EDLER v. SCHWARZ
Plaintiff: CURLEY ANTONIO EDLER
Defendant: SCHWARZ
Case Number: 5:2008cv00275
Filed: September 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Holmes
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER ADOPTING 162 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: GRANTING 102 Motion for Summary Judgment by M L HALL, G WELLHAUSEN, COFFEE and dismissed from this case. Plaintiff's 166 , 169 , 173 Motions for Voluntary Dismissal are gra nted as to the remaining claims. Clerk shall issue a judgment in favor of Defendants, M L HALL, G WELLHAUSEN, COFFEE on the claims against them, and dismiss all remaining claims w/o prejudice. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 8/11/2010. (jws)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re 139 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by K P FOREHAND, D MARSH - - Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion for partial summary judgment. - - - (Response to motion due by by 4/26/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on March 25, 2010. (cbj)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SEXTON, SCHWARZ, WATKINS, LANGFORD, SCOTT, DODD, and BARTON. - - Within thirty (30) days from order date, Pla shall file a response to the motion for summary judgment. - - - (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/15/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on March 16, 2010. (cbj)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: re 48 Request to Effect Service filed by CURLEY ANTONIO EDLER. Service ordered on 4/2/2009 per Doc. 46 , and summons issued per Doc. 47 . Plaintiff should await response by Defts or an order of the court and should not file anything further until directed. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 4/7/2009. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDLER v. SCHWARZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURLEY ANTONIO EDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHWARZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?