coalition, chamber of progress, connected commerce council, consumer technology association, engine advocacy, information technology & Innovation Foundation, progressive policy institute, technet, washington center for technology policy inclusion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae) (SIEKKINEN, NURY) Modified on 6/14/2021 to reflect document title (ckm).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN on behalf of chamber of progress, connected commerce council, consumer technology association, engine advocacy, information technology & Innovation Foundation, National Black Justice Coalition, progressive policy institute, technet, washington center for technology policy inclusion (SIEKKINEN, NURY)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (docked as Notice of Filing corrected Amicus Brief to correct typographical errors on p. 14) by TechFreedom re #53 MOTION to File Amicus Brief (WALTERS, LAWRENCE) Modified on 6/14/2021 to reflect document title (ckm).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/10/2021, before Judge Robert Hinkle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Snyder, Telephone number 8505671374. Tape Number: lisasnydercr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2021. (ls)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by TechFreedom. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/25/2021). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief) (WALTERS, LAWRENCE) Modified on 6/14/2021 to reflect document title (ckm).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/24/2021. Answer due by 7/15/2021. Attorney Conference due by 7/19/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/2/2021. Discovery due by 11/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2022 at 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/10/2021. (cle)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING THE PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION SCHEDULE - The defendants must file by 6/21/2021, a memorandum and any evidence on which they rely in opposition to the preliminary-injunction motion. The plaintiffs may file a reply memorandum by 6/24/2021. By separate notice, the clerk must set a video hearing on the motion on June 28, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. The time limit is one hour per side. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/10/2021. (cle)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/10/2021. An order setting the schedule is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder.) (kjw)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #41 , is GRANTED. Danielle T. Morrison is appointed for Plaintiffs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/10/2021. (cle)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #40 , is GRANTED. Attorney Jonathan Allen Green is appointed for Plaintiffs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/10/2021. (cle)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #39 , is GRANTED. Attorney Ben C. Labens-Lassen is appointed for Plaintiffs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/10/2021. (cle)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #38 , is GRANTED.(Appointed PETER KARANJIA for COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION and NETCHOICE LLC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/10/2021. (cle)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian W. Barnes.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6130659.) by PATRICK GILLESPIE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (BARNES, BRIAN)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN ALLEN BASSETT on behalf of JASON TODD ALLEN, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH (BASSETT, GLEN)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by BLAINE H WINSHIP on behalf of JASON TODD ALLEN, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH (WINSHIP, BLAINE)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (ILANA H. EISENSTEIN).( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6129676.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (EISENSTEIN, ILANA) Modified to edit title on 6/10/2021 (rcb). Modified on 6/16/2021 (lsd).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Karanjia, #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ben C. Fabens-Lassen, #40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Green, and #41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danielle T. Morrison. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #42 PLAINTIFFS'MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE(ILANA H. EISENSTEIN) Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian W. Barnes. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danielle T. Morrison.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6128989.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (MORRISON, DANIELLE)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Green.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6128965.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (GREEN, JONATHAN)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ben C. Fabens-Lassen.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6128913.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (FABENS-LASSEN, BEN)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Karanjia.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6128887.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KARANJIA, PETER)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STATUS REPORT re: Compliance with Scheduling Order by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - re: STEFFEN N. JOHNSON for NETCHOICE, LLC. and CCIA. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/7/2021. (cle)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - re: BRIAN MICHAEL WILLEN for NETCHOICE, LLC. and CCIA. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/7/2021. (cle)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - re: MENG JIA YANG for NETCHOICE, LLC. and CCIA. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/7/2021. (cle)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - re: LAUREN GALLO WHITE for NETCHOICE, LLC. and CCIA. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/7/2021. (cle)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2021 02:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/4/21. (sms) By separate notice, the clerk must set a scheduling conference for June 10, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., by telephone.(cle)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Gallo White, #19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian M. Willen, and #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steffen N. Johnson. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum of Law in Support of #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (KILBY, DOUGLAS) Modified on 6/23/2021 to reflect title and terminate as this is not a motion (ckm).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT re #22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Consideration by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steffen N. Johnson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6120484.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian M. Willen.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6120479.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6120468.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Gallo White.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6120416.) by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (BURHANS, GLENN)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Patrick Gillespie, in his official capacity as Deputy Secretary of Business Operations of the Florida Department of Management Services on May 28, 2021, filed by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Kymberlee Curry Smith, in her official capacity as Commissioner of the Florida Elections Commission on May 28, 2021, filed by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on John Martin Hayes, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the Florida Elections Commission on May 28, 2021, filed by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Jason Todd Allen, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the Florida Elections Commission on May 28, 2021, filed by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Joni Alexis Poitier, in her official capacity as Commissioner of the Florida Elections Commission on May 28, 2021, filed by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Ashley Brooke Moody, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Florida on May 28, 2021, filed by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH TRUMON PHILLIPS on behalf of COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE LLC (PHILLIPS, JOSEPH)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER ROY CLARK on behalf of COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION (CLARK, CHRISTOPHER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIDGET KELLOGG SMITHA on behalf of COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION (SMITHA, BRIDGET)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN T BURHANS, JR on behalf of COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION (BURHANS, GLENN)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO EXCEED THE WORD LIMIT - Plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #6 , for leave to file a memorandum of excessive length in support of their anticipated motion for a preliminary injunction is granted. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/3/2021. (cle)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS LAMAR KILBY on behalf of COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION (KILBY, DOUGLAS)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JASON TODD ALLEN and (Attachments: #1 PATRICK GILLESPIE, #2 JOHN MARTIN HAYES, #3 ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, #4 JONI ALEXIS POITIER, #5 KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH) (blb)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE, LLC. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against JASON TODD ALLEN, PATRICK GILLESPIE, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6111479.), filed by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Ashley Moody), #2 Summons (Joni Poitier), #3 Summons (Jason Allen), #4 Summons (John Hayes), #5 Summons (Kymberlee Smith), #6 Summons (Patrick Gillespie)) (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against JASON TODD ALLEN, PATRICK GILLESPIE, JOHN MARTIN HAYES, ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY, JONI ALEXIS POITIER, KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6111479.), filed by COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, NETCHOICE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons (Ashley Moody), # 2 Summons (Joni Poitier), # 3 Summons (Jason Allen), # 4 Summons (John Hayes), # 5 Summons (Kymberlee Smith), # 6 Summons (Patrick Gillespie)) (OPRISON, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NETCHOICE LLC et al v. MOODY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Represented By: GLEN ALLEN BASSETT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK GILLESPIE
Represented By: BRIAN WESLEY BARNES
Represented By: CHARLES JUSTIN COOPER
Represented By: DAVID HENRY THOMPSON
Represented By: JAMES WILLIAM UTHMEIER
Represented By: JOSEPH MASTERMAN
Represented By: RAYMOND FREDERICK TREADWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONI ALEXIS POITIER
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Represented By: GLEN ALLEN BASSETT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Represented By: GLEN ALLEN BASSETT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON TODD ALLEN
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Represented By: GLEN ALLEN BASSETT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MARTIN HAYES
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Represented By: GLEN ALLEN BASSETT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION doing business as CCIA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER GEORGE OPRISON
Represented By: BEN FABENS-LASSEN
Represented By: BRIAN M WILLEN
Represented By: BRIDGET KELLOGG SMITHA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ROY CLARK
Represented By: DANIELLE T MORRISON
Represented By: DOUGLAS LAMAR KILBY
Represented By: GLENN T BURHANS, JR
Represented By: ILANA HOPE EISENSTEIN
Represented By: JONATHAN ALLEN GREEN
Represented By: JOSEPH TRUMON PHILLIPS
Represented By: LAUREN GALLO WHITE
Represented By: MENG JIA YANG
Represented By: PETER KARANJIA
Represented By: STEFFEN N JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETCHOICE, LLC doing business as NETCHOICE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER GEORGE OPRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETCHOICE LLC doing business as NETCHOICE
Represented By: BEN FABENS-LASSEN
Represented By: BRIAN M WILLEN
Represented By: DANIELLE T MORRISON
Represented By: ILANA HOPE EISENSTEIN
Represented By: JONATHAN ALLEN GREEN
Represented By: JOSEPH TRUMON PHILLIPS
Represented By: LAUREN GALLO WHITE
Represented By: MENG JIA YANG
Represented By: PETER KARANJIA
Represented By: STEFFEN N JOHNSON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER GEORGE OPRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TECHFREEDOM
Represented By: BERIN MICHAEL SZOKA
Represented By: LAWRENCE G WALTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHAMBER OF PROGRESS
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONNECTED COMMERCE COUNCIL
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSUMER TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ENGINE ADVOCACY
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY & INNOVATION FOUNDATION
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL BLACK JUSTICE COALITION
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PROGRESSIVE POLICY INSTITUTE
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TECHNET
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASHINGTON CENTER FOR TECHNOLOGY POLICY INCLUSION
Represented By: NURY AGUDO SIEKKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: DEANNA K SHULLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Represented By: DEANNA K SHULLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA
Represented By: DEANNA K SHULLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AUTHORS GUILD INC
Represented By: DEANNA K SHULLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: DEANNA K SHULLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEDIA LAW RESOURCE CENTER INC
Represented By: DEANNA K SHULLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PEN AMERICAN CENTER INC
Represented By: DEANNA K SHULLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNET ASSOCIATION
Represented By: ARI HOLTZBLATT
Represented By: PATRICK J CAROME
Represented By: PAUL R WOLFSON
Represented By: PETER WINSLOW HOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Represented By: DAVID ALLEN GREENE
Represented By: AARON DAVID MACKEY
Represented By: KURT BRADFORD OPSAHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEONID GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?