MARTIN v. DIXON
Petitioner: MICHAEL J MARTIN
Respondent: RICKY D DIXON
Case Number: 4:2022cv00025
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice of Appearance. (toy)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B MCDERMOTT on behalf of RICKY D DIXON (MCDERMOTT, MICHAEL)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO 2254 PETITION. The Clerk shall serve copies of the 2254 petition (ECF No. #1 ) and this order on Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Florida. Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other response to the petition on or before April 25, 2022. Petitioner shall file a reply, if any, no later than May 25, 2022. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/25/2022)., Replies due by 5/25/2022.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 01/25/2022. (toy) *Copies forwarded as directed*
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (toy)
January 21, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (toy)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number FLN4000043412. Fee status updated to paid. (rcb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MICHAEL J MARTIN. (rcb)**No service copy provided** (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/15/2022 to correct scan of document.) (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL J MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RICKY D DIXON
Represented By: MICHAEL B MCDERMOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?