WHITEHEAD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: CATHERINE E WHITEHEAD
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 4:2021cv00245
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: 5 Service Copies filed. (cle)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: re: #4 Order. Plaintiff filed three (3) Service Copies of the Complaint. (cle)
June 24, 2021 Set Deadline - Service Copies due by 8/23/2021. (cle)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee. No later than August 23, 2021, (60 days) Plaintiff is required to submit three (3) identical copies of her/his Complaint for service purposes. Upon receipt of the service copies, the Clerk of Court shall send prepared summons, three certified copies of this Order, the service copies of the Complaint, and prepared USM 285 forms to the United States Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court shall return this case upon the filing of Defendant's answer or other response to the Complaint, or if Plaintiff has not complied with the requirement to submit service copies of the Complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/23/2021. (cle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
June 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by CATHERINE E WHITEHEAD. (cle)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by CATHERINE E WHITEHEAD. (cle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITEHEAD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE E WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?