KLAYMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: LARRY KLAYMAN
Defendant: FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, JILL TRACY JACOBS BIDEN and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2025cv00023
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTIES AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #11 MOTION TO AMEND, granting #2 MOTION to Substitute Party Defendants. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/4/2025. The United States is partially substituted as Defendant. More specifically, the United States is substituted as Defendant for all claims against President Biden, Vice President Harris, and Dr. OConnor for conduct occurring on or after January 20, 2021. Claims against those three for conduct occurring on or after January 20, 2021 are dismissed. (kdm)
February 25, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (baf)
February 21, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by LARRY KLAYMAN. (KLAYMAN, LARRY)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 2/5/2025. (baf)
February 5, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John C. Hueston.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9311728.) by JILL TRACY JACOBS BIDEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (HUESTON, JOHN)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 2/5/2025. (baf)
February 5, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John C. Hueston.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9311728.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (baf)
February 4, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bram M. Alden.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9304408.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (baf)
February 3, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bram M. Alden.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9304408.) by JILL TRACY JACOBS BIDEN. (ALDEN, BRAM)
January 29, 2025 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT Certified State Court Docket by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (KRIEGER, JOCELYN) Modified on 1/30/2025 to edit title (kdm).
January 29, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant Dr Jill Tracy Jacobs Biden by QUINN BRANDON RITTER on behalf of JILL TRACY JACOBS BIDEN (RITTER, QUINN) Modified on 1/30/2025 to edit title (kdm).
January 29, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant Dr Jill Tracy Jacobs Biden by FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH on behalf of JILL TRACY JACOBS BIDEN (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) Modified on 1/30/2025 to edit title (kdm).
January 28, 2025 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARRY KLAYMAN. JILL TRACY JACOBS BIDEN waiver sent on 1/22/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (KLAYMAN, LARRY)
January 16, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION to Substitute Party Defendants, re #1 Notice of Removal. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (kdm)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party Defendants by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Westfall Act Certification) (KRIEGER, JOCELYN)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA from Cir. Ct. 2d. Jud. Cir. Leon Cty. Fla., case number 2024-CA-001114., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet Leon County, #3 Exhibit Docket Filings Leon County, #4 Exhibit Westfall Act Certifications) (KRIEGER, JOCELYN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLAYMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL TRACY JACOBS BIDEN
Represented By: QUINN BRANDON RITTER
Represented By: JOHN CHARLES HUESTON
Represented By: BRAM MARSHALL ALDEN
Represented By: JOCELYN ALYSSA KRIEGER
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOCELYN ALYSSA KRIEGER
Represented By: FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY KLAYMAN
Represented By: LARRY KLAYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?