LINK et al v. CORCORAN et al
Plaintiff: DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, KATRINA RIESGO, JULIE ADAMS, BARRY C. EDWARDS, DAVID PRICE, BLAKE SIMPSON, WILLIAM A LINK, JACK FIORITO, BARRY C EDWARDS, UNITED FACULTY OF FLORIDA and MARCH FOR OUR LIVES ACTION FUND
Defendant: Monesia Brown, NASTASSIA JANVIER, H. WAYNE HUIZENGA, JR, JOE YORK, SYDNEY KITSON, BEN GIBSON, TIMOTHY M CERIO, TOM GRADY, STEVEN M SCOTT, KEN JONES, PATRICIA FROST, DARLENE LUCCIO JORDAN, ALAN LEVINE, WILLIAM SELF, RICHARD CORCORAN, CHARLES H LYDECKER, EDWARD HADDOCK, ANDY TUCK, BRIAN LAMB, AUBREY EDGE, MARVA JOHNSON, ERIC SILAGY, RYAN PETTY, KENT STERMON and H WAYNE HUIZENGA, JR
Case Number: 4:2021cv00271
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against MONESIA BROWN, TIMOTHY M CERIO, RICHARD CORCORAN, AUBREY EDGE, PATRICIA FROST, BEN GIBSON, TOM GRADY, EDWARD HADDOCK, H WAYNE HUIZENGA, JR, NASTASSIA JANVIER, MARVA JOHNSON, KEN JONES, DARLENE LUCCIO JORDAN, SYDNEY KITSON, BRIAN LAMB, ALAN LEVINE, CHARLES H LYDECKER, RYAN PETTY, STEVEN M SCOTT, WILLIAM SELF, ERIC SILAGY, KENT STERMON, ANDY TUCK, JOE YORK, filed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE, UNITED FACULTY OF FLORIDA, MARCH FOR OUR LIVES ACTION FUND. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 21, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OMNIBUS PRO HAC VICE ORDER. The #27 , #28 , #29 , #30 , #31 & #32 motions are GRANTED. Mr. Bryant, Ms. Frost, Ms. Jasrasaria, Mr. Klein, Mr. Posimato, and Ms. Velez have fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/19/2021. (rcb)
July 19, 2021 Filing 32 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexi M. Velez.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6189851.) by JULIE ADAMS, BARRY C EDWARDS, JACK FIORITO, ROBIN GOODMAN, WILLIAM A LINK, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, DAVID PRICE, KATRINA RIESGO, BLAKE SIMPSON. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 19, 2021 Filing 31 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Posimato.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6189846.) by JULIE ADAMS, BARRY C EDWARDS, JACK FIORITO, ROBIN GOODMAN, WILLIAM A LINK, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, DAVID PRICE, KATRINA RIESGO, BLAKE SIMPSON. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 19, 2021 Filing 30 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Spencer W. Klein.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6189843.) by JULIE ADAMS, BARRY C EDWARDS, JACK FIORITO, ROBIN GOODMAN, WILLIAM A LINK, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, DAVID PRICE, KATRINA RIESGO, BLAKE SIMPSON. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 19, 2021 Filing 29 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jyoti Jasrasaria.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6189839.) by JULIE ADAMS, BARRY C EDWARDS, JACK FIORITO, ROBIN GOODMAN, WILLIAM A LINK, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, DAVID PRICE, KATRINA RIESGO, BLAKE SIMPSON. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 19, 2021 Filing 28 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth C. Frost.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6189830.) by JULIE ADAMS, BARRY C EDWARDS, JACK FIORITO, ROBIN GOODMAN, WILLIAM A LINK, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, DAVID PRICE, KATRINA RIESGO, BLAKE SIMPSON. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 19, 2021 Filing 27 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher J. Bryant.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6189797.) by JULIE ADAMS, BARRY C EDWARDS, JACK FIORITO, ROBIN GOODMAN, WILLIAM A LINK, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, DAVID PRICE, KATRINA RIESGO, BLAKE SIMPSON. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. KENT STERMON waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. ERIC SILAGY waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. WILLIAM SELF waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. STEVEN M SCOTT waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. CHARLES H LYDECKER waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. ALAN LEVINE waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. BRIAN LAMB waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. SYDNEY KITSON waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. DARLENE LUCCIO JORDAN waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. KEN JONES waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. NASTASSIA JANVIER waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. H WAYNE HUIZENGA, JR waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. EDWARD HADDOCK waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. PATRICIA FROST waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. AUBREY EDGE waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. TIMOTHY M CERIO waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. JOE YORK waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. ANDY TUCK waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. RYAN PETTY waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. MARVA JOHNSON waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. TOM GRADY waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. BEN GIBSON waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. RICHARD CORCORAN waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. MONESIA BROWN waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (ZEHNDER, THOMAS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6166201.), filed by BLAKE SIMPSON, BARRY C. EDWARDS, WILLIAM A LINK, JULIE ADAMS, JACK FIORITO, KATRINA RIESGO, DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME, ROBIN GOODMAN, DAVID PRICE. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINK et al v. CORCORAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monesia Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASTASSIA JANVIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. WAYNE HUIZENGA, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYDNEY KITSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY M CERIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM GRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN M SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA FROST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARLENE LUCCIO JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM SELF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD CORCORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES H LYDECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD HADDOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDY TUCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN LAMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUBREY EDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARVA JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC SILAGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN PETTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENT STERMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H WAYNE HUIZENGA, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAUNDR'E NEWSOME
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN GOODMAN
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Represented By: ALEXI MACHEK VELEZ
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATRINA RIESGO
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE ADAMS
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Represented By: ALEXI MACHEK VELEZ
Represented By: ELISABETH C FROST
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY C. EDWARDS
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID PRICE
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE SIMPSON
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM A LINK
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK FIORITO
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Represented By: ALEXI MACHEK VELEZ
Represented By: ELISABETH C FROST
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY C EDWARDS
Represented By: ALEXI MACHEK VELEZ
Represented By: ELISABETH C FROST
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED FACULTY OF FLORIDA
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCH FOR OUR LIVES ACTION FUND
Represented By: JYOTI JASRASARIA
Represented By: SPENCER WILLIAM KLEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?