GREEN v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Petitioner: GREEN JEFFERY and JEFFREY GREEN
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 4:2024cv00125
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Petitioner Green has filed a "Motion to Withdraw," ECF No. #7 , in which he requests the Court withdraw his request to submit a habeas petition. Accordingly, it is respectfully recommended that his motion be construed as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and this case be DISMISSED unless Petitioner Green requests to withdraw his motion within the time allowed for objections to this Report and Recommendation. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/24/2024. (baf) R&R flag set. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 5/22/2024.)
April 23, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Withdraw. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (baf)
April 22, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw by JEFFREY GREEN. (baf)
April 10, 2024 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 400002566. Fee status updated to paid. (baf)
April 10, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: 6 Filing Fee Received. (baf)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #4 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Petitioner an application for leave to proceed IFP. Petitioner shall have until May 15, 2024, to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a new, complete IFP application. The Clerk shall forward four 2254 forms to Petitioner, writing AMENDED and the case number on the blank forms. Petitioner shall file an amended habeas corpus petition on or before May 15, 2024, using the 2254 forms provided and following the instructions in this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/29/2024. (baf) (Application for leave to proceed IFP sent by mail per order instructions. Four 2254 forms sent to petitioner with amended written in the document title and the case number applied in the designated section.)
March 29, 2024 Set #5 Deadlines/Hearings Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2024. Fee due by 5/15/2024. (baf)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by JEFFREY GREEN. (baf)
March 28, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (baf)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall correct Petitioner's name and DC number on the docket to "Jeffery Green, DC Number 570160." The Clerk of Court shall forward to Mr. Green an application for leave to proceed IFP. If he wishes to proceed with this habeas petition in federal court, Mr. Greene shall have until 4/15/2024, to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a new, complete IFP application. The Clerk shall forward four 2254 forms to Mr. Green, writing "AMENDED" and the case number on the blank forms. If he wishes to proceed in federal court, Mr. Green shall file an amended habeas corpus petition on or before 4/15/2024, using the 2254 forms provided and following the instructions in this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/15/2024. (baf) (Petitioner's name, DC number and address has been updated on the docket. IFP application and four 2254 forms sent by mail per order instructions.)
March 14, 2024 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (baf)
March 14, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (baf)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Title "Notice of Appeal"), filed by GREEN JEFFERY. (baf) (No service copies. No filing fee or IFP Motion.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GREEN JEFFERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEFFREY GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?