MOORE v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Petitioner: JOHN MOORE, III
Respondent: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and FRANKLIN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Case Number: 4:2024cv00248
Filed: June 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, JOHN MOORE, III. (mb)
June 18, 2024 Filing 3 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:24-cv-01081. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (mb).
June 18, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (mb)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court, Northern District of Florida, Tallahassee Division. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/14/2024. (KM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/18/2024.]
June 17, 2024 ***COPIES mailed to Parties: John Moore, III; re #2 Order, (KM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/18/2024.]
June 13, 2024 ***Set OrlP-2, flag(s). (TDC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/18/2024.]
June 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florida Department of Corrections, Franklin Correctional Institution filed by John Moore, III. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (No IFP)(JOS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/18/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN MOORE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FRANKLIN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?