LITTLEJOHN et al v. SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: JANUARY LITTLEJOHN and JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN
Defendant: SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY, ROCKY HANNA, KATHLEEN RODGERS and SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA
Case Number: 4:2021cv00415
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SLANKER, JEFFREY)
December 16, 2021 Filing 16 RULE 26 Disclosures by JANUARY LITTLEJOHN, JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN. (MCALISTER, MARY)
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DAMAGES filed by JANUARY LITTLEJOHN, JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN. (MCALISTER, MARY)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Discovery by KATHLEEN RODGERS, SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA. (SLANKER, JEFFREY)
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DAMAGES by ROCKY HANNA, KATHLEEN RODGERS, SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/13/2021). (SLANKER, JEFFREY)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION. Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. ECF No. #11 is GRANTED. Defendants must respond to the complaint on or before Monday, November 29, 2021. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/10/2021. (toy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by ROCKY HANNA, KATHLEEN RODGERS, SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA. (HARMON, TERRY)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/19/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/20/2021. Discovery due by 3/7/2022. Status Report due by 12/6/2021. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/05/2021. (toy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by TERRY JOSEPH HARMON on behalf of All Defendants (HARMON, TERRY)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN on behalf of All Defendants (SPELLMAN, MICHAEL)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY DOUGLAS SLANKER on behalf of All Defendants (SLANKER, JEFFREY)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANUARY LITTLEJOHN, JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN. KATHLEEN RODGERS served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (MCALISTER, MARY)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANUARY LITTLEJOHN, JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN. ROCKY HANNA served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (MCALISTER, MARY)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANUARY LITTLEJOHN, JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN. SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (MCALISTER, MARY)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROCKY HANNA, KATHLEEN RODGERS, SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Rocky Hanna Summons, #2 Kathleen Rodgers Summons) (toy)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (toy)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROCKY HANNA, KATHLEEN RODGERS, SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6492402.), filed by JANUARY LITTLEJOHN, JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons - School Board, #3 Summons- Hanna, #4 Summons - Rodgers, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (MCALISTER, MARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LITTLEJOHN et al v. SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANUARY LITTLEJOHN
Represented By: MARY ELIZABETH MCALISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN
Represented By: MARY ELIZABETH MCALISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKY HANNA
Represented By: JEFFREY DOUGLAS SLANKER
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Represented By: TERRY JOSEPH HARMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN RODGERS
Represented By: JEFFREY DOUGLAS SLANKER
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Represented By: TERRY JOSEPH HARMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA
Represented By: JEFFREY DOUGLAS SLANKER
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Represented By: TERRY JOSEPH HARMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?