CARRIN v. STRONG et al
Plaintiff: SANDRA GAIL CARRIN
Defendant: ERICA STRONG, CRAIG COIL, SHAUNA MARIE SMILLIDGE, JAMES WINSTON, J JIMENEZ and UNITED STATES BUREAU OF PRISONS
Case Number: 4:2021cv00486
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CRAIG COIL, J JIMENEZ, SHAUNA MARIE SMILLIDGE, ERICA STRONG, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF PRISONS, JAMES WINSTON. (Attachments: #1 Coil Summons, #2 Smillidge Summons, #3 Winston Summons, #4 Jiminez Summons, #5 BOP-USA Summons, #6 BOP-AG Summons, #7 BOP-GC Summons) (kjw)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Summons to be Issued_Erica Strong by SANDRA GAIL CARRIN (Attachments: #1 Summons to be Issued_Craig Coil, #2 Summons to be Issued_Shauna Marie Smillidge, #3 Summons to be Issued_James Winston, MD, #4 Summons to be Issued_J Jiminez, #5 Summons to be Issued_BOP c_o USAtty, #6 Summons to be Issued_BOP c_o AG USDOJ, #7 Summons to be Issued_BOP_GC for BOP) (WEBSTER, STEPHEN)
December 7, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers upon the filing of an answeror other responsive pleading to the complaint, ECF No. #1 on 3/7/2022. (rcb)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Plaintiff must ensure that service on the six named Defendants is completed no later than 3/7/2022. The Clerk of Court shall return this file (3/7/2022) upon the filing of an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint, ECF No. #1 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 12/07/2021. (rcb)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE.This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge to address preliminary matters and to make recommendations regarding dispositive matters. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/07/2021. (rcb)
December 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BFLNDC-6574891.), filed by SANDRA GAIL CARRIN. (WEBSTER, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARRIN v. STRONG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA GAIL CARRIN
Represented By: STEPHEN G WEBSTER
Represented By: LOUIS JEAN-BAPTISTE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICA STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG COIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAUNA MARIE SMILLIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES WINSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J JIMENEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?