SHAER v. LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES INC
Plaintiff: Nabeha Shaer
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & County Stores, Inc. and LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES INC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00275
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #13 JOINT REPORT OF THE PARTIES' RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. (rcb)
August 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING PARTIES' PROPOSED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. All discovery shall be commenced in time to be completed by 12/22/2023. Potentially dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by 1/15/2024. Plaintiffs counsel shall advise the court on or before 12/22/2023 whether and when the parties will attend mediation. Mediation Report due by 1/5/2024. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 8/19/2023. (rcb)
August 18, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SEYMORE, JENNIFER)
August 18, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #12 Notice of Appearance (ckm)
August 17, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L W SEYMORE on behalf of NABEHA SHAER (SEYMORE, JENNIFER)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON #5 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #5 ) is GRANTED as to Count III only. The motion is DENIED as to Counts I, IV, V, and VI. Count III is DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant's motion to strike (ECF No. #5 ) is GRANTED as to paragraphs 95 and 98. Defendant's motion to strike (ECF No. #5 ) paragraph 97 is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff requests prejudgment interest but is otherwise DENIED. The motion to strike (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED as to paragraph 96. Paragraphs 95 and 98 and Plaintiff's request for prejudgment interest are STRUCK. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 8/16/2023. (rcb)
August 7, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #10 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. (rcb)
August 7, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #10 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. (rcb)
August 7, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: Set Deadline 8/2/2023-Attorney Admissions Deadline set for Attorneys Precious Chavez, Natalie Jackson & Desiree Austin-Holiday (rcb)
August 4, 2023 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. (CRUMP, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 8/7/2023 (rcb).
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Plaintiff' s unopposed motion (ECF No. #8 ) for extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 8/4/2023, to respond to Defendants motion to dismiss and to strike. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 7/20/2023. (rcb)
July 19, 2023 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. (CRUMP, BENJAMIN) Modified to edit title on 7/20/2023 (rcb).
July 19, 2023 Attorney Admissions Deadline Reset for Precious Chavez, Natalie Jackson & Desiree Austin-Holiday due by 8/2/2023. (rcb)
July 17, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES INC. (COLE, BLAKE)
July 10, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #6 DEFENDANTS AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, #5 First MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES INC., #4 DEFENDANT ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (rcb)
July 9, 2023 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. (COLE, BLAKE) Modified to edit title on 7/10/2023 (rcb).
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/21/2023). (COLE, BLAKE)
July 7, 2023 Filing 4 DEFENDANT ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (COLE, BLAKE) Modified to edit title on 7/10/2023 (rcb).
July 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/18/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/17/2023. Discovery due by 10/7/2023. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 7/4/2023. (rcb) Modified to edit docket text on 7/10/2023 (rcb).
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Notice of Removal. TO ATTORNEY BLAKE COLE-Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk (rcb)
July 3, 2023 Set Deadline-s/Hearings Attorney Admissions for Precious Chavez, Natalie Jackson & Desiree Austin-Holiday due by 7/17/2023. (rcb)
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Love's Travel Stops & County Stores, Inc. Removal from Circuit Court of the 3rd Judicial Circuit, in and for Madison County, Florida, case number 2023-CA-000079. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7947113.), filed by Love's Travel Stops & County Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket) (COLE, BLAKE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAER v. LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabeha Shaer
Represented By: JENNIFER L W SEYMORE
Represented By: BENJAMIN LLOYD CRUMP
Represented By: TALLEY LEE KALEKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & County Stores, Inc.
Represented By: BLAKE HOLMAN COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES INC
Represented By: BLAKE HOLMAN COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?