WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD et al v. DESANTIS et al
Plaintiff: West Flagler Associates, LTD doing business as Magic City Casino, Bonita-Fort Myers Corporation doing business as Bonita Springs Poker Room, WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as MAGIC CITY CASINO and BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION A FLORIDA CORPORATION doing business as BONITA SPRINGS POKER ROOM
Defendant: Governor RONALD DION DESANTIS, Julie Imanuel Brown and RONALD DION DESANTIS
Case Number: 4:2021cv00270
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING #18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (JULIE IMANUEL BROWN answer due 8/31/2021; RONALD DION DESANTIS answer due 8/31/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 8/18/2021. (vkm)
August 17, 2021 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JULIE IMANUEL BROWN, RONALD DION DESANTIS, filed by WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD, BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Defendants' Consent to File Amended Complaint by BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION, WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Julie Imanuel Brown on 7/27/2021, filed by BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION, WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD. (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
August 5, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Ronald Dion DeSantis on 7/27/2021, filed by BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION, WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD. (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: On 7/6/2021, the Court entered a docket annotation (Doc. 3) to ATTORNEY ORETSKY regarding the Civil Cover Sheet. This document must be filed as a separate document and has not been done. Please RE-FILE the Civil Docket Sheet expeditiously. (cle)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD identifying Corporate Parent SOUTHWEST FLORIDA ENTERPRISES INC. for WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD.. (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent SOUTHWEST FLORIDA ENTERPRISES INC. for BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION.. (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD, BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION. JULIE IMANUEL BROWN waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD, BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION. RONALD DION DESANTIS waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID AXELMAN on behalf of JULIE IMANUEL BROWN (AXELMAN, DAVID)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND FREDERICK TREADWELL on behalf of All Defendants (TREADWELL, RAYMOND)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C), attorney Sydney Rochelle Normil is admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/9/2021. (jcw)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sydney Rochelle Normil.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6173735.) by BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION, WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (NORMIL, SYDNEY)
July 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sydney Rochelle Normil. (Filing fee $208 receipt number AFLNDC-6173735.) Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (ckm)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RONALD DION DESANTIS and JULIE IMANUEL BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Brown Summons) (ckm)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY ORETSKY re #1 Complaint: The parties named in the above-referenced document were added to the docket incorrectly and have been corrected by the clerk. Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. For future reference, please review the procedures for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website) at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (Click on CM/ECF link and go to General Info.)In addition, Counsel is advised that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents." (ckm)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by Bonita-Fort Myers Corporation, West Flagler Associates, LTD (Attachments: #1 Summons - Secretary Brown) (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6166148.), filed by West Flagler Associates, LTD, Bonita-Fort Myers Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 2021 Gaming Compact, #2 Exhibit B- SB2-A Bill, #3 Exhibit C - NIGC Letters, #4 Exhibit D - Amendment to Compact, #5 Exhibit E - The Allen Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (ORETSKY, ARAIZU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD et al v. DESANTIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor RONALD DION DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Imanuel Brown
Represented By: DAVID AXELMAN
Represented By: RAYMOND FREDERICK TREADWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD DION DESANTIS
Represented By: RAYMOND FREDERICK TREADWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Flagler Associates, LTD doing business as Magic City Casino
Represented By: ARAIZU SHEILA ORETSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita-Fort Myers Corporation doing business as Bonita Springs Poker Room
Represented By: ARAIZU SHEILA ORETSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST FLAGLER ASSOCIATES LTD A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as MAGIC CITY CASINO
Represented By: HALA SANDRIDGE
Represented By: RAQUEL AURORA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: SANDRA RAMIREZ
Represented By: SYDNEY ROCHELLE NORMIL
Represented By: ARAIZU SHEILA ORETSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONITA-FORT MYERS CORPORATION A FLORIDA CORPORATION doing business as BONITA SPRINGS POKER ROOM
Represented By: HALA SANDRIDGE
Represented By: RAQUEL AURORA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: SANDRA RAMIREZ
Represented By: SYDNEY ROCHELLE NORMIL
Represented By: ARAIZU SHEILA ORETSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?