DOE et al v. LADAPO et al
Plaintiff: JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, Brenda Boe, Bennett Boe, Carla Coe, Christina Coe, Fiona Foe, Freya Foe, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, GLORIA GOE, GAVIN GOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE, LUCIEN HAMEL, OLIVIA NOEL, REBECCA CRUZ EVIA and KAI POPE
Defendant: Joseph A. Ladapo, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, Scot Ackerman, Nicholas W. Romanello, Wael Barsoum, Matthew R. Benson, Gregory Coffman, Amy Derick, David Diamond, Patrick Hunter, Luz Marina Pages, Eleonor Pimentel, Hector Vila, Michael Wasylik, Zachariah P. Zachariah, MARIA GARCIA, Nicole Justice, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, Watson Ducatel, Tiffany Sizemore Di Pietro, GREGORY WILLIAMS, Monica M. Mortensen, Valerie Jackson, Chris Creegan, William D. Kirsh, JOSEPH A LADAPO, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, MATTHEW R BENSON, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH, MONICA M MORTENSEN, WILLIAM D KIRSH, ASHLEY MOODY, Ginger B Madden, Jack Campbell, John Durrett, Melissa Nelson, William Gladson, BRUCE BARTLETT, R.J. Larizza, BRIAN S KRAMER, BRIAN HAAS, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, Ed Brodsky, Lopez S Susan, DAVE ARONBERG, Dennis Ward, Harold F Pryor, Phil Archer, Thomas Bakkedahl, Amira D Fox, MONIQUE H WORRELL, in his Official Capi LARRY BASFORD, R J LARIZZA, LARRY BASFORD and SUSAN S LOPEZ
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, ACADEMIC PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. d/b/a GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC PEDIATRICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PEDIATRIC SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Inc., ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, FLORIDA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PEDIATRIC NURSE PRACTITIONERS, PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, SOCIETIES FOR PEDIATRIC UROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC NURSES, WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS INC doing business as GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY and ASSOCIATION OF MEDICAL SCHOOL PEDIATRIC DEPARTMENT CHAIRS INC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00114
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Filing 165 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/16/2023. Court addresses status of claims against State Attorney for the 4th Judicial Circuit. Plaintiff advises court that case is only going forward against State Attorney for the 5th Judicial Circuit. Parties discuss trial schedule. Ruling by Court: An order will be entered dismissing the claims against the 4th Judicial Circuit. Trial will take place December 13, 14, 21, 22. The parties will also check availability for December 15 and 20. An order will follow regarding class certification. (Bench Trial set for 12/13/2023 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE.) (Court Reporter Megan Hague, Official Court Reporter) (ckm)
October 12, 2023 Filing 164 PLAINTIFFS' RULE 26(a)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES. (CHRISS, SIMONE) Modified to edit title on 10/13/2023 (rcb).
October 11, 2023 Filing 163 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2023 03:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
October 10, 2023 Filing 162 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PARTIALLY EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS WITNESS KENNETH W. GOODMAN, PhD, FACMI, FACE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Expert Report of Dr. Kenneth Goodman, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Deposition Transcript of Dr. Kenneth Goodman) (STARR, JASON) Modified to edit title on 10/11/2023 (rcb).
October 4, 2023 Filing 161 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/4/2023 re #155 Motion to Amend Case Schedule. Plaintiffs request additional time to confer with counsel regarding trial dates. Ruling by Court: Parties can coordinate with the courtroom deputy regarding trial date (November 28 or sometime in December) and trial will be set, or an additional telephone conference can be set if necessary. An order will be entered adopting the proposed schedule with the exception of the trial date. (Court Reporter Megan Strawn, Official Court Reporter, Wyoming) (ckm)
October 3, 2023 Filing 160 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING on #155 Motion to Amend Case Schedule: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2023 10:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
September 29, 2023 Filing 159 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WILLIAM GLADSON. (HART, JOSEPH)
September 26, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #158 MOTION in Limine TO PARTIALLY EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' WITNESS KENNETH W. GOODMAN, PHD, FACMI, FACE,. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/10/2023). (rcb)
September 25, 2023 Filing 158 MOTION in Limine TO PARTIALLY EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' WITNESS KENNETH W. GOODMAN, PHD, FACMI, FACE, by SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, MICHAEL WASYLIK, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Expert Report of Dr. Kenneth Goodman, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Deposition Transcript of Dr. Kenneth Goodman) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER of USCA #23-12159 as to #108 Notice of Appeal. Motion filed by Appellees Jane Doe, Susan Doe, Brenda Boe, Bennett Boe, Carla Coe, Christina Coe, Fiona Foe and Freya Foe is GRANTED by clerk. (rcb)
September 25, 2023 Set Deadlines re #108 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal # 23-12159 on 12/26/2023. (rcb)
September 22, 2023 Filing 156 RULE 26 Disclosures by SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
September 21, 2023 Filing 155 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LUCIEN HAMEL, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, OLIVIA NOEL, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE, KAI POPE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (REDBURN, THOMAS)
September 19, 2023 Filing 154 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING Proceedings held on September 1, 2023, before Judge Robert L. Hinkle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Donna L. Boland, Email: Donna_Boland@flnd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/26/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2023. (dlb)
September 12, 2023 Filing 152 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2023 02:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DENYING #115 AN ADDITIONAL PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The second preliminary-injunction motion, ECF No. #115 , is denied. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/11/2023. (rcb)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE.The bench trial remains set for /13/2023 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE.The deadline is 9/22/2023 for the disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3). The deadline for objections under Rule 26(a)(3) is 10/2/2023. The deadline is 10/2/2023 for an attorney conference to address pretrial matters, stipulate to as many facts and agree on as many issues as possible, and prepare the pretrial stipulation. The parties must file a pretrial stipulation by 10/23/2023. Each party must file a trial brief by 110/23/2023. The deadline to prefile exhibits, see ECF No. #117 11, remains 10/23/2023. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a pretrial conference for the first available date on or after October 25, 2023. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/11/2023. (rcb)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER TO DISCLOSE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/11/2023. (rcb)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Re: #146 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/11/2023. (rcb) Modified to add hyperlink for #146 on 9/12/2023 (rcb).
September 8, 2023 Filing 153 USCA ORDER #23-12159. Motion having completed the web-based CIP within 14 days, the undersigned respectfully asks that this motion to remedy be granted filed by Appellants Florida Board of Medicine, Surgeon General, State of Florida, Scot Ackerman, Nicholas William Romanello, Wael Barsoum, Matthew R. Benson, Gregory Coffman, Amy Derick, David Diamond and Patrick Hunter is GRANTED by clerk. (rcb)
September 6, 2023 Filing 147 COVER LETTER (Attachments: #1 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS, #2 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS, #3 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS, #4 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS, #5 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS, #6 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS, #7 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS, #8 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS, #9 SEALED MEDICAL RECORDS) (rcb)
September 5, 2023 Filing 146 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF (1) PROTECTIVE ORDER AND (2) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER TO DISCLOSE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order with Attachment A, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed HIPAA Protective Order) (REDBURN, THOMAS) Modified to edit title on 9/6/2023 (rcb).
September 1, 2023 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Motion Hearing held by video on 9/1/2023. Court hears argument of counsel on plaintiffs' #115 motion for preliminary injunction and #120 motion to certify class. Ruling by Court: Plaintiffs will file medical information for specific plaintiffs for whom injunction is sought. Defense will have an opportunity to respond. An order will follow. (Court Reporter Donna Boland, Official Court Reporter) (ckm)
August 29, 2023 Filing 144 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING on #115 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #120 Motion to Certify Class: The Motion Hearing that was scheduled for August 29, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled for 9/1/2023 at 3:00 p.m. before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE and will be conducted by video. The video link will be sent by email to counsel. As noted previously, each side will have 30 minutes to argue the motions. Members of the general public may join by telephone but must keep their phones muted: Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
August 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER on scheduling of hearing: Current forecasts include a substantial probability of a hurricane coming ashore near Tallahassee on Wednesday morning. Prudence calls for conducting the Tuesday afternoon hearing by audio or video conference or rescheduling it for Friday or later. The parties should confer and advise the courtroom deputy clerk of their positions by telephone Monday morning. Issued by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/27/23. (RH)
August 23, 2023 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, LUCIEN HAMEL, OLIVIA NOEL, KAI POPE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Emergency Rule No. 64B8ER23-11, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Emergency Rule 64B15ER23-12, #3 Exhibit C - Form DH5083-MQA (Rev. 8_23), #4 Exhibit D - Form DH5082-MQA (Rev. 8_23)) (CHRISS, SIMONE)
August 22, 2023 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, MICHAEL WASYLIK, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion, Eknes-Tucker v Governor of Alabama, 22-11707 (11th Cir. 2023)) (BEATO, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2023 Set Deadline-Re: #138 - Reply due by 8/24/2023. (rcb)
August 21, 2023 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION to Certify Class , #137 MOTION for Leave to File re #120 MOTION to Certify Class filed by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LUCIEN HAMEL, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, OLIVIA NOEL, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE, KAI POPE. (REDBURN, THOMAS)
August 21, 2023 Filing 139 NOTICE OF HEARING on #115 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2023 03:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE, Joseph Woodrow Hatchett United States Courthouse and Federal Building, Courtroom 5 East, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. PLEASE NOTE the parties will have 30 minutes total per side to argue both the #115 and #120 Motions. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Cindy Markley at 850-521-3518 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER ALLOWING A REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION #137 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/21/23. (sms)
August 18, 2023 Filing 137 MOTION for Leave to File re #120 MOTION to Certify Class by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LUCIEN HAMEL, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, OLIVIA NOEL, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE, KAI POPE. (REDBURN, THOMAS)
August 16, 2023 Filing 136 NOTICE OF HEARING on #120 Motion to Certify Class: Oral Argument set for 8/29/2023 03:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE, Joseph Woodrow Hatchett United States Courthouse and Federal Building, Courtroom 5 East, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Cindy Markley at 850-521-3518 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
August 14, 2023 Filing 135 THE STATE'S OPPOSITION TO THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 8/15/2023 (rcb).
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR PRODUCING RECORDS OF STATE PROCEEDINGS. By 8/11/2023, the defendants must produce links to all the legislative and administrative proceedings. By 8/24/2023, the defendants must produce the legislative and administrative materials other than transcripts of proceedings. By 9/10/2023, the defendants must produce transcripts of the legislative and administrative proceedings. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/11/2023. (rcb)
August 11, 2023 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION for Leave to File re #127 Response in Opposition to Motion, #115 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, LUCIEN HAMEL, OLIVIA NOEL, KAI POPE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Breast and Cervical Cancer Detection Program, #2 Exhibit B - Authorization for Electroconvulsive Treatment, #3 Exhibit C - Medical Marijuana Informed Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Cataract Procedures Informed Consent) (CHRISS, SIMONE)
August 11, 2023 Filing 132 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), #23-12159-J the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #108 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (rcb)
August 10, 2023 Filing 131 CONSOLIDATED ANSWER BY ALL DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 8/11/2023 (rcb).
August 10, 2023 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/10/2023. Court recaps current schedule and hears from counsel regarding discovery issues. Ruling by Court: Defense to provide written reports by August 24 and transcripts by September 10. Courtroom deputy will coordinate with counsel a date for oral argument on the motion for class certification. (Court Reporter Megan Hague, Official Court Reporter) (ckm)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER ALLOWING A REPLY MEMORANDUM ON THE #128 PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION MOTION. The plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #128 , for leave to file a reply memorandum in support of the preliminary-injunction motion is granted. The plaintiffs may file a reply memorandum by 8/14/2023. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/10/2023. (rcb)
August 10, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #128 MOTION for Leave to File re #127 Response in Opposition to Motion, #115 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/24/2023). (rcb)
August 9, 2023 Filing 128 MOTION for Leave to File re #127 Response in Opposition to Motion, #115 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, LUCIEN HAMEL, OLIVIA NOEL, KAI POPE. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
August 7, 2023 Filing 127 THE STATE'S AMENDED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORADUM OF LAW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Form - "Feminizing Medications for Patients with Gender Dysphoria", #2 Exhibit Ex B - Form - "Masculinizing Medications for Patients with Gender Dysphoria", #3 Exhibit Ex C - Form - "Surgical Treatment for Adults with Gender Dysphoria") (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 8/8/2023 (rcb).
August 7, 2023 Filing 126 THE STATE'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORADUM OF LAW. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 8/8/2023 (rcb).
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER TO DISCLOSE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION Re: #123 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/3/2023. (rcb) Modified to add ECF #123 link on 8/10/2023 (rcb).
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Re: #123 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/3/2023. (rcb) Modified to add ECF #123 link on 8/10/2023 (rcb).
August 3, 2023 Filing 123 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and HIPAA Qualified Protective Order & Order to Disclose Protective Health Information by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LUCIEN HAMEL, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, OLIVIA NOEL, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE, KAI POPE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order with Attachment A, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed HIPAA Protective Order) (REDBURN, THOMAS) Modified on 8/4/2023 to terminate motion (ckm).
August 1, 2023 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA E PRATT on behalf of SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, MICHAEL WASYLIK, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH (PRATT, JOSHUA)
July 31, 2023 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM in Support re #120 MOTION to Certify Class filed by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LUCIEN HAMEL, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, OLIVIA NOEL, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE, KAI POPE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas E. Redburn, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - LS Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit B - Simone Chriss Bio & CV, #4 Exhibit C - Jennifer L. Levi - GLAD, #5 Exhibit D - Impact Litigation and Advocacy - HRC Foundation, #6 Exhibit E - Williams Institute Trans-Pop-Update-Jun-2022) (REDBURN, THOMAS)
July 31, 2023 Filing 120 MOTION to Certify Class by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE, LUCIEN HAMEL, OLIVIA NOEL, REBECCA CRUZ EVIA, KAI POPE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/14/2023). (REDBURN, THOMAS)
July 31, 2023 Filing 119 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2023 01:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
July 27, 2023 Filing 118 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE,LUCIEN HAMEL, PAUL POE, OLIVIA NOEL, REBECCA CRUZ EVIA AND KAI POPE. (rcb)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SCHEDULING ORDER. The clerk must set a scheduling conference by telephone for the first available date. The plaintiff's motion, ECF No. #114 , for leave to file the third amended complaint is granted. The third amended complaint, ECF No. #114 -1, is deemed filed as of July 27, 2023. The bench trial is set for Monday, 11/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. A party with a conflict must file a notice by 8/10/2023. The fact-discovery deadline is 8/9/2023. The expert-discovery deadline is 9/18/2023. By 10/23/2023 all exhibits a party expects to present must be pre-filed on the CM/ECF docket signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/27/2023.
July 27, 2023 Set Deadlines- Re: #117 Fact Discovery due by 8/9/2023. All Exhibit due by 10/23/2023. Expert Discovery - by 9/18/2023. Bench Trial set for 11/13/2023 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. (rcb)
July 24, 2023 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Support re #115 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
July 24, 2023 Filing 115 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kai Pope, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Lucien Hamel, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Olivia Noel, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Rebecca Cruz Evia, #5 Exhibit Expert Declaration of Dan H. Karasic, M.D., #6 Exhibit Expert Declaration of Daniel Shumer, M.D., #7 Exhibit Expert Declaration of Dr. Loren Schechter, #8 Exhibit Expert Declaration of Vernon Langford, DNP, #9 Exhibit Supplemental Expert Declaration of Kenneth Goodman PhD, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (CHRISS, SIMONE)
July 24, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #114 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/7/2023). (rcb)
July 21, 2023 Filing 114 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JOIN NEW PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint) (REDBURN, THOMAS) Modified to edit title on 7/24/2023 (rcb). Modified to terminate ECF #114 on 7/28/2023 (rcb).
July 20, 2023 Filing 113 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (REDBURN, THOMAS)
July 11, 2023 Filing 112 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), #23-12159 the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #108 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (rcb)
July 5, 2023 Filing 111 USCA Acknowledgment # 23-12159 for #108 NOTICE OF APPEAL ** (rcb)
June 30, 2023 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, WILLIAM GLADSON, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH for proceedings held on May 19, 2023 before Judge Judge Robert L. Hinkle, Court Reporter:Judy Gagnon (BEATO, MICHAEL)
June 27, 2023 Filing 109 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #108 Notice of Appeal. (rcb)
June 27, 2023 Set Deadlines re #108 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 9/25/2023. Certificate of Readiness (FRAP 11) due by 7/11/2023. (rcb)
June 26, 2023 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #90 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO by SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, WILLIAM GLADSON, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, MICHAEL WASYLIK, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-7940814.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc. 90, Preliminary Injunction Order) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
June 23, 2023 Filing 107 CORRECTED, CONSOLIDATED ANSWER to #59 Amended Complaint,,, BY ALL DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, WILLIAM GLADSON, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, BRIAN S KRAMER, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, MICHAEL WASYLIK, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
June 23, 2023 Filing 106 CONSOLIDATED ANSWER to #59 Amended Complaint,,, BY ALL DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
June 22, 2023 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR on behalf of BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE (REDBURN, THOMAS)
June 22, 2023 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by MAYA GINSBURG on behalf of BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE (GINSBURG, MAYA)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF STATE ATTORNEYS DEFENDANTS UPON CONDITIONS. By agreement of the Stipulating parties as set forth below, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and 4l(a)(l), the eighteen above-listed Defendant State Attorneys (the "Dismissed State Attorneys") are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Defendant State Attorney WILLIAM M GLADSON in his official capacity as State Attorney for the Fifth Judicial Circuit of Florida ("State Attorney Gladson") is not a party to this stipulation and will remain a Defendant in the lawsuit. This Order does not dismiss any claims against any Defendants except as expressly provided herein. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/22/2023. (rcb)
June 22, 2023 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH EDWARD HART on behalf of WILLIAM GLADSON (HART, JOSEPH)
June 19, 2023 Filing 101 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Melissa Nelson. (JACOBS, ARTHUR)
June 19, 2023 Filing 100 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAVE ARONBERG, Phil Archer, BRUCE BARTLETT, LARRY BASFORD, Thomas Bakkedahl, Ed Brodsky, Jack Campbell, John Durrett, Amira D Fox, William Gladson, BRIAN HAAS, BRIAN S KRAMER, R.J. Larizza, Ginger B Madden, Harold F Pryor, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, Lopez S Susan, MONIQUE H WORRELL, Dennis Ward. (JACOBS, ARTHUR)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DISMISSING THE CLAIMS AGAINST THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. The notice of voluntary dismissal, ECF No. #97 , is deemed a motion to amend the second amended complaint to delete the claims against the Attorney General. The motion is granted. All claims against the Attorney General are dismissed without prejudice. The Attorney General's motion to dismiss, ECF No. #80 , is denied as moot. I do not direct the entry of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). The claims against other defendants remain pending. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/15/2023. (rcb)
June 15, 2023 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III on behalf of William Gladson (STAFFORD, WILLIAM)
June 15, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #96 NOTICE of Appearance, #97 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. **Incorrect Referral Made to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK** (rcb)
June 14, 2023 Filing 97 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE (CHRISS, SIMONE)
June 14, 2023 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS (STAFFORD, WILLIAM) Modified to edit title on 6/15/2023 (rcb).
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #93 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #94 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 06/13/2023. (rcb)
June 9, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #93 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas E. Redburn, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7909650.), #94 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maya Ginsburg.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7910051.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 8, 2023 Filing 94 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maya Ginsburg.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7910051.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (GINSBURG, MAYA)
June 8, 2023 Filing 93 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas E. Redburn, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7909650.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (REDBURN, THOMAS)
June 6, 2023 Filing 92 Cash Injunction Bond Received Re: #90 : $ 100.00, receipt number 400000526. Fee status updated to paid. (rcb)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/20/2023. Discovery due by 1/5/2024. Attorney Conference due by 7/6/2023. Jury Trial set for 4/15/2024 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/06/2023. (rcb)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot #57 Motion for TRO. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/6/23. (sms)
June 6, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #89 Notice of Appearance, (rcb)**AN ISO IS NEEDED**
June 5, 2023 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS on behalf of DAVE ARONBERG, Phil Archer, BRUCE BARTLETT, LARRY BASFORD, Thomas Bakkedahl, Ed Brodsky, Jack Campbell, John Durrett, Amira D Fox, William Gladson, BRIAN HAAS, BRIAN S KRAMER, SUSAN S LOPEZ, R.J. Larizza, Ginger B Madden, Harold F Pryor, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, Lopez S Susan, MONIQUE H WORRELL, Dennis Ward (JACOBS, ARTHUR)
June 5, 2023 Filing 88 NOTICE of NON-OBJECTION by DAVE ARONBERG, Phil Archer, BRUCE BARTLETT, LARRY BASFORD, Thomas Bakkedahl, Ed Brodsky, Jack Campbell, John Durrett, Amira D Fox, William Gladson, BRIAN HAAS, BRIAN S KRAMER, SUSAN S LOPEZ, R.J. Larizza, ASHLEY MOODY, Ginger B Madden, Melissa Nelson, Harold F Pryor, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, Lopez S Susan, MONIQUE H WORRELL, Dennis Ward (STAFFORD, WILLIAM)
June 2, 2023 Filing 87 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #86 Sealed Document **FORWARDED TO CHAMBERS** (rcb)
June 2, 2023 Filing 86 SEALED #1 COVER LETTER) (rcb)
June 2, 2023 Filing 85 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. Phil Archer served on 5/31/2023, answer due 6/21/2023. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
June 2, 2023 Filing 84 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. Ed Brodsky served on 5/30/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
June 2, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Proceedings held on 6/1/2023, before Judge Robert L. Hinkle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-443-9797. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2023. (mah)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #74 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 06/02/2023. (rcb)
June 1, 2023 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/1/2023. Court hears argument re: Plaintiffs' #57 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and #30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ruling by Court: An order is forthcoming (Court Reporter Megan Hague (USDC-Tallahassee)). (vkm)
June 1, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #79 Notice of Appearance **AN ISO IS NEEDED** (rcb)
May 31, 2023 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss by ASHLEY MOODY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/14/2023). (STAFFORD, WILLIAM)
May 31, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III on behalf of ASHLEY MOODY (STAFFORD, WILLIAM)
May 31, 2023 Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. Jack Campbell served on 5/26/2023, answer due 6/16/2023. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 31, 2023 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. Ginger B Madden served on 5/25/2023, answer due 6/15/2023. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 31, 2023 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. BRIAN HAAS served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 31, 2023 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. MONIQUE H WORRELL served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 31, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon Minter.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7894090.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
May 30, 2023 Set Deadlines-Re: #71 Plaintiff's Service of Copies on Defendants by noon on 5/31/2023. Motions for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for 6/1/2023 02:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. (rcb)
May 30, 2023 Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon Minter.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7894090.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE. (MINTER, SHANNON)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER CORRECTING DATE OF THE ADDITIONAL HEARING. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/30/23. (sms)
May 30, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE OF HEARING on #30 Telephonic hearing on the Motions for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction set for 6/1/2023 at 2:00 P>M> Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Sherrye Stephens>Judicial Assistant. (sms).
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER setting an additional hearing on the motions for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/30/23. (RH)
May 26, 2023 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. LARRY BASFORD served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 26, 2023 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. John Durrett served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023; William Gladson served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service on Gladson) (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 26, 2023 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. DAVE ARONBERG served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; BRUCE BARTLETT served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; Thomas Bakkedahl served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; Amira D Fox served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; BRIAN S KRAMER served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; R.J. Larizza served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; ASHLEY MOODY served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; Melissa Nelson served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; Harold F Pryor served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; Dennis Ward served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; SUSAN S LOPEZ served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service on Aronberg, #2 Affidavit Service on Bakkedahl, #3 Affidavit Service on Bartlett, #4 Affidavit Service on Fox, #5 Affidavit Service on Kramer, #6 Affidavit Service on Larizza, #7 Affidavit Service on Lopez, #8 Affidavit Service on Nelson, #9 Affidavit Service on Pryor, #10 Affidavit Service on Ward) (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 26, 2023 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, GLORIA GOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE, PATRICIA POE. KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE served on 5/19/2023, answer due 6/9/2023. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 22, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/19/23, before Judge Robert Hinkle. Contract Court Reporter Judy A. Gagnon. Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Hearing. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Contract Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/30/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2023. (bkp)
May 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #56 LEAVE TO FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The second amended complaint, ECF No. #56 -1, is deemed filed as of May 19, 2023. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/20/2023, nunc pro tunc 5/18/2023. (rcb)
May 19, 2023 Filing 64 Summons Issued as to Phil Archer. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS ISSUED-ED BRODSKY) (rcb)
May 19, 2023 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2023. Court hears argument of counsel on plaintiffs' motions for #30 preliminary injunction and #57 temporary restraining order. Ruling by Court: The motions are taken under advisement. An order will follow. (Court Reporter Judy Gagnon, Contract Reporter) (ckm)
May 19, 2023 Filing 62 Summons Issued as to DAVE ARONBERG, LARRY BASFORD, Thomas Bakkedahl, Amira D Fox, BRIAN HAAS, BRIAN S KRAMER, Harold F Pryor, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, Lopez S Susan, Dennis Ward. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS ISSUED-KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, #2 SUMMONS ISSUED-THOMAS BAKKEDAHL, #3 SUMMONS ISSUED-BRIAN HAAS, #4 SUMMONS ISSUED-BRIAN K KRAMER, #5 SUMMONS ISSUED-SUSAN S LOPEZ, #6 SUMMONS ISSUED-LARRY BASFORD, #7 SUMMONS ISSUED-DAVE ARONBERG, #8 SUMMONS ISSUED-DENNIS W WARD, #9 SUMMONS ISSUED-HAROLD F PRYOR) (rcb)
May 19, 2023 Filing 61 Summons Issued as to ASHLEY MOODY (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS ISSUED-BRIAN S. KRAMER, #2 SUMMONS ISSUED-BRUCE BARTLETT, #3 SUMMONS ISSUED-GINGER BOWEN MADDEN, #4 SUMMONS ISSUED-JOHN DURRETT, #5 SUMMONS ISSUED-MONIQUE H. WORRELL, #6 SUMMONS ISSUED-RJ LARIZZA, #7 SUMMONS ISSUED-WILLIAM GLADSON, #8 SUMMONS ISSUED-JACK CAMPBELL, #9 SUMMONS ISSUED-MELISSA NELSON) (rcb)
May 19, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Filing Summons by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to Moody, #2 Exhibit Summons to Madden, #3 Exhibit Summons to Campbell, #4 Exhibit Summons to Durrett, #5 Exhibit Summons to Nelson, #6 Exhibit Summons to Gladson, #7 Exhibit Summons to Bartlett, #8 Exhibit Summons to Larizza, #9 Exhibit Summons to Kramer, #10 Exhibit Summons to Worrell, #11 Exhibit Summons to Haas, #12 Exhibit Summons to Rundle, #13 Exhibit Summons to Brodsky, #14 Exhibit Summons to Lopez, #15 Exhibit Summons to Basford, #16 Exhibit Summons to Aronberg, #17 Exhibit Summons to Ward, #18 Exhibit Summons to Pryor, #19 Exhibit Summons to Archer, #20 Exhibit Summons to Bakkedahl, #21 Exhibit Summons to Fox) (DUNN, CHELSEA)
May 18, 2023 Filing 59 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, MICHAEL WASYLIK, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH, ASHLEY MOODY, Ginger B Madden, Jack Campbell, John Durrett, Melissa Nelson, William Gladson, BRUCE BARTLETT, R.J. Larizza, BRIAN S KRAMER, BRIAN HAAS, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, Ed Brodsky, Lopez S Susan, DAVE ARONBERG, Dennis Ward, Harold F Pryor, Phil Archer, Thomas Bakkedahl, Amira D Fox, filed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, GLORIA GOE, PATRICIA POE, CARLA COE. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 18, 2023 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Goodman) (STARR, JASON)
May 18, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #57 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/1/2023). (rcb)
May 17, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Temporary Restraining Order) (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 17, 2023 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint) (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 15, 2023 Filing 55 THE STATE'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION MOTION. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 5/16/2023 (rcb).
May 11, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF HEARING on #30 Motion: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/19/2023 08:30 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 5 East, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Cindy Markley at 850-521-3518 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
May 3, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephonic Proceedings held on 5/1/2023, before Judge Robert L. Hinkle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-443-9797. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2023. (mah)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION PROCEDURES.The deadline for the defendants to respond to the preliminary-injunction motion is extended to 5/15/2023.The plaintiffs may file a reply memorandum in support of the motion by the later of (a) 5/17/2023or (b) 24 hours before the oral argument. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/03/2023. (rcb)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ALLOWING AMICUS BRIEF. The motion of American Academy of Pediatrics et al., ECF No. #36 , for leave to file an amicus brief in support of plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is granted. The amicus brief, ECF No. #36 -1, is deemed properly filed. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/02/2023. (rcb)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ALLOWING USE OF PSEUDONYMS. The unopposed motions for leave to use pseudonyms, ECF Nos. #19 , #20 , #21 , #22 , #31 , #32 , #33 , and #34 , are granted. The plaintiffs may use pseudonyms as requested in the motions. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/02/2023. (rcb)
May 2, 2023 Set Deadline- Answer for due ALL DEFENDANTS RE: #48 by 6/23/2023. (rcb)
May 1, 2023 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/1/2023 re: #30 motion for preliminary injunction. Ruling by Court: The motions to proceed under pseudonyms are granted. Defendants' response to motion for preliminary injunction is due by 5/15/2023. An order will follow. (Court Reporter Megan Hague, Official Court Reporter) (ckm)
May 1, 2023 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FIONA FOE, LISA LOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, PAUL POE, GAVIN GOE, LINDA LOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, GLORIA GOE, PATRICIA POE, CARLA COE. All Defendants. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
May 1, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY VERGIL PERKO on behalf of All Defendants (PERKO, GARY)
May 1, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO on behalf of All Defendants (BEATO, MICHAEL)
May 1, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of All Defendants (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #39 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #40 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #41 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #42 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #43 , is GRANTED. (Appointed D JEAN VETA, EMILY M. MONDRY, CORTLIN H. LANNIN, WILLIAM R. ISASI & CYNTHIA CHENG-WUN WEAVER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/27/2023. (rcb) Modified to edit Judge Association & Signature on 4/28/2023 (rcb).
April 26, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Jean Veta.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7839172.), #43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Cheng-Wun Weaver.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number CFLNDC-7839815.), #40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cortlin H. Lannin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7839133.), #41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily M. Mondry.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7839144.), #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7839111.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
April 25, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Cheng-Wun Weaver.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number CFLNDC-7839815.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE, GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE. (WEAVER, CYNTHIA)
April 25, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Jean Veta.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7839172.) by ACADEMIC PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC PEDIATRICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PEDIATRIC SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. d/b/a GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Inc., ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, FLORIDA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PEDIATRIC NURSE PRACTITIONERS, PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, SOCIETIES FOR PEDIATRIC UROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC NURSES, WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (VETA, D)
April 25, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily M. Mondry.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7839144.) by ACADEMIC PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC PEDIATRICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PEDIATRIC SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. d/b/a GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Inc., FLORIDA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PEDIATRIC NURSE PRACTITIONERS, PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, SOCIETIES FOR PEDIATRIC UROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC NURSES, WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MONDRY, EMILY)
April 25, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cortlin H. Lannin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7839133.) by ACADEMIC PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC PEDIATRICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PEDIATRIC SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. d/b/a GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Inc., ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, FLORIDA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PEDIATRIC NURSE PRACTITIONERS, PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, SOCIETIES FOR PEDIATRIC UROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC NURSES, WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (LANNIN, CORTLIN)
April 25, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7839111.) by ACADEMIC PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC PEDIATRICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PEDIATRIC SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. d/b/a GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Inc., ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, FLORIDA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PEDIATRIC NURSE PRACTITIONERS, PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, SOCIETIES FOR PEDIATRIC UROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC NURSES, WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (ISASI, WILLIAM)
April 25, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2023 01:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1234#Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (re #30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction) - By separate notice, the clerk must set a scheduling conference by telephone for 5/1/2023 at 1:00 PM. It will be moved to another date available on the court's calendar if all parties agree. The courtroom deputy clerk must cooperate with the parties on the availability of other dates. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/25/2023. (ckm)
April 25, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #35 Notice of Appearance. (rcb)**An ISO is needed**
April 24, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ACADEMIC PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC PEDIATRICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PEDIATRIC SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. d/b/a GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Inc., ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, FLORIDA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PEDIATRIC NURSE PRACTITIONERS, PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, SOCIETIES FOR PEDIATRIC UROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC NURSES, WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Curiae Brief) (GOLDBERG, NOAH)
April 24, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG on behalf of AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, ACADEMIC PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION, American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. d/b/a GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC PEDIATRICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PEDIATRIC SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Inc., ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, FLORIDA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PEDIATRIC NURSE PRACTITIONERS, PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, SOCIETIES FOR PEDIATRIC UROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, SOCIETY FOR PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC NURSES, WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH (GOLDBERG, NOAH)
April 24, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym by PATRICIA POE, PAUL POE. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
April 24, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym by LINDA LOE, LISA LOE. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
April 24, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym by GAVIN GOE, GLORIA GOE. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
April 24, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION re #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Proceed Under Pseudonym by JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
April 24, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, LINDA LOE, LISA LOE, GLORIA GOE, GAVIN GOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jane Doe, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Linda Loe, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Gloria Goe, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Shumer, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Janssen, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Bruggeman) (CHRISS, SIMONE)
April 24, 2023 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, MATTHEW R BENSON, GREGORY COFFMAN, CHRIS CREEGAN, AMY DERICK, DAVID DIAMOND, WATSON DUCATEL, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, PATRICK HUNTER, VALERIE JACKSON, NICOLE JUSTICE, WILLIAM D KIRSH, JOSEPH A LADAPO, MONICA M MORTENSEN, LUZ MARINA PAGES, ELEONOR PIMENTEL, NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO, TIFFANY SIZEMORE DI PIETRO, HECTOR VILA, MICHAEL WASYLIK, GREGORY WILLIAMS, ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH, filed by FIONA FOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE. (CHRISS, SIMONE)
April 19, 2023 Set Deadline- ANSWER DUE FOR IONA FOE, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, CHRISTINA COE, BRENDA BOE, FREYA FOE, BENNETT BOE, CARLA COE by 6/12/2023. (rcb)
April 18, 2023 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All DEFENDANTS. (PERAL, STEPHANIE) Modified to edit title on 4/19/2023 (rcb).
April 13, 2023 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to LUZ MARINA PAGES MEMBER OF THE FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE,. Attachments: #1 SUMMONS ISSUED-MICHAEL WASYLIK MEMBER OF THE FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE) (rcb)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #10 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 04/10/2023. (rcb)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #18 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 04/07/2023. (rcb)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The amended motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #17 , is GRANTED.The first motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #16 , isDENIED as moot. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 04/07/2023. (rcb)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #13 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 04/07/2023. (rcb)
April 7, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number CFLNDC-7807078.), #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Jo Popkin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7806963.) . Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
April 7, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM , #19 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM , #22 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM , #21 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/21/2023). (rcb)
April 6, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM by FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE. (SILVERMAN, LAWRENCE)
April 6, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM by JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE. (SILVERMAN, LAWRENCE)
April 6, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM by CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE. (SILVERMAN, LAWRENCE)
April 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE. (SILVERMAN, LAWRENCE)
April 6, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number CFLNDC-7807078.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing) (STARR, JASON)
April 6, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Jo Popkin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7806963.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE. (POPKIN, KELLY)
April 6, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE.(Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7806963.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (POPKIN, KELLY) Modified to edit title on 4/6/2023 (rcb).
April 6, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Jo Popkin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7806963.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
April 6, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed. ***Incorrect Referral Made to District Judge**. Re: #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Jo Popkin. Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7806963. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
April 5, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ami Rakesh Patel.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-7801367.), #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara L. Mandelbaum.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7802113.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORRECTED ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 04/04/2023. (rcb) Modified on 4/6/2023 (rcb).
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORRECTED ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/04/2023. (rcb) Modified on 4/6/2023 (rcb).
April 4, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara L. Mandelbaum.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7802113.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE. (MANDELBAUM, SARA)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 04/04/2023. (rcb)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 04/04/2023. (rcb)
April 4, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ami Rakesh Patel.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-7801367.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE. (PATEL, AMI)
March 31, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Levi.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7794606.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE. (LEVI, JENNIFER)
March 31, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Levi.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7794606.), #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chris Erchull.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7794105.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
March 30, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chris Erchull.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7794105.) by BENNETT BOE, BRENDA BOE, CARLA COE, CHRISTINA COE, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, FIONA FOE, FREYA FOE. (ERCHULL, CHRISTOPHER)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MEDICINE, ELEONOR PIMENTEL. #1 FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, #2 FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE (rcb)
March 27, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SCOT ACKERMAN, WAEL BARSOUM, Matthew R. Benson, Gregory Coffman, Chris Creegan, Amy Derick, David Diamond, Watson Ducatel, FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE, MARIA GARCIA, Patrick Hunter, Valerie Jackson, Nicole Justice, William D. Kirsh, Joseph A. Ladapo, Monica M. Mortensen, Luz Marina Pages, Eleonor Pimentel, Nicholas W. Romanello, Tiffany Sizemore Di Pietro, Hector Vila, GREGORY WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine c/o William D. Kirsh, Member of the Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine, #2 Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine c/o Watson Ducatel, Member of the Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine, #3 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Patrick Hunter, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #4 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Nicole Justice, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #5 Florida Board of Medicine c/o David Diamond, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #6 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Amy Derick, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #7 Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine c/o Chris Creegan, Member of the Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine, #8 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Wael Barsoum, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #9 Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine c/o Valerie Jackson, Member of the Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine, #10 Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine c/o Tiffany Sizemore Di Pietro, Chair, #11 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Scot Ackerman, Chair, #12 Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine c/o Monica M. Mortensen, Member of the Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine, #13 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Hector Vila, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #14 Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine c/o Gregory Williams, Member of the Florida Board of Osteopathic Medicine, #15 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Nicole Justice, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #16 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Nicholas W. Romanello, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #17 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Matthew R. Benson, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #18 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Maria Garcia, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine, #19 Florida Board of Medicine c/o Gregory Coffman, Member of the Florida Board of Medicine) (rcb) #20 Florida Board of Medicine Michael Wasylik , #21 Florida Board of Medicine Zachariah Zachariah (rcb). (Attachment 20 replaced on 3/27/2023) (rcb).
March 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Similar Case by Bennett Boe, Brenda Boe, Carla Coe, Christina Coe, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, Fiona Foe, Freya Foe (SILVERMAN, LAWRENCE)
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Summonses by Bennett Boe, Brenda Boe, Carla Coe, Christina Coe, JANE DOE, SUSAN DOE, Fiona Foe, Freya Foe re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons) (SILVERMAN, LAWRENCE)
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SILVERMAN, LAWRENCE)
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint.**Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET.** (rcb)
March 24, 2023 Set Deadline-Attorney Admissions for Kelly Jo Popkin, Sara Mandelbaum, Jennifer Levi, Chris Erchull,Jason Starr & Ami Patel due by 4/7/2023. (rcb)**Attorney Admissions Email & Letter Forwarded**
March 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PRELIMINARY STATEMENT. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7783100.), filed by Fiona Foe, SUSAN DOE, JANE DOE, Christina Coe, Brenda Boe, Freya Foe, Bennett Boe, Carla Coe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SILVERMAN, LAWRENCE) Modified to edit title on 3/24/2023 (rcb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE et al v. LADAPO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEAN SILVERMAN
Represented By: CHELSEA LEE DUNN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F STOLL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: STEPHANIE PERAL
Represented By: AMI RAKESH PATEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M ERCHULL
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: JASON E STARR
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN LEVI
Represented By: KELLY JO POPKIN
Represented By: SARA L MANDELBAUM
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN DOE
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEAN SILVERMAN
Represented By: CHELSEA LEE DUNN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F STOLL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: STEPHANIE PERAL
Represented By: AMI RAKESH PATEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M ERCHULL
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: JASON E STARR
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN LEVI
Represented By: KELLY JO POPKIN
Represented By: SARA L MANDELBAUM
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Boe
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEAN SILVERMAN
Represented By: CHELSEA LEE DUNN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F STOLL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: AMI RAKESH PATEL
Represented By: STEPHANIE PERAL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M ERCHULL
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: JASON E STARR
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN LEVI
Represented By: KELLY JO POPKIN
Represented By: SARA L MANDELBAUM
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett Boe
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEAN SILVERMAN
Represented By: CHELSEA LEE DUNN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F STOLL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: STEPHANIE PERAL
Represented By: AMI RAKESH PATEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M ERCHULL
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: JASON E STARR
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN LEVI
Represented By: KELLY JO POPKIN
Represented By: SARA L MANDELBAUM
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Coe
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEAN SILVERMAN
Represented By: CHELSEA LEE DUNN
Represented By: STEPHANIE PERAL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F STOLL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: AMI RAKESH PATEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M ERCHULL
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: JASON E STARR
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN LEVI
Represented By: KELLY JO POPKIN
Represented By: SARA L MANDELBAUM
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Coe
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEAN SILVERMAN
Represented By: CHELSEA LEE DUNN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F STOLL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: STEPHANIE PERAL
Represented By: AMI RAKESH PATEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M ERCHULL
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: JASON E STARR
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN LEVI
Represented By: KELLY JO POPKIN
Represented By: SARA L MANDELBAUM
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiona Foe
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEAN SILVERMAN
Represented By: CHELSEA LEE DUNN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F STOLL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: STEPHANIE PERAL
Represented By: AMI RAKESH PATEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M ERCHULL
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: JASON E STARR
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN LEVI
Represented By: KELLY JO POPKIN
Represented By: SARA L MANDELBAUM
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freya Foe
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEAN SILVERMAN
Represented By: CHELSEA LEE DUNN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F STOLL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: STEPHANIE PERAL
Represented By: AMI RAKESH PATEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M ERCHULL
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN LEVI
Represented By: JASON E STARR
Represented By: KELLY JO POPKIN
Represented By: SARA L MANDELBAUM
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA LOE
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA LOE
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA GOE
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAVIN GOE
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA POE
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL POE
Represented By: CYNTHIA C WEAVER
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: MAYA GINSBURG
Represented By: SHANNON MINTER
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCIEN HAMEL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLIVIA NOEL
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA CRUZ EVIA
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAI POPE
Represented By: SIMONE MICHELLE CHRISS
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD REDBURN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Ladapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA BOARD OF MEDICINE
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot Ackerman
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas W. Romanello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wael Barsoum
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew R. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Coffman
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Derick
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Diamond
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Hunter
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz Marina Pages
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleonor Pimentel
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Vila
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wasylik
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachariah P. Zachariah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA GARCIA
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Justice
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA BOARD OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Ducatel
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Sizemore Di Pietro
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY WILLIAMS
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica M. Mortensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Jackson
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Creegan
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Kirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH A LADAPO
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: HENRY CHARLES WHITAKER
Represented By: JAMES HAMILTON PERCIVAL, II
Represented By: JOSEPH EDWARD HART
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS W ROMANELLO
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW R BENSON
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARIAH P ZACHARIAH
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONICA M MORTENSEN
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM D KIRSH
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT BEATO
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: JOSHUA E PRATT
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY MOODY
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger B Madden
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Campbell
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Durrett
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Nelson
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gladson
Represented By: HENRY CHARLES WHITAKER
Represented By: JAMES HAMILTON PERCIVAL, II
Represented By: JOSEPH EDWARD HART
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Represented By: WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE BARTLETT
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. Larizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN S KRAMER
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN HAAS
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Brodsky
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez S Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE ARONBERG
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Ward
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold F Pryor
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Archer
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bakkedahl
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amira D Fox
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONIQUE H WORRELL
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: in his Official Capi LARRY BASFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R J LARIZZA
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY BASFORD
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN S LOPEZ
Represented By: ARTHUR IVAN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ACADEMIC PEDIATRIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc. d/b/a GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC PEDIATRICIANS
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PEDIATRIC SOCIETY
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Inc.
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ENDOCRINE SOCIETY
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FLORIDA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PEDIATRIC NURSE PRACTITIONERS
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETIES FOR PEDIATRIC UROLOGY
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR PEDIATRIC RESEARCH
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC NURSES
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS INC doing business as GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF MEDICAL SCHOOL PEDIATRIC DEPARTMENT CHAIRS INC
Represented By: CORTLIN HALL LANNIN
Represented By: D JEAN VETA
Represented By: EMILY MICHELLE MONDRY
Represented By: NOAH SHEA GOLDBERG
Represented By: WILLIAM R ISASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?